NorVergence, Inc. - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case New Jersey Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 06-02099
District Judge Rosemary Gambardella, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 8:03 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Charles M. Forman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Forman Holt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael E. Holt +1 201 845 1000 +1 201 655 6650
Space Kim R. Lynch +1 201 845 1000 +1 201 655 6650
v.
No Logo Information Leasing Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson Kill P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Inez M. Markovich +1 267 216 2700
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
  Entries (101) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Adversary Case (2:06-ap-2099) Closed. (iav)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: Information Leasing Corp. filed by Kim R. Lynch on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Lynch, Kim) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Minute of Hearing Held: Adversary resolved in connection with adv no. 06-2142 (related document(s): 26 Order to Show Cause (Upload)) (car)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Charles M. Forman Forman, Holt & Eliades LLC 218 Route 17 North Rochelle Park, NJ 07662-3399, (related document:26 Order to Show Cause (Upload)) (sjp)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/08/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Order to Show Cause For Administrative Closure OF Adversary Proceeding.. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/6/2018. Show Cause hearing to be held on 4/25/2018 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Hearing Rescheduled from 11/30/2015. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 02/04/2016 at 10:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Hearing Rescheduled from 11/03/2015. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2015 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Hearing Rescheduled from 10/14/2015. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2015 at 11:45 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Hearing Rescheduled from 06/18/2015. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 08/13/2015 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Hearing Rescheduled from 04/22/2015. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2015 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Hearing Rescheduled from 03/25/2015 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2015 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Telephone Conference Hearing scheduled for 03/25/2015 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Hearing Rescheduled from 12/18/2014 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 02/05/2015 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Hearing Rescheduled from 12/16/2014 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2014 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 10/29/2014 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2014 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (kat )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 9/17/2014 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2014 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 9/17/2014 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Telephone Conference Call Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2014 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 08/07/2014 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Hearing Rescheduled from 5/13/2014 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2014 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 4/23/2014 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2014 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled by Telephone Conference Call for 04/23/2014 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Hearing Rescheduled from (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Telephone Conference Call Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2014 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 1/22/2014 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Telephone Conference Call Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2014 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2014 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 11/13/2013 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Telephone Conference Call Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2013 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Status Conference Hearing by Telephone Conference Call scheduled for 11/13/2013 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Telephone Conference Call Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2013 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Telephone Conference Call Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 04/23/2013 (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (env )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman) Telephone Conference Call Hearing scheduled for 04/23/2013 at 12:00 PM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from February 28, 2013. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman)Hearing scheduled for 3/27/2013 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from (related document(s): 1 Complaint filed by Charles M. Forman)TELEPHONE CONFERENCE Call Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2013 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. (related document(s): 1 Complaint) Status Confernce Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2013 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from (related document(s): 1 Complaint) TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2012 at 11:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from (related document(s): 1 Complaint) Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2012 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from (related document(s): 1 Complaint) . Telephone Conference Call Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2012 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Status Conference Hearing Rescheduled from 6/5/2012 (related document(s): 1 Complaint) Telephone Conference Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2012 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mcp)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from 4/11/2012. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/5/2012 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 2/28/2012. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman.) Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 4/11/2012 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 1/25/2012. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman. ) Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Hearing Rescheduled from December 13, 2011. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/25/2012 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from November 10, 2011. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from October 26, 2011. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 11/10/2011 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 8/10/2011. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250, Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2011 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 6/22/2011. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from 3/30/2011. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250, Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 6/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 1/27/2011. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, ) Hearing scheduled for 3/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 11/11/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 11/18/2010. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 1/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from 9/16/2010. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250 Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2010 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from 6/23/2010. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250, Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 9/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 4/8/2010. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250, Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 6/23/2010 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 2/10/2010. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2010 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from December 9, 2009. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 2/10/2010 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 10/28/2009. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250, Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2009 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Document re: correspondence to court regarding adjournment of status conference to October 28, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 8/20/2009. