Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc. v. Agri Stats, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:18-cv-02405
District Judge John R. Tunheim, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 11:02 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY W. Joseph Bruckner +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 bruckwj@locklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian D Clark +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 bdclark@locklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth R. Odette +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 erodette@locklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Arielle S. Wagner +1 612 339 6900 aswagner@locklaw.com
v.
No Logo Agri Stats, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bowman and Brooke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard G. Morgan +1 612 672 3240 +1 612 672 3200 richard.morgan@bowmanandbrooke.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kim M. Schmid +1 612 339 8682 +1 612 672 3200 kim.schmid@msp.bowmanandbrooke.com

Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Justin W Bernick +1 202 637 5485 +1 202 637 5910 justin.bernick@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Fleury +1 713 632 1400 jennifer.fleury@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY William L Monts, III +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 william.monts@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Clemens Family Corporation, The, Defendant

Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bethany D Krueger +1 612 373 8353 +1 612 339 4181 bkrueger@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Virginia R McCalmont +1 612 373 8352 +1 612 373 0929 vmccalmont@greeneespel.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Christa Cynthia Cottrell +1 312 862 7075 +1 312 862 2200 ccottrell@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Edward Laytin +1 312 861 2198 +1 312 660 0171 dlaytin@kirkland.com
No Logo Clemens Food Group, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bethany D Krueger +1 612 373 8353 +1 612 339 4181 bkrueger@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Virginia R McCalmont +1 612 373 8352 +1 612 373 0929 vmccalmont@greeneespel.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Christa Cynthia Cottrell +1 312 862 7075 +1 312 862 2200 ccottrell@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Edward Laytin +1 312 861 2198 +1 312 660 0171 dlaytin@kirkland.com
No Logo Hormel Foods Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Emily Elizabeth Chow +1 612 766 8012 +1 612 766 1600 emily.chow@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Craig S Coleman +1 612 766 6981 +1 612 766 1600 craig.coleman@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard A. Duncan +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 rduncan@faegre.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Isaac B Hall +1 612 766 7251 +1 612 766 1600 isaac.hall@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Daniel Van Oort +1 612 766 8138 +1 612 766 1600 aaron.vanoort@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bryan K. Washburn +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 bryan.washburn@faegrebd.com
No Logo Hormel Foods, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Indiana Packers Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jaime Stilson +1 612 492 6746 +1 612 677 3843 stilson.jaime@dorsey.com

Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert E Entwisle +1 312 701 8151 +1 312 706 9305 rentwisle@mayerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Britt M. Miller - NOT SWORN +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8763 bmiller@mayerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY William H. Stallings +1 202 263 3807 +1 202 830 0328 wstallings@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Jbs Usa Food Company, Defendant

Represented by Felhaber Larson Fenlon & Vogt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Donald G. Heeman +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 dheeman@felhaber.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Robert Moses Haller +1 612 373 8539 +1 612 338 0535 dhaller@felhaber.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica J Nelson +1 612 339 6321 jnelson@felhaber.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Randi J Winter +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 rwinter@felhaber.com
No Logo Jbs Usa Food Company Holdings, Defendant

Represented by Felhaber Larson Fenlon & Vogt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Donald G. Heeman +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 dheeman@felhaber.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Robert Moses Haller +1 612 373 8539 +1 612 338 0535 dhaller@felhaber.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica J Nelson +1 612 339 6321 jnelson@felhaber.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Randi J Winter +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 rwinter@felhaber.com
Mitsubishi Corporation Mitsubishi Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitsubishi Corporation (Americas)"
No Logo Seaboard Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William L Greene +1 612 335 1568 +1 612 335 1657 william.greene@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J Schwingler +1 612 335 1564 +1 612 335 1657 peter.schwingler@stinson.com
No Logo Seaboard Foods LLC, Defendant
Officer/Director, Caravel Holdings LLC
Officer/Director, Seaboard Corp /de/

Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William L Greene +1 612 335 1568 +1 612 335 1657 william.greene@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J Schwingler +1 612 335 1564 +1 612 335 1657 peter.schwingler@stinson.com
No Logo Smithfield Foods, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Psf Group Holdings Inc

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Lipton +1 202 955 8226 +1 202 530 9536 jlipton@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard G. Parker +1 202 955 8503 rparker@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIAN E. ROBISON +1 214 698 3370 +1 214 999 7770 BRobison@gibsondunn.com

Represented by Larkin, Hoffman, Daly & Lindgren, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John A Cotter +1 952 896 3340 +1 952 896 1599 jcotter@larkinhoffman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Anders Kvinge +1 652 896 1554 +1 952 842 1740 jkvinge@larkinhoffman.com
No Logo Triumph Foods, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron B Chapin +1 312 655 1500 aaron.chapin@huschblackwell.com
Tyson Foods, Inc. Tyson Foods, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Powell Graham +1 612 607 7317 +1 612 607 7100 dgraham@dykema.com

Represented by Law Offices of Chad A. Landmon (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel Johanna Adcox +1 202 912 4700 +1 202 912 4701 radcox@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Felix John Gilman +1 212 728 2234 +1 212 728 2201 fgilman@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan Justl +1 212 728 2200 jjustl@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh +1 202 912 4700 trider@axinn.com
No Logo Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Powell Graham +1 612 607 7317 +1 612 607 7100 dgraham@dykema.com

Represented by Law Offices of Chad A. Landmon (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel Johanna Adcox +1 202 912 4700 +1 202 912 4701 radcox@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Felix John Gilman +1 212 728 2234 +1 212 728 2201 fgilman@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan Justl +1 212 728 2200 jjustl@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh +1 202 912 4700 trider@axinn.com
No Logo Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Powell Graham +1 612 607 7317 +1 612 607 7100 dgraham@dykema.com

