PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC v. KRYNSKI
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-03008
District Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 8, 2021 at 10:28 AM DT (23.9 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo COLTON COOPER, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLER MACALUSO LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernie W. +1 317 660 3400 +1 317 660 3401 too@kellermacaluso.com
No Logo JAMISON M. KRYNSKI, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLER MACALUSO LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernie W. +1 317 660 3400 +1 317 660 3401 too@kellermacaluso.com
No Logo RPG ENERGY GROUP, INC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLER MACALUSO LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernie W. +1 317 660 3400 +1 317 660 3401 too@kellermacaluso.com
No Logo TYLER G. WELSH, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLER MACALUSO LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernie W. +1 317 660 3400 +1 317 660 3401 too@kellermacaluso.com
No Logo JEFFREY A. COLE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MORSE LAW FIRM PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Joseph Morse +1 317 686 1540 +1 317 686 1541 morse@mflawpc.com
No Logo ENVELOP GROUP, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by RILEY BENNETT & EGLOFF LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen I. Hart +1 317 955 7134 +1 317 955 7174 khart@rbelaw.com
No Logo PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by RILEY BENNETT & EGLOFF LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen I. Hart +1 317 955 7134 +1 317 955 7174 khart@rbelaw.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/8/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/30/2021, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/23/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/5/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/5/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/26/2020, Entered: None BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/26/2020, Entered: None Judgment on Partial Findings
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/26/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/26/2020, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/26/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Summons (proposed)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Parties First Extension of Time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/22/2020, Entered: None Summons (proposed)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/15/2020, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/15/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Parties First Extension of Time
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/18/2020, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/18/2020, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/22/2020, Entered: None Continuance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/1/2020, Entered: None Submission
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/31/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against ENVELOP GROUP, LLC, PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC, filed by RPG ENERGY GROUP, INC., JAMISON M. KRYNSKI, TYLER G. WELSH, COLTON COOPER.(Keller, Bernie) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2019 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/4/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to 12/17/2018 for the defendants to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/19/2018. (CBU) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/17/2018, filed by Defendants COLTON COOPER, JAMISON M. KRYNSKI, RPG ENERGY GROUP, INC., TYLER G. WELSH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Second Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Keller, Bernie) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 15 SO ORDERED AND APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/9/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiffs ENVELOP GROUP, LLC, PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Hart, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time
                                                                            NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant JEFFREY A. COLE. (Morse, John) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Morse on behalf of Defendant JEFFREY A. COLE. (Morse, John) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jeffrey A. Cole on October 29, 2018, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hart, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jamison M. Krynski, RPG Energy Group, Inc., Colton Cooper, Tyler G. Welsh on 10/5/18, 10/5/18, 10/6/18, 10/8/18, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hart, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by RPG ENERGY GROUP, INC.. (Keller, Bernie) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                      NOTICE of Automatic Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading, filed by Defendants COLTON COOPER, JAMISON M. KRYNSKI, RPG ENERGY GROUP, INC., TYLER G. WELSH (Keller, Bernie) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Bernie W. (Too) Keller on behalf of Defendants COLTON COOPER, JAMISON M. KRYNSKI, RPG ENERGY GROUP, INC., TYLER G. WELSH. (Keller, Bernie) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen I. Hart on behalf of Plaintiffs ENVELOP GROUP, LLC, PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC. (Hart, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                            MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                              Summons Issued as to JEFFREY A. COLE, COLTON COOPER, JAMISON M. KRYNSKI, RPG ENERGY GROUP, INC., TYLER G. WELSH. (HET) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVELOP GROUP, LLC. (Hart, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC. (Hart, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen I. Hart on behalf of Plaintiffs ENVELOP GROUP, LLC, PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC. (Hart, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES DUE TO TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION, RACKETEERING, COMPUTER TRESPASS, THEFT, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE, AND OTHER WRONGFUL CONDUCT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5087476) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Employment Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2: Operating Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 3: Handbook, # 4 Exhibit 4: Suspension Notice, # 5 Exhibit 5: Push-Pull Option Notice, # 6 Exhibit 6: Notice of Election to Purchase, # 7 Exhibit 7: Confidentiality Conditions and Agreement, # 8 Exhibit 8: Articles of Incorporation, # 9 Exhibit 9: Employment Offer, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Proposed Summons)(Hart, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?