Burnham v. Worcester County Sheriff Office
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-40189
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 6:34 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arthur A Burnham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by W111263

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur A Burnham +1 508 980 0072
v.
No Logo Worcester County Sheriff Office, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None General Order 09-1
    General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arthur A Burnham.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against Worcester County Sheriff Office, filed by Arthur A Burnham. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 18 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?