Unknown Case Title
Federal Civil Lawsuit Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. 2:13-cv-20000
District Judge R David Proctor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 6:18 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/25/2014 Anu M Brady +1 205 939 0199 +1 205 939 0399 brady3104@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory L Davis +1 334 832 9080 +1 334 409 7001 gldavis@knology.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald F. Easter +1 901 575 9998 jerryeaster1@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Gurley, Jr. +1 205 908 6512 +1 866 747 3905 mgurleyjr@yahoo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa N Hayes +1 334 707 1911 lnh8803@bellsouth.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet Brooks Holmes +1 803 256 4645 +1 803 465 1839 janetholmes1@mac.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Doyle Nalley +1 501 315 7491 johndoylenalley@hotmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick James Quinlan +2231 223 223 1401 quinlaw@verizon.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee McArthur Scott +1 850 819 7833 +1 850 784 7706 nscott0418@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Shane Seaborn +1 334 775 9778 +1 334 775 9779 sseaborn1@yahoo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Kirk Wood, Jr. +1 205 612 0243 +1 866 747 3905 ekirkwood1@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by ARTZ HEALTH LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL J. MCCARRIE +1 267 886 1852 mjm@artzhealthlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Axelrod & Dean, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT J. AXELROD +1 646 448 5263 +6611 661 661 1373 rjaxelrod@axelroddean.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenton W. Cole +1 601 969 4677 +1 601 714 9977 bcole@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin L Barnes Attorney @ Counselor at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin L Barnes +1 405 330 9860 +1 405 231 4701 bb@bbarneslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Boies, II +1 914 749 8200 +1 914 749 8300 dboies@bsfllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/12/2014 Tanya S. Chutkan +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 tchutkan@bsfllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Alan Feinstein +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 rfeinstein@bsfllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Issacson +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 wisaacson@bsfllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Simpson Kiernan +1 202 895 5240 +1 202 237 6131 kkiernan@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VAN BUNCH +1 602 274 1100 +1 602 274 1199 vbunch@bffb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bronster Hoshibata, Attorneys at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margery S Bronster +1 808 524 5644 +1 808 599 1881 mbronster@bhhawaii.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rex Y. Fujichaku +5991 599 599 1881 rfujichaku@bhhawaii.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Hatch +1 808 524 5644 +1 808 599 1881 rhatch@bhhawaii.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Brunini Grantham et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Patrick McDowell +1 601 948 3101 pmcdowell@brunini.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BUNCH & JAMES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joey K James +1 256 764 0095 +1 256 767 5705 stacy@bunchandjames.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BURKE HARVEY & FRANKOWSKI LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Allen Schreiber +1 205 930 8144 +1 205 930 9054 aschreiber@bhflegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke Harvey, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C Allen +1 205 930 9091 +1 205 930 9054 aallen@burkeharvey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter H Burke +1 205 930 9091 +1 205 930 9054 pburke@burkeharvey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Snow, LLP (Nash)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/08/2013 Randall D Noel +1 901 680 7346 +1 901 680 7201 randy.noel@butlersnow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick E Cafferty +1 734 769 2144 pcafferty@caffertyclobes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan L. Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@caffertyclobes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen Meriwether +1 215 864 2144 +1 215 864 2810 emeriwether@caffertyclobes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CARBY & CARBY PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edgar Hyde Carby +1 601 445 5011 +1 601 445 5033 hcarby@carbylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip E Carby +1 601 445 5011 +1 601 445 5033 pcarby@carbylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson Lynch Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edwin John Kilpela, Jr. +1 412 322 9243 +1 412 231 0246 ekilpela@carlsonlynch.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J Sweet +1 412 322 9243 +1 412 231 0246 bsweet@carlsonlynch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carroll Warren & Parker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob T. E. Stutzman +1 601 592 1010 +1 601 592 6060 jstutzman@cwplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L. Warren, III +1 601 592 1010 +1 601 592 6060 jwarren@cwplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAPMAN, LEWIS & SWAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph H Webster +1 662 627 4105 +1 662 621 2538 harland@chapman-lewis-swan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura M Alexander +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lalexander@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meghan M Boone +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mboone@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL A. SMALL +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 dsmall@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson Crowder & DeGaris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive) Anna Louise Hart +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ahart@cwcd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ddellaccio@corywatson.com
TERMINATED: 02/01/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Wade Pittman +1 205 271 7123 +1 205 324 7896 apittman@corywatson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COWAN LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Christopher Cowan +1 214 826 1900 +1 214 826 8900 CHRIS@COWANLAW.NET

