NorVergence, Inc. - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case New Jersey Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 04-02629
District Judge Rosemary Gambardella, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 8:01 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Graham Curtin PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gina Graham +1 973 401 7146 +1 973 292 1767

Represented by Kathleen N. Fennelly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kathleen N. Fennelly
No Logo Charles M. Forman, Defendant

Represented by Forman Holt Eliades & Ravin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Forman Holt & Eliades LLC +1 201 845 1000

Represented by Freedman Law, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terri Jane Freedman +1 973 985 9408

Represented by LeClair Ryan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Forman +1 973 491 3600 +1 973 491 3517

Represented by Porzio, Bromberg & Newman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Warren J. Martin, Jr. +1 973 889 4006 +1 973 538 5146
No Logo NorVergence, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Forman Holt Eliades & Ravin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Forman Holt & Eliades LLC +1 201 845 1000
No Logo MC Graphics, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dale Edward Barney +1 973 596 4557 +1 973 639 6234
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Gibbons, Del Deo, Dolan, Griffinger & Vecchione +1 973 596 4500
No Logo Sandy Alexander Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dale Edward Barney +1 973 596 4557 +1 973 639 6234
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Gibbons, Del Deo, Dolan, Griffinger & Vecchione +1 973 596 4500
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Adversary Case (2-04-ap-02629) Closed. (lc, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address filed by Dale E. Barney on behalf of MC Graphics, Inc., Sandy Alexander, Inc. (Barney, Dale) Modified TEXT on 3/29/2007 (iav, ). (Entered: 03/28/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 12. Service Date 02/26/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 12. Service Date 02/26/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Order Granting Motion Approving Settlement Agreement (Related Doc # 26). The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney. Signed on 2/22/2006. (mg, ) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Matter To Be Decided on the Papers (related document:26 Motion re: Approve Settlement filed by Counter-Claimant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Defendant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.) (car, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Certificate of Service (related document:26 Motion (Generic) filed by Counter-Claimant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Defendant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.) filed by Kathleen N. Fennelly on behalf of Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.. (Fennelly, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Motion re: Approve Settlement Filed by Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc..Hearing scheduled for 2/21/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (Fennelly, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Document re: Docket Sheet of U.S. District Court re: Sandy Alexander, Inc., et al Transfer to New Jersey (related document:23 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) filed by United States District Court. (Attachments: 1 Scheduling Order2 Substitution of Counsel) (msr, ) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Document re: Entire Proceedings from U.S. District Court Iowa (related document:23 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) filed by United States District Court. (Attachments: 1 Letter from USDC Iowa transferring (remanding) case to USDC New Jersey2 Display Receipt of Doc. No. 8 from Iowa USDC3 Complete documents of transfer) (msr, ) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Consent Order Referring Transferred Action to U.S.Bankruptcy Court signed by the Hon. Harold A. Ackerman, USDJ on 3/22/05.(related document:11 Consent Order,, filed by Counter-Defendant Sandy Alexander, Inc, Plaintiff Sandy Alexander, Inc, Counter-Defendant MC Graphics, Inc., Plaintiff MC Graphics, Inc.) (msr) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Certified Copy of Order by District Judge William Martini Denying Motion For Withdrawal Of Reference(Related Doc # 14).Signed on 3/16/2005. (ekp, ) (CV#04-6273) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Certified Copy of Opinion by District Judge William Martini Denying Motion for Withdrawal of Reference(related document:14 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $ 150. filed by Counter-Claimant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Defendant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.). Signed on 3/16/2005 (ekp, ) (CV#04-6273) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Certificate of Service (related document:19 Response, filed by Counter-Claimant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Defendant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.) filed by Gina Graham on behalf of Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.. (Graham, Gina) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Response to (related document:14 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $ 150. filed by Counter-Claimant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Defendant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.) filed by Gina Graham on behalf of Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.. (Graham, Gina) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Answer to Counterclaim filed by Dale E. Barney on behalf of MC Graphics, Inc., Sandy Alexander, Inc. (Barney, Dale) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Minute of PRE-TRIAL Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Scheduling order to be submitted.