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250, Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2009 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from 6/24/2009. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2009 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from April 29, 2009. (related document:1 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/24/2009 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from March 12, 2009. (related document:1Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 4/29/2009 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from January 28, 2009. (related document:1 Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp . Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/12/2009 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from 12/4/2008. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, 3 Summons Issued to Charles M. Forman for Service on Information Leasing Corp. Answer due on 8/14/2006 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/5/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark., Hearing Rescheduled from 10/29/2008.)Hearing scheduled for 1/28/2009 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 10/29/2008. (related document:1 Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits: filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, 3 Summons Issued to Charles M. Forman for Service on Information Leasing Corp. Answer due on 8/14/2006 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/5/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark., Hearing Rescheduled from 8/21/2008.)Hearing scheduled for 12/4/2008 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 8/21/2008. (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, 3 Summons Issued) Scheduled)Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2008 at 11:00 AM (check with court for location). (mg, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 6/17/2008. (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, 19 Hearing Scheduled, 3 Summons Issued) STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing scheduled for 8/21/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from April 17, 2008. (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, 19 Status Conference 3 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/17/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm,)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from 1/10/2008. (related document:19 Hearing re: Status Conference 1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Correspondence to court regarding adjournment of pretrial to April 17, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (related document: 1 Complaint), filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) Modified Link on 1/9/2008 (lc, ). (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 10/25/2007. (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman, 19 Hearing Scheduled re: Status Conference) Hearing scheduled for 1/10/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Correspondence to court regarding adjournment of status conference (related document: 1 Complaint), filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) Modified Link and Text on 10/25/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Service. No. of Notices: 4. Service Date 09/01/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Scheduled RE: STATUS CONFERENCE (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg, ) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Scheduling Order to be Submitted (related document:3 Summons Issued) (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Document re: correspondence confirming adjournment of pretrial filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Pre-Trial Hearing Rescheduled from 2/14/2007. (related document:3 Summons Issued) Hearing scheduled for 4/11/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Pre-Trial Hearing Rescheduled from 1/24/2007. (related document:3 Summons Issued) Hearing scheduled for 2/14/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Pre-Trial Hearing Rescheduled from 11/28/2006. (related document:3 Summons Issued) Hearing scheduled for 1/24/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Document re: correspondence adjourning pretrial (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service (related document:15 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Information Leasing Corp.) filed by Inez M. Markovich on behalf of Information Leasing Corp.. (Markovich, Inez) (Entered: 11/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Answer to Complaint filed by Inez M. Markovich on behalf of Information Leasing Corp.. (Markovich, Inez) (Entered: 11/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Pre-Trial Hearing Rescheduled from 10/31/2006. (related document:3 Summons Issued) Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 4. Service Date 10/18/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Correspondence confirming adjournment of related doc. 3 Summons-pretrial conference filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) Modified LINK on 10/19/2006 (iav, ). (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Order Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ.P. 12 and Fed.R. Bankr.P. 7012 Dismissing Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint (the remaining relief requested in the motion, seeking the dismiss count I of the Plaintiff's Complaint is Denied, and ILC shall file an answer to the plaintiff's complaint within thirty (30) days of the entry of this order) (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Information Leasing Corp.).. The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney. Signed on 10/11/2006 (mg, ) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 10/5/2006. (related document:3 Summons Issued) Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Document re: correspondence regarding adjournment of pre-trial conference (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Denied; Scheduling order to be submitted (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Information Leasing Corp.) (car, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 4. Service Date 09/23/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Scheduled. (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Information Leasing Corp., 9 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, )Hearing scheduled for 9/27/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting In Part, Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 and Fed R. Bankr. P. 7012 Dismissing Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint (Related Doc # 5). The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney. Signed on 9/21/2006. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Trustee's Opposition to (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, filed by Defendant Information Leasing Corp.) filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) Modified EVENT on 9/20/2006 (iav, ). (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: As to Count 1, Trustee allowed time to respond to Complaint; As to Count, 2, Dismissed: Order to be submitted granting partial relief (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Information Leasing Corp.) Hearing scheduled for 9/27/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, filed by Defendant Information Leasing Corp.) filed by Inez M. Markovich on behalf of Information Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Certificate of Service) (Markovich, Inez) Modified EVENT on 9/7/2006 (iav, ). (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Certificate of Service (related document:5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, filed by Defendant Information Leasing Corp.) filed by Inez M. Markovich on behalf of Information Leasing Corp.. (Markovich, Inez) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Information Leasing Corp..Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Brief 2 Proposed Order 3 Certificate of Service 4 Notice) (Markovich, Inez) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service (related document:1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Forman) & 3 Summons, filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) Modified TEXT on 8/1/2006 (iav, ). (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued to Charles M. Forman for Service on Information Leasing Corp. Answer due on 8/14/2006 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/5/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (dmc, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification and Agreement to Pay Filing Fee filed by Michael E. Holt on behalf of Charles M. Forman. (Holt, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary case 06-02099. Complaint by Charles M. Forman against Information Leasing Corp.. Receipt Number 520941, Fee Amount $ 250.. Nature of Suits:(424 (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727),454 (Recover Money/Property)), (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Summons) (Holt, Michael) Modified on 7/18/2013 TO REFLECT FEE PAID 7/10/13 IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 RECEIPT #520941(dmc). (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?