Represented by Law Offices of Chad A. Landmon (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel Johanna Adcox +1 202 912 4700 +1 202 912 4701 radcox@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Felix John Gilman +1 212 728 2234 +1 212 728 2201 fgilman@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan Justl +1 212 728 2200 jjustl@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh +1 202 912 4700 trider@axinn.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 15
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jennifer A. Fleury for Agri Stats, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/27/2018. (JLW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order of EntryCourt Filing
    FILED IN ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY. INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/21/2018. (kt) Modified on 9/24/2018 (kt). (Entered: 09/21/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
      INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/21/2018. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB et al.(JMK) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William Leitzsey Monts, III for Agri Stats, Inc.; granting 49 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Justin Bernick for Agri Stats, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/21/18. (NMJ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justing Bernick. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6385008 filed by Agri Stats, Inc.. (Schmid, Kim) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer Fleury. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6384904 filed by Agri Stats, Inc.. (Schmid, Kim) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William Monts III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6384821 filed by Agri Stats, Inc.. (Schmid, Kim) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Gene Summerlin, Marnie Jensen, Ryann Glenn, Kamron Hasan, Quinn Eaton, Anne Lee, as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms. (lmb) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                  ORDER on Stipulation to Accept Service of First Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint ((70 in 0:18-cv-02044-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (74 in 0:18-cv-02008-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (78 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (73 in 0:18-cv-01891-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (65 in 0:18-cv-02390-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (93 in 0:18-cv-01803-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (69 in 0:18-cv-02058-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (63 in 0:18-cv-01946-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (74 in 0:18-cv-01810-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (43 in 0:18-cv-02405-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (47 in 0:18-cv-02337-JRT-HB) Stipulation, (58 in 0:18-cv-02113-JRT-HB) Stipulation): All Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the CACs by October 23, 2018. See the order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/12/2018. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB et al.(JMK) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 43 Stipulation. (Stilson, Jaime) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      STIPULATION by Indiana Packers Corporation. Jointly Signed by all Plaintiffs and all Defendants. (Stilson, Jaime) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                        ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2405 JRT/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge Paul A. Magnuson, and Judge David S. Doty on 9/6/2018, and by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 9/7/18. (kt) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica J Nelson on behalf of JBS USA Food Company, JBS USA Food Company Holdings. (Nelson, Jessica) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Hormel Foods Corporation. (Duncan, Richard) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A Duncan on behalf of Hormel Foods Corporation. (Duncan, Richard) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard G Morgan on behalf of Agri Stats, Inc.. (Morgan, Richard) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kim M Schmid on behalf of Agri Stats, Inc.. (Schmid, Kim) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Itoham Foods, Incorporated is a corporate parent of Defendant Indiana Packers Corporation. Mitsubishi Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Indiana Packers Corporation. Mitsubishi Corporation (Americas) is a corporate parent of Defendant Indiana Packers Corporation. (Stilson, Jaime) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel E Laytin for The Clemens Family Corporation and for Clemens Food Group, LLC.; granting 34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christa C Cottrell for The Clemens Family Corporation and for Clemens Food Group, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/24/2018. (JGK) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christa C. Cottrell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6331828 filed by Clemens Family Corporation, The, Clemens Food Group, LLC. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel E. Laytin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6331825 filed by Clemens Family Corporation, The, Clemens Food Group, LLC. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. The Clemens Family Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Clemens Food Group, LLC. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Clemens Family Corporation, The. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Johnson on behalf of Clemens Family Corporation, The, Clemens Food Group, LLC. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert Entwisle for Indiana Packers Corporation.; granting 27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Britt M Miller for Indiana Packers Corporation.; granting 28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William Stallings for Indiana Packers Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/24/2018. (JGK) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William H. Stallings. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6329531 filed by Indiana Packers Corporation. (Stilson, Jaime) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Britt M. Miller. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6329518 filed by Indiana Packers Corporation. (Stilson, Jaime) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert E. Entwisle. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6329505 filed by Indiana Packers Corporation. (Stilson, Jaime) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Stilson on behalf of Indiana Packers Corporation. (Stilson, Jaime) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rachel Johanna Adcox for Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., and for Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..; granting 19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Felix Gilman for Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., and for Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..; granting 20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan Justl for Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., and for Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..; granting 21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh for Tyson Foods, Inc. Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., and for Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/22/2018. (JGK) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Tyson Foods, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendants Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. Tyson Foods, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendants Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. (Graham, David) Modified on 8/24/2018 (MMP). (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6324360 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan M. Justl. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6324345 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Felix J. Gilman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6324328 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rachel J. Adcox. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6323425 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David P Graham on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc.. (Bruckner, W) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard G. Parker for Smithfield Foods, Inc..; granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian Edward Robison for Smithfield Foods, Inc..; granting 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joshua Lipton for Smithfield Foods, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/21/2018. (JGK) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. WH Group Limited is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua Lipton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6317807 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for 12 Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney: This entry was docketed into this case in error. (lmb)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ENTRY FILED IN ERROR. TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Bruce L. Simon; Neil Swartzberg; Clifford H. Pearson; Daniel Warshaw; Bobby Pouya; Michael H. Pearson; Arthur N. Bailey; Marco Cercone; Guido Saveri; R. Alexander Saveri; Cadio Zirpoli; Whitney E. Street; Stephen Teti; Linda P. Nussbaum; Bart D. Cohen; Fred T. Isquith as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms. (lmb) Modified on 8/17/2018 (lmb). (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian E. Robison. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6316203 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard G. Parker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6316183 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' against Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Indiana Packers Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, JBS USA Food Company Holdings, The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Mitsubishi Corporation (Americas), filed by Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc. No summons requested. (Clark, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John Anders Kvinge on behalf of Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Kvinge, John) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John A Cotter on behalf of Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Burton LeBlanc, W. Scott Simmer, Robert G. Eisler as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms. (kt) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (kt) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Indiana Packers Corporation, JBS USA, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. (kt) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Antitrust/Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-2405 SRN/HB. (kt) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Indiana Packers Corporation, JBS USA, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6310925) filed by Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bruckner, W) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?