City of Worcester v. Purdue Pharma LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-11958
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2019 at 1:55 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Worcester, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Judy Scolnick +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 jscolnick@scott-scott.com
v.
No Logo Actavis Inc., Defendant
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Atwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua D. Dunlap +1 207 791 1100 jdunlap@pierceatwood.com
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo John Kapoor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T. Kelly +1 617 345 1000 bkelly@nixonpeabody.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Tyler Knights +1 603 628 4027 mknights@nixonpeabody.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt M. Mullen +1 617 345 1113 +1 617 345 1300 kmullen@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Johnson and Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order of Remand to State Court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Knights on behalf of John Kapoor (Knights, Mark) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Kelly on behalf of John Kapoor (Kelly, Brian) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M. Mullen on behalf of John Kapoor (Mullen, Kurt) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation.(Dunlap, Joshua) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by John Kapoor.(Mullen, Kurt) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew O'Connor on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc (O'Connor, Andrew) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt plc for Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc.. (O'Connor, Brien) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc.(O'Connor, Brien) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 9/17/2018 Case Number 1:18-cv-11958. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation for City of Worcester.. (Dunlap, Joshua) Modified on 9/17/2018 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                DISREGARD FILED THE WRONG DOCUMENT. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Worcester identifying Other Affiliate Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation for City of Worcester.. (Dunlap, Joshua) Modified on 9/17/2018 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7321677 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal: Process Served on ABCD, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal: Consent of J. Kapoor, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, # 4 Category Form)(Dunlap, Joshua) Modified on 9/17/2018 (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?