Tucson Medical Center v. Purdue Pharma LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00532
District Judge Raner C Collins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 24, 2019 at 4:16 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tucson Medical Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Louis M Bograd +1 202 386 9623 +1 202 232 5513 lbograd@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Speights & Worrich LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Mitchell +1 303 662 8082 sam@mitchellspeights.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven C Mitchell +1 602 244 1520 +1 602 267 9394 steve@mitchellspeights.com
v.
No Logo Abbott Laboratories, Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Abbott Laboratories Incorporated"
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Actavis Pharma Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jay A Fradkin +1 602 262 5921 +1 602 495 2621 JFradkin@jsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John James Kastner, Jr. +1 520 618 1051 +1 520 618 1071 jkastner@jsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven J. Boranian +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 sboranian@reedsmith.com
No Logo AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Anda, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Anda Incorporated"
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Cardinal Health Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Teresa Carey Chow +1 310 979 8458 +1 310 820 8859 tchow@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Cephalon Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
No Logo Depomed, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Depomed Incorporated"
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Endo Health Solutions Incorporated"
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated"
No Logo H. D. Smith, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Henry Schein, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Henry Schein Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by hrtucson.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Weisman +1 520 881 6607 +1 520 881 6775 sara@hrtucson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY C. Scott Jones +1 214 740 8761 +1 214 756 8761 sjones@lockelord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John P. McDonald +1 214 740 8000 +1 214 740 8800 jpmcdonald@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord LLP - Dallas, TX

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brandan J Montminy +1 214 740 8000 +1 214 740 8800
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Insys Therapeutics Incorporated"
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated"
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated"
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Noramco Incorporated"
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated"
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine L Benveniste +1 480 606 5100 +1 480 606 5101 kate.benveniste@dlapiper.com
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Officially listed as "Purdue Pharma Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine L Benveniste +1 480 606 5100 +1 480 606 5101 kate.benveniste@dlapiper.com
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine L Benveniste +1 480 606 5100 +1 480 606 5101 kate.benveniste@dlapiper.com
No Logo Specgx LLC, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Watson Laboratories Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's 6 Emergency Motion to Remand and for Sanctions is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The request for remand is GRANTED, and the request for sanctions and/or fees is DENIED. Defendants' 9 Motion to Stay Proceedings is DENIED. This action is remanded to The Superior Court of Pima County, Arizona. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close the Court's file in this matter. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 12/18/18. (Attachments: # 1 Remand Letter) (BAC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Marie Vitale on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Cephalon Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Louis M Bograd on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L Benveniste on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated, Purdue Pharma Incorporated, Purdue Pharma LP. (Benveniste, Katherine) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE re: 25 Notice (Other) Notice of Response To AmerisourceBergen's Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Stipulation to Stay, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ABDC Consent to Remand)(Mitchell, Steven) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE re: Supplemental Citations by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation re: 21 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand and for Sanctions. (Kastner, John) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY to Response to Motion re: 6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Sanctions filed by Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mitchell, Steven) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Teresa C Chow on behalf of defendant Cardinal Health Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument on Plaintiff, Tucson Medical Center's 6 Emergency Motion to Remand and for Sanctions, and Distributor Defendants 9 Motion to Stay shall occur on 11/26/18 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Raner C. Collins. Should any party desire to participate telephonically, they are directed to email the Court's law clerk, Tanya Miller on or before 11/19/18. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 11/14/18.(BAC) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  STIPULATION to Continue Oral Argument by Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Steven) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re: 6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Sanctions filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Kastner, John) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Samuel F Mitchell on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re: 9 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kastner, John) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Steven James Boranian on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's 11 Motion to Expedite is GRANTED IN PART. The Court will order expedited briefing and oral argument: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's 6 Emergency Motion to Remand and for Sanctions shall be filed on or before 11/13/18. Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Motion to Remand and for Sanctions shall be filed on or before 11/16/18. Oral argument on Plaintiff's 6 Emergency Motion to Remand and for Sanctions and Defendants' 9 Motion to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL will occur on 11/21/18 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Raner C. Collins. Should any party desire to participate telephonically, they are directed to email the law clerk on or before 11/13/18. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 11/6/18. (BAC) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Weisman on behalf of Henry Schein Incorporated. (Weisman, Adam) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER pursuant to 13 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. IT IS ORDERED Manufacturer Defendants and Distributor Defendants shall have through and including 30 days after the later of this Court's ordering remanding the case to state court; this Court's ruling on the Motion to Stay; or the entry of a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action (or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL), to move, answer, and otherwise respond to the Complaint. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 11/2/18.(BAC) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re: 11 Emergency MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING AND RULING ON PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO REMAND AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mitchell, Steven) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re: 11 Emergency MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING AND RULING ON PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO REMAND AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kastner, John) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Errata re: 13 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer and Respond to Complaint)(Kastner, John) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: 1 Notice of Remove RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kastner, John) *Modified to correct reference to related case on 11/2/2018 (MFR). (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDERED that this matter s reassigned to the Honorable Raner C Collins. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 10/31/2018. (BAR) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Emergency MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING AND RULING ON PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO REMAND AND FOR SANCTIONS by Tucson Medical Center. (Mitchell, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE to Motion re: 9 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Distributor Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Mitchell, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kastner, John) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE re: Notice of Related Cases LRCiv 3.7 by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation re: 1 Notice of Removal . (Kastner, John) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tucson Medical Center. (Mitchell, Steven) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      *Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand and For Sanctions by Tucson Medical Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Mitchell, Steven) *Modified to remove motion part and to modify docket text for clarity on 10/31/2018 (KAH). (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        *Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Kastner, John) *Document filed without case number; attorney notified on 10/31/2018 (KAH). (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (MFR) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16133027. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-0532-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, H.D. Smith LLC, Endo Health Solutions Incorporated and Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC on 10/11/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/15/2018); Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Allergan PLC, Actavis LLC, Cephalon Incorporated, Anda Incorporated, Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated and Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated on 10/11/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/17/2018); Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Actavis Pharma Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated on 10/10/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/18/2018); Amended Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Abbott Laboratories, Purdue Pharma LP, Henry Schein Incorporated, Cardinal Health Incorporated, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Insys Therapeutics Incorporated and Abbott Laboratories Incorporated on 10/10/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/18/2018); Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Specgx LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC and Mallinckrodt PLC on 10/11/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/19/2018); Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Depomed Incorporated and Noramco Incorporated on 10/15/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/23/2018); Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, Complaint and Motion to Designate Action as Complex upon Purdue Pharma Incorporated and Purdue Frederick Company Incorporated on 10/11/2018 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/23/2018). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. Modified on 10/30/2018 (MFR).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20184991. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16133027 filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Kastner, John) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(MFR) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?