Toggle Switch Represented by degarislaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley H. DeGaris +1 205 281 5185 adegaris@degarislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DONALDSON & GUIN LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy McClendon Stokes +1 205 226 2282 +1 205 226 2357 tammys@dglawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Star Mishkel Tyner +1 205 225 2282 +1 205 226 2357 start@dglawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles R Watkins +1 312 878 8391 +1 312 663 0303 charlesw@dglawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Wylie +1 312 878 8391 +1 312 663 0303 johnw@dglawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dyke, Henry, Goldsholl & Winzerling, P.L.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell Lloyd Berry +1 501 661 1000 +1 501 661 1100 mberry@dhgw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Eyster Key Tubb Roth Middleton & Adams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James G Adams, Jr. +1 256 353 6761 +1 256 353 6767 jgadams@eysterkey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ta'Kisha L Guster +1 256 353 6761 +1 256 353 6767 tguster@eysterkey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Smeds Roth +1 256 353 6761 +1 256 353 5224 jroth@eysterkey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas B Roth +1 256 353 6761 +1 256 353 6767 nbroth@eysterkey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foote, Mielke, Chavez & O'Neil LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Currie Chavez +1 630 232 4480 +1 630 232 7452 kcc@fmcolaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Foote +1 630 232 7450 +1 630 232 7452 rmf@fmcolaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J Herman +1 630 232 7450 +1 630 232 7452 mjh@fmcolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Giarmarco Mullins & Horton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Horton +1 248 457 7000 +1 248 457 7001 bhorton@gmhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GORDON BALL LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gordon Ball +1 865 525 7028 +1 865 525 4679 gball@gordonball.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G. Eisler +1 302 622 7000 +1 302 622 7100 reisler@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray & White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark K. Gray +1 502 805 1800 +1 502 618 4059 mgray@grayandwhitelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GUIN STOKES & EVANS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Guin +1 205 226 2282 +1 205 226 2357 davidg@gseattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen M. Ahrens +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Gustafson +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 dgustafson@gustafsongluek.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Hedlund +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 dhedlund@gustafsongluek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Nash Bailey, Jr. +1 415 633 1908 +1 415 358 4980 abailey@hausfeldllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Butterfield +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 wbutterfield@hausfeldllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Hausfeld +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 MHausfeld@hausfeld.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan Elizabeth Jones +1 415 633 1908 +1 415 358 4980 mjones@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hendren & Malone, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Michael Malone +1 919 573 1423 +1 919 420 0475 mmalone@hendrenmalone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin W Bernick +1 202 637 5485 +1 202 637 5910 justin.bernick@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Michael Trucksess +1 703 610 6181 +1 703 610 6200 thomas.trucksess@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by holtonlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Holton +1 901 523 2222 +1 901 523 2232 jholton@holtonlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy R. Holton +1 901 523 2222 tholton@holtonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter E Boivin +1 313 465 7368 pboivin@honigman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Ettinger +1 313 465 7000 dettinger@honigman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lara F. Phillip +1 313 465 7000 +1 313 465 7519 lara.phillip@honigman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Itsukushima, Keiji

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/08/2013 Amy Pepke +1 901 680 7324 +1 901 680 7201

Toggle Switch Represented by Jinks, Crow &Dickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Diane Crow +1 334 738 4225 +1 334 738 4229 ccrow@jinkslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan A Dickson, II +1 334 738 4225 +1 334 738 4229 NDickson@jinkslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn Wilson Jinks, III +1 334 738 4225 +1 334 738 4229 ljinks@jinkslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by JOHN C DAVIS PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Clark Davis +1 850 222 4770 +1 850 222 3119 john@johndavislaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by JOHN D SAXON PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Smith Cude +1 205 397 1030 +1 205 323 1583 dcude@saxonattorneys.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John David Saxon +1 205 324 0223 +1 205 323 1583 jsaxon@saxonattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones & Swartz PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce C Jones +1 208 489 8989 +1 208 489 8988 bruce@jonesandswartzlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric B Swartz +1 208 489 8989 +1 208 489 8988 eric@jonesandswartzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Ward PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Lee Jones, II +1 502 882 6000 +1 502 587 2002 larry@jonesward.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Javier Asis Lopez +1 305 372 1800 +1 305 372 3508 jal@kttlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gail Ann McQuilkin +1 305 372 1800 +3723 372 372 3508 gam@kttlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harley Shepard Tropin +1 305 372 1800 +1 305 372 3508 hst@kttlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LANGSTON & LOTT, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey L Lott +1 662 728 9733 +1 662 728 1992 clott@langstonlott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Darrell Thomas Johnson , Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Ernest Akins +1 843 757 7574 +1 843 757 7601 dakins@hargray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David Balto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Balto +1 205 789 5424 +1 202 789 1819 david.balto@dcantitrustlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley A Wasser +1 202 789 5424 +1 202 789 1819 brad.wasser@dcantitrustlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ELIZABETH J BONDURANT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Reis +1 704 384 2692 +1 704 334 3351 john.reis@smithmoorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of M. Stephen Dampier, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Stephen Dampier +1 251 929 0800 +1 251 929 0900 stevedampier@dampierlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stephen M Hansen PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M Hansen +1 253 302 5955 steve@stephenmhansenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Wilson Daniel Miles , III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew England Brashier +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 Andrew.Brashier@beasleyallen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Diane Gilliland +1 224 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 rebecca.gilliland@beasleyallen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Archie I. Grubb, II +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 archie.grubb@beasleyallen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wilson Daniel Miles, III +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 dee.miles@beasleyallen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lemmon Law Firm (Hahnville)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Allen Lemmon +1 985 783 6789 +1 985 783 1333 andrew@lemmonlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irma L. Netting +1 985 783 6789 +1 985 783 1333 irma@lemmonlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Middlebrooks & Mabie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia M. Buchanan +1 904 435 7023

