Cruz v. Dan Thomas Construction Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-00215
Magistrate Judge John Jelderks, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 8:44 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Filiberto Valenzuela, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011 Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Luis Enrique Cruz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011 Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Manuel Zazueta-Armenta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011 Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Marco Antonio Cruz-Ramirez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011, TERMINATED: 12/12/2011 Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
v.
No Logo Dan Thomas Construction Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by oregoncoast.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Thomas Construction Inc. +1 503 392 4444 thomasconst@oregoncoast.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott Hookland LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/27/2010 Thomas J. Murphy +1 503 620 4540 +1 503 620 4315 tjm@scott-hookland.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by All Plaintiffs (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Satisfaction by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      STIPULATED JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Plaintiffs have Judgment against Defendant Dan Thomas Construction, Inc. in the sum of Three Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($3,000). Execution of this judgment is stayed, provided the following payments are made to Plaintiffs on or before December 10, 2010, time being of the essence, in the following manner: 1) The sum of $392.26 in non-wage income payable to Marco Antonio Cruz-Ramirez; 2) The sum of $416.96 in non-wage income payable to Luis Enrique Cruz-Ramirrez; 3) The sum of $411.49 in non-wage income payable to Manuel Zazueta-Anueta; 4) The sum of $579.29 in non-wage income payable to Filiberto Valenzuela; 5) The sum of $1,200 in attorney fees and costs payable to D. Michael Dale. Signed on 7/2/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (mr) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Proposed Form of Order Submitted. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone status conference HELD on 4/27/2010. Judge John Jelderks presiding. ORDER: Mr. Murphy's motion to withdraw 21 is GRANTED. Mr. Murphy to provide the courtroom deputy, Michelle Rawson, with the email address for Mr. and Mrs. Thomas. Mr. Murphy shall also notify Mr. and Mrs. Thomas of the content of these proceedings. A judicial settlement conference is SET for 6/10/2010 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 1227. Formal notice with settlement conference instructions to follow. Dan Thomas Construction Inc. is required to appear either with or without counsel. All case management deadlines are STAYED pending further order of the court. D. Michael Dale present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Thomas J. Murphy present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: FTR. Magistrate Judge John Jelderks presiding. (mr) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            CIVIL MINUTES: RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: SETTING a telephone status conference for 4/27/2010 at 2:00 p.m. The court will initiate calls to counsel. (mr) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Declaration of Thomas J. Murphy. Filed by Dan Thomas Construction Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Withdraw 21 .) (Murphy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Motion to Withdraw. Filed by Dan Thomas Construction Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  CIVIL MINUTES: RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 19 . Discovery is to be completed by 3/29/2010. Dispositive motions are due 3/29/2010. The Joint ADR Report is due 4/28/2010. The pretrial order is due by 4/28/2010, or 30 days after the Court's final ruling on any dispositive motions, whichever is later. (mr) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Order for Administrative Correction of the Record. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a), the Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and to notify all parties accordingly: Docket 16 is replaced by Docket 19 as the wrong document was attached to the Docket 16 filing. (mr)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Joint ADR Report. Filed by all plaintiffs.(Dale, D.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Declaration of D. Michael Dale. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 16 .) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (# 13 ). Discovery is to be completed by 12/28/2009. Dispositive motions are due 12/28/2009. The Joint ADR Report is due 1/29/2010. The pretrial order is due by 1/29/2010, or 30 days after the Court's final ruling on any dispositive motions. (eo) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Declaration of Thomas J. Murphy. Filed by Dan Thomas Construction Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 13 .) (Murphy, Thomas) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Dan Thomas Construction Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 10 as follows: Discovery is to be completed by 10/26/2009. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/26/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/27/2009. Pretrial Order is due by 11/27/2009 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. (gm) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Declaration of D. Michael Dale. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 10 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (# 6 ). Discovery is to be completed by 8/27/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/28/2009. Pretrial Order is due by 9/28/2009. The parties have foregone initial disclosures as required by FRCP 26(a)(1). (eo) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Stipulation to Dispense with Rule 26 Disclosures by all plaintiffs. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Declaration of D. Michael Dale in Support of Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery and PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 6 .) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Dan Thomas Construction Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Answer to Complaint. Filed by Dan Thomas Construction Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Dan Thomas Construction Inc. waiver sent on 2/25/2009. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. Discovery is to be completed by 6/26/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/27/2009. Pretrial Order is due by 7/27/2009. (gm) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 25516 issued. Summons issued as to Defendant Dan Thomas Construction Inc. c/o Michael J. Scott, Registered Agent. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Plaintiffs Manuel Zazueta-Armenta, Luis Enrique Cruz, Marco Antonio Cruz-Ramirez, and Filiberto Valenzuela against Defendant Dan Thomas Construction Inc. (gm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2015: # 1 summons) (dnt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2015: # 2 civil cover) (dnt). (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?