United States v. Laretto
Federal Court Proceeding Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-mj-00557

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 5:33 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexander Patrick Berrang +1 703 299 3700 Alexander.P.Berrang@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Thomas Andrew Laretto, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspun Shapiro Davis & Leary PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter David Greenspun +1 703 352 0100 +1 703 591 7268 pdg@Greenspunlaw.com
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None protective order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None order setting conditions of release
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Hearing
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None bond
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - USA
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Temporary Detention OrderCourt Filing
                  Temporary Detention Order as to Thomas Andrew Laretto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/29/2018. (lgue, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter David Greenspun appearing for Thomas Andrew Laretto (lgue, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None initial appearanceCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Initial Appearance as to Thomas Andrew Laretto held on 11/29/2018. US appeared through: Gwendelynn Bills. Deft appeared with counsel: Muhammad Elsayed for Peter Greenspun. Deft informed of rights, charges, and penalties. Gov't is seeking detention-GRANTED pending PH/DH. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 11/30/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Deft remanded. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None warrant returned executed
                        Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/29/2018 in case as to Thomas Andrew Laretto. (lgue, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Case unsealed as to Thomas Andrew Laretto (lgue, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None bond
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None warrant issuedCourt Filing
                              Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis in case as to Thomas Andrew Laretto. (pmil, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 5 Motion to Seal Case until the deft is arrested as to Thomas Andrew Laretto (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/27/18. (pmil, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Motion to Seal Case
                                  MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Thomas Andrew Laretto. (pmil, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
                                    Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (pmil, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                      AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Thomas Andrew Laretto re: 1 Complaint (Sealed) (pmil, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Complaint (Sealed)
                                        SEALED COMPLAINT as to Thomas Andrew Laretto (1). (pmil, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?