Garrett v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Fremont, The
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02968
Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 6, 2021 at 6:13 PM DT (15.3 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stephen Garrett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Highlands Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary Dwight Warren +1 720 722 3880 +1 720 815 3380 zwarren@highlandslawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Adam Beaty, Defendant
No Logo Amanda Lucero, Defendant
No Logo Andrea Hopkins, Defendant
No Logo Board of County Commissioners of the County of Fremont, The, Defendant
No Logo Brandon Lovato, Defendant
No Logo Brandon O'Grady, Defendant
No Logo Caleb Chase, Defendant
No Logo Carrie Hammel, Defendant
No Logo Charlene Combs, Defendant
No Logo CHC Companies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Correctional Healthcare Companies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cory Burton, Defendant
No Logo DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Greak Peak Healthcare Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Jaeson Watts, Defendant
No Logo James (I) Beicker, Defendant
No Logo James Beicker, Defendant
No Logo Jeremy Miller, Defendant
No Logo John and Jane Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo John Rankin, Defendant
No Logo John Ricci, Defendant
No Logo Justin Green, Defendant
No Logo Kathleen Maestas, Defendant
No Logo Kay, Defendant
No Logo Mackenzie Roquemore, Defendant
No Logo Merlo, Defendant
No Logo Michael Moore, Defendant
No Logo Morgan Roquemore, Defendant
No Logo Natcore Healthcare Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peters, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Herr, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Brassfield, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Allen, Defendant
No Logo Stephanie Repshire, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Kreuger, Defendant
No Logo Travis Taylor, Defendant
No Logo Ty (I) Martin, Defendant
No Logo Ty Martin, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Modify
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Modify
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Referral
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Leave
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Modify
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Modify
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Modify
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/27/2018. Consent Form due by 1/17/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER Drawing Case by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/27/2018. This Case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All Future Pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02968 STV (evana, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: 1 Complaint filed by attorney Zachary Dwight Warren. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Sharon Allen, Adam Beaty, James Beicker, Sarah Brassfield, Cory Burton, CHC Companies, Inc., Caleb Chase, Charlene Combs, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Correctional Healthcare Companies, Inc., Fremont County Board of Commissioners, GREAT PEAK HEALTHCARE SERVICES, P.C., Justin Green, Carrie Hammel, Raymond Herr, Andrea Hopkins, Nurse Kay, Stephen Kreuger, Brandon Lovato, Amanda Lucero, Kathleen Maestas, Ty Martin, Deputy Merlo, Jeremy Miller, Michael Moore, Natcore Healthcare Industries, Inc., Brandon O'Grady, Deputy Peters, John Rankin, Stephanie Repshire, John Ricci, Mackenzie Roquemore, Morgan Roquemore, Travis Taylor, Jaeson Watts (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6400997)Attorney Zachary Dwight Warren added to party Stephen Garrett(pty:pla), filed by Stephen Garrett. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Zachary) (Entered: 11/17/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?