Hadsall v. Richfield Hospitality, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:17-cv-03978
District Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 5:13 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jennifer A. Hadsall, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Chinyere Ohaeri +1 952 703 2886 +1 612 348 1785 chinyere.ohaeri@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tyler J Wiese +1 612 348 1784 +1 612 348 1785 tyler.wiese@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Richfield Hospitality, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Berens & Miller, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara P Berens +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 bberens@berensmiller.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Erin K Fogarty Lisle +1 612 349 6171 elisle@berensmiller.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stokes Wagner Hunt Maretz & Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Anne-Marie Mizel +1 412 521 6691 amizel@stokeswagner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Arch Y. Stokes +1 404 766 0076 +1 404 766 8823 astokes@stokeswagner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Karl Montague Terrell +1 404 766 0076 kterrell@stokeswagner.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss/General Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 2/20/2018. (TJB) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Letter re: withdrawal of motion re 4 MOTION to Expedite Petition for Injunction MOTION To Try Based on Administrative Record and Supplemental Evidence . (Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition for Injunctive Relief filed by Jennifer A. Hadsall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STATUS REPORT December 2017 by Jennifer A. Hadsall. (Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STATUS REPORT November 2017 by Jennifer A. Hadsall. (Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STATUS REPORT October 2017 by Jennifer A. Hadsall. (Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On September 29, 2017, the parties filed a Joint Motion to Hold Petition for Injunctive Relief in Abeyance. 19 This Joint Motion seeks to hold in abeyance Petitioners' petition for injunction, motion to expedite, and motion to try the matter based on the administrative record. Because Respondent entered a settlement stipulation that is pending the approval of the National Labor Relations Board, the parties' Joint Motion is GRANTED and the briefing schedule on the underlying petition is SUSPENDED. The parties shall file a monthly status report by the last day of each calendar month. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/02/2017. (TJB) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document Hold Petition for Injunctive Relief in Abeyance filed by Jennifer A. Hadsall, Richfield Hospitality, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Attachment A, # 2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    EXHIBIT T, U, V, W to Petitioner's Memorandum of Law re 1 Petition (in a Civil Case),. (Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Grant of Injunction 1 Petition (in a Civil Case),. (Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM re 1 Petition (in a Civil Case), for Injunction filed by Jennifer A. Hadsall. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karl M. Terrell for Richfield Hospitality, Inc.; and granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Arch Y. Stokes for Richfield Hospitality, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/13/2017. (JLW) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anne-Marie Mizel for Richfield Hospitality, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/12/2017. (JLW) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              TEXT ONLY ORDER: On August 25, 2017, Petitioner filed a petition for injunction, motion to expedite the petition, and motion to try the matter based on the administrative record. [1, 4] On Friday, September 8, 2017, Respondent answered the petition and filed a memorandum in opposition to the motion to expedite and try the matter based on the administrative record. [9, 10] The Court establishes the following briefing schedule for Petitioners petition for injunction, motion to expedite, and motion to try the matter based on the administrative record: Petitioner shall file its opening brief no later than Monday, September 18, 2017; Respondent shall file its opposition no later than Monday, October 2, 2017. The Court will schedule a hearing on this matter after reviewing the parties briefing. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/11/17. (JLS) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl M. Terrell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5710423 filed by Richfield Hospitality, Inc.. (Lisle, Erin) Modified text on 9/11/2017 (JLW). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Arch Y. Stokes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5710416 filed by Richfield Hospitality, Inc. (Lisle, Erin) Modified text on 9/11/2017 (JLW). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Expedite Petition for Injunction MOTION To Try Based on Administrative Record and Supplemental Evidence filed by Richfield Hospitality, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lisle, Erin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Petition for Injunction Under Sec. 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act filed by Richfield Hospitality, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B) (Lisle, Erin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anne Marie Mitzel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5709541 filed by Richfield Hospitality, Inc.. (Lisle, Erin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Arch Y. Stokes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5709529 filed by Richfield Hospitality, Inc.. (Lisle, Erin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl M. Terrell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5709518 filed by Richfield Hospitality, Inc.. (Lisle, Erin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION to Expedite Petition for Injunction, MOTION To Try Based on Administrative Record and Supplemental Evidence filed by Jennifer A. Hadsall. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 17-cv-3978 WMW/DTS. (ACH) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jennifer A. Hadsall for Petition for Injunction and related Exhibits (Ohaeri, Chinyere) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      PETITION for Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act against Richfield Hospitality, Inc., filed by Jennifer A. Hadsall. No summons requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Q, # 2 Exhibit(s) R(1), # 3 Exhibit(s) R(2), # 4 Exhibit(s) S, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Ohaeri, Chinyere) Modified text on 8/25/2017 (ACH). Modified text on 8/29/2017 (ACH). (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?