Bowen v. Adidas America Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Carolina District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-03118
District Judge Joseph F. Anderson, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 6:23 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Bowen, II. Adidas America Inc served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Service on Adidas America, Inc.)(McLeod, W) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to Christopher Rivers. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to Thomas Gassnola. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Summons Issued as to Munish Sood. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Summons Issued as to Christian Dawkins. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Summons Issued as to Merl Code. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Summons Issued as to James Gatto. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Summons Issued as to Adidas America Inc. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brian Bowen, II.(mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    COMPLAINT against Adidas America Inc, Merl Code, Christian Dawkins, Thomas Gassnola, James Gatto, Christopher Rivers, Munish Sood ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8114197.), filed by Brian Bowen, II. Service due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Louisville Agreement with Adidas, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Federal Criminal Complaint)(mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 7 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?