Bautista Colli Colli v. QK Holdings, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00172
District Judge Anna J. Brown, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 3:12 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Juan Bautista Colli Colli, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark G. Hansen +1 503 753 9125 mark.g.hansen@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
v.
No Logo QK Holdings, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Juan Bautista Colli Colli (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued Electronically as to QK Holdings, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dsg) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/3/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/6/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 7/6/2015. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (dsg) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3995633 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Juan Bautista Colli Colli against QK Holdings, LLC d/b/a Denny's (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 0 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?