Bhutta v. Grossman
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-04877

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 10, 2019 at 12:41 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mohammad B Bhutta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dahiya Law Offices, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karamvir S Dahiya +1 212 766 8000 +1 212 766 8001 karam@legalpundit.com
No Logo Popular Contracting Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dahiya Law Offices, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karamvir S Dahiya +1 212 766 8000 +1 212 766 8001 karam@legalpundit.com
No Logo Shazaad B. Bhutta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dahiya Law Offices, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karamvir S Dahiya +1 212 766 8000 +1 212 766 8001 karam@legalpundit.com
v.
No Logo Alan Grossman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alan Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Grossman +1 631 205 9641
No Logo Metropolitan Commercial Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Moritt, Hock & Hamroff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert S. Cohen +1 516 873 2000 +1 516 873 2010 rcohen@moritthock.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Justin Ginsberg +1 516 873 2000 +1 516 873 2010 sginsberg@moritthock.com
No Logo New York City School Construction Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Marie Stecura +1 212 356 3199 cstecura@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/8/2019, Entered: None Hearing
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER converting Metropolitan Commercial Bank's 23 MOTION to Dismiss to a motion for summary judgment returnable on 2/19/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Discovery shall be expedited. The magistrate judge shall fix the briefing schedule and may adjourn the motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 1/11/2019. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MOTION to Dismiss by Metropolitan Commercial Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert S. Cohen, # 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert S. Cohen, # 3 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Metropolitan Commercial Bank's Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Declaration of Service) (Cohen, Robert) Modified on 1/16/2019 to update event, as motion 23 has been converted to a motion for summary judgment, per Judge Weinstein's 24 Order (Barrett, C). (Entered: 01/04/2019)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER. The court will hear Defendant New York City School Construction Authority's motion to dismiss on 2/19/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiffs' response will be due 1/25/2019, and Defendant's reply will be due 2/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 12/11/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Order
              First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Rule 12(b)(6) by New York City School Construction Authority. (Stecura, Christine) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Rule 12(b)(6) by New York City School Construction Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Affidavit of Service) (Stecura, Christine) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Commercial Bank. (Ginsberg, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Alan Grossman. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      COURT ORDER ON CASE FILING. Magistrate Judge Kuo is respectfully requested to expedite. Respectfully referred to the Magistrate Judge for: expedition discovery, settlement. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/26/2018. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Commercial Bank identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Bank Holding Corp. for Metropolitan Commercial Bank. (Ginsberg, Stephen) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Commercial Bank. (Ginsberg, Stephen) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Justin Ginsberg on behalf of Metropolitan Commercial Bank (aty to be noticed) (Ginsberg, Stephen) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Cohen on behalf of Metropolitan Commercial Bank (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammad B Bhutta, Popular Contracting Inc., Shazaad B. Bhutta. Alan Grossman served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammad B Bhutta, Popular Contracting Inc., Shazaad B. Bhutta. New York City School Construction Authority served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to File by New York City School Construction Authority. (Stecura, Christine) Modified on 10/26/2018 to reflect that this is a motion for extension of time to file Answer (Riquelme, Claudia). (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Marie Stecura on behalf of New York City School Construction Authority (aty to be noticed) (Stecura, Christine) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammad B Bhutta, Popular Contracting Inc., Shazaad B. Bhutta. Metropolitan Commercial Bank served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Summons Issued as to Alan Grossman, Metropolitan Commercial Bank, New York City School Construction Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Summons2, # 2 Summons3) (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Civil Cover Sheet.. Re 2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, Notice (Other), by Shazaad Bhutta, Mohammad B Bhutta, Popular contracting Inc. (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 09/02/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Proposed Summons. Re 1 Complaint, by Shazaad Bhutta, Mohammad B Bhutta, Popular contracting Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons Summons, # 2 Proposed Summons Summons) (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Civil Cover Sheet.. Re 1 Complaint, by Shazaad Bhutta, Mohammad B Bhutta, Popular contracting Inc. (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10687190 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Mohammad B Bhutta, Popular contracting Inc., Shazaad Bhutta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10B South before Judge Jack B. Weinstein. See 24 Order. (Barrett, C)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Metropolitan Commercial Bank to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 4, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/3/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to pro se Defendant Alan Grossman) (Riquelme, Claudia)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Metropolitan Commercial Bank to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to December 5, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/2/2018. (Riquelme, Claudia)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant New York City School Construction Authority to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to December 7, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/26/2018. (Riquelme, Claudia)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. (Williams, Erica)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Case Assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?