Bostic v. Spaulding
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-12276
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2020 at 9:29 AM DT (9.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Bostic, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by #44590-037

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Bostic
No Logo Stephen Spaulding, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Appealability Denied
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241, filed by James Bostic.(Castilla, Francis) Modified on 10/31/2018 (Castilla, Francis). (Entered: 10/31/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 2 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?