United States v. Xancopinca
Criminal Case South Carolina District Court, Case No. 2:18-cr-01019
District Judge Richard M. Gergel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 9:12 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Rhett DeHart +1 843 727 4381 +1 843 727 4443 rhett.dehart@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Gabino Xancopinca, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2018 Alicia Vachira Penn +1 843 727 4148 alicia_penn@fd.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ann Briks Walsh +1 843 727 4148 +1 843 727 4179 ann_walsh@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Gabino Xancopinca: Plea and Sentence set for 12/5/2018 11:00 AM (Immediately following the 11 AM civil bar meeting) in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. (cper, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witness List by USA as to Gabino Xancopinca. No proposed order(DeHart, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Compel Juror Voir Dire by USA as to Gabino Xancopinca. No proposed order(DeHart, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Disclosure of Expert Witness(es) by USA as to Gabino Xancopinca. No proposed order(DeHart, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DEMAND for Disclosure of Witness in Support of Alibi Defense as to Gabino Xancopinca (DeHart, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Discovery Reciprocal by USA as to Gabino Xancopinca. No proposed order(DeHart, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SCHEDULING NOTICE as to Gabino Xancopinca: Bar Meeting set for 12/5/2018 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Jury Selection set for 1/8/2019 09:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #4, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel (cper, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Case Reassigned as to Gabino Xancopinca to Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel. Judge Unassigned - CRI no longer assigned to the case. (pcas, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Gabino Xancopinca: Arraignment set for 11/28/2018 09:45 AM in Charleston Courtroom #5, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant. (cper, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    INDICTMENT (Sealed Grand Jury Ballot attached) as to Gabino Xancopinca (1) count 1. (Attachments: # 1 GJ Ballot) (cper, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Discovery Inspection and Inventory by Gabino Xancopinca. No proposed order(Walsh, Ann) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        EDWARDS NOTICE by Gabino Xancopinca (Walsh, Ann) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Leave to File Additional Motions by Gabino Xancopinca. No proposed order(Walsh, Ann) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Disclosure of Intent to Use Evidence of Other Crimes by Gabino Xancopinca. No proposed order(Walsh, Ann) Modified on 11/8/2018 to replace with corrected document as provided by filing user (cper, ). [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Warrant Returned Executed on 10/26/2018 in case as to Gabino Xancopinca. (bwalters-USMS, ) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                CONSENT ORDER OF DETENTION as to Gabino Xancopinca. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/26/18.(hhil, ) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Gabino Xancopinca (hhil, ) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Gabino Xancopinca. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/26/18.(hhil, ) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker: Initial Appearance as to Gabino Xancopinca held on 10/26/2018. AUSA Dean Secor appears for USA. The court appoints the Federal Public Defenders Office for defendant. AFPD Alicia Penn present from that office. Government moves for detention. Defendant waives preliminary hearing and waives detention hearing without prejudice. Defendant is remanded to custody. Court Reporter Chondra White, CourtSmart. Court Interpreter: Carla Collins. Language: Spanish. (hhil, ) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Arrest of Gabino Xancopinca. Clerk notified by: ICE. (hhil, ) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CJA 23 Financial Affidavit (Restricted Access) by Gabino Xancopinca (hhil, ) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Gabino Xancopinca. Initial Appearance set for 10/26/2018 01:30 PM in Charleston Courtroom #6, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. (hhil, ) Modified to correct hearing date on 10/24/2018 (hhil, ). [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              COMPLAINT AND AFFIDAVIT as to Gabino Xancopinca (1). (hhil, ) [2:18-mj-00176-MCRI] (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?