(related document:5 Alias Summons Issued, 2 Summons Issued,) (car, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Remark - Notice of Docketing of Motion to Withdraw Reference re #14. Judge William Martini assigned. CV#04-6273. (ekp, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Hearing Withdrawn (related document:14 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $ 150. filed by Counter-Claimant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Defendant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.) (msr)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Transmittal Memo to District Court Re: Motion To Withdraw the Reference.(related document:14 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference,, filed by Counter-Claimant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Defendant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.) (msr) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Certificate of Service (related document:14 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference,, filed by Counter-Claimant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Defendant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.) filed by Gina Graham on behalf of Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.. (Graham, Gina) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Certificate of Service (related document:13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Counter-Claimant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Defendant Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.) filed by Gina Graham on behalf of Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.. (Graham, Gina) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference(04-02629-RG) [motion,mwdrefad] ( 150.00). Receipt number 5044451, amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $ 150. Filed by Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc..Hearing scheduled for 1/18/2005 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Brief In Support of Motion to Withdraw Reference2 Certification of David M. Posner3 Exhibit A to Declaration of David M. Posner4 Exhibit B to Declaration of David M. Posner5 Exhibit C to Declaration of David M. Posner6 Exhibit D to Declaration of David M. Posner7 Certificate of Service) (Graham, Gina)COURT HAS WITHDRAWN HEARING. Modified on 12/22/2004 (msr). (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Answer to Complaint filed by Gina Graham on behalf of Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc., Counterclaim by Gina Graham on behalf of Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. against MC Graphics, Inc., Sandy Alexander, Inc. (Graham, Gina) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/11/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 12/11/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Consent Order Consolidating Actions and Extending Time For Wells Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. To Answer, Defend and Counterclaim in Response To Complaint and for other Relief (related document:1 Complaint 9 Certificate of Consent ). (Wells Fargo shall have to answer is extended until and including 12/17/2004) Filed by Gibbons, Del Deo, Dolan, Griffinger & Vecchione, P.C., on behalf of MC Graphics, Inc., Sandy Alexander, Inc . . The following parties were served: Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant's Attorney. Signed on 12/7/2004 (mg, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Answer to Complaint filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Martin, Warren) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Certificate of Consent. Filed by Dale E. Barney on behalf of Sandy Alexander, Inc. (Barney, Dale) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Certificate of Service (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Sandy Alexander, Inc, Plaintiff MC Graphics, Inc., 5 Alias Summons Issued, ) filed by Dale E. Barney on behalf of MC Graphics, Inc., Sandy Alexander, Inc. (Barney, Dale) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Certificate of Service (related document:6 Notice of Appearance and Request (Adversary) filed by Defendant Charles M. Forman) filed by Terri Jane Freedman on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Freedman, Terri) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Terri Jane Freedman on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Freedman, Terri) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Alias Summons Issued to Sandy Alexander Inc. & MC Graphics Inc. for service on Charles M. Forman Answer due on 11/3/2004; NorVergence, Inc. Answer due on 11/3/2004; Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. Answer due on 11/3/2004 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/12/2005 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (iav, ) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Document re: Letter to the Court for Reissue of Summons (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Sandy Alexander, Inc, Plaintiff MC Graphics, Inc.) filed by Dale E. Barney on behalf of MC Graphics, Inc., Sandy Alexander, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Summons) (Barney, Dale) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Receipt of filing fee for Complaint(04-02629-RG) [cmp,cmp] ( 150.00). Receipt number 4526709, amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Charles Forman on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Forman, Charles) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Summons Issued to Sandy Alexander, Inc. & MC Graphics, Inc. for Service on Charles M. Forman Answer due on 10/18/2004; NorVergence, Inc. Answer due on 10/18/2004; Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc. Answer due on 10/18/2004 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/12/2005 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (lc, ) (Entered: 09/17/2004)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Complaint by Sandy Alexander, Inc, MC Graphics, Inc. against NorVergence, Inc. ; Charles M. Forman ; Well Fargo Financial Leasing, Inc.. Nature of Suit: Complaint (for Compensation, Punitive and Exemplary Damages). Fee Amount $ 150.. (Attachments: 1 Cover Sheet2 Summons) (Barney, Dale) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?