Fernandes v. Softworld, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-13810
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 4:01 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Angela Fernandes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Angela Fernandes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela Fernandes +1 774 219 9827
v.
No Logo Alan Sarasohn, Defendant
No Logo Softworld, Inc, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Angela Fernandes, FILED. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to Alan Sarasohn, Softworld, Inc. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Caruso, Stephanie) Modified on 11/12/2015 (Caruso, Stephanie). Summons mailed to Plaintiff. (Entered: 11/12/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number 1BST052654 for 1 Complaint (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            COMPLAINT against Alan Sarasohn, Softworld, Inc, filed by Angela Fernandes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 14 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?