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben W. Gordon, Jr. +1 850 434 0509 +1 850 436 6059 bgordon@levinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mandel & Mandel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Sudekum +1 314 621 1701 +1 314 621 4800 mike@mandelmandel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCallum Methvin & Terrell PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Warren McCallum +1 205 939 0199 +1 205 939 0399 pwm@mmlaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R G Methvin, Jr. +1 205 939 0199 +1 205 939 0399 rgm@mmlaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Terrell +1 205 939 0199 +1 205 939 0399 jterrell@mmlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by McKay Cauthen Settana and Stubley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Temus C Miles, Jr. +1 803 256 4645

Toggle Switch Represented by MEANS GILLIS LAW LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry Lewis Gillis +1 334 270 1033 +1 334 260 9396 hlgillis@meansgillislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. Murphy +1 202 783 0010 +1 202 783 6088 mmurphy@mooneygreen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MORRIS KING & HODGE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Hodge +1 256 536 0588 +1 256 533 1504 lee@mkhlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NastLaw LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin C. Burns +1 215 923 9300 +1 215 923 9302 eburns@nastlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dianne M Nast +1 215 923 9300 +1 717 892 1200 dnast@nastlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley Baudin & Coffin - New Orleans

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Paul Baudin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 sbaudin@pbclawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Wayne Pendley +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 cyarbrough@pbclawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Ryan Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 nrockforte@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Penn & Seaborn LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles D Hudson +1 334 738 4486 +1 334 738 4432 charlie@pennandseaborn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W Partin +1 334 775 9778 +1 334 775 9779 will@pennandseaborn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Myron C. Penn +1 334 775 9778

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cory Bradley +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2811 pdh-efiling@pittmandutton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Podhurst Orseck, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gravante, III +1 305 358 2800 +1 305 358 2382 jgravante@podhurst.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Samuel Podhurst +1 305 358 2800 +1 305 358 2382 apodhurst@podhurst.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Prieto +1 305 358 2800 +1 305 358 2382 pprieto@podhurst.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Weinshall +1 305 358 2800 mweinshall@podhurst.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive) Don Brian Hufford +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 1373 dbhufford@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Preis Gordon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles M. Thompson +1 225 387 0707 +1 225 344 0510 matt@preislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Provosty & Gankendorff, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric R.G. Belin +1 504 410 2795 +1 504 410 2796 ebelin@provostylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edgar Dean Gankendorff +1 504 410 2795 +1 504 410 2796 egankendorff@provostylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by QUINN CONNOR WEAVER DAVIES & ROUCO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glen M Connor +1 205 870 9989 +1 205 803 4143 gconnor@qcwdr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Paul Rouco +1 205 803 4143 +1 205 328 9669 rrouco@qcwdr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reich & Binstock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra Brewer Hayes +1 713 622 7271 dhayes@dhayeslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Clinton Hunter +1 281 768 4731 +1 713 583 7047 chunter@reichandbinstock.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis C Reich +1 713 622 7271 +1 713 623 8724 dreich@reichandbinstock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett D. Blanchfield +1 651 287 2100 +1 651 287 2103 g.blanchfield@rwblawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saeed & Little, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Little +1 812 320 3367 +1 888 422 3151 jon@sllawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlichter, Bogard & Denton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy A. Doles +1 314 621 6115 tdoles@uselaws.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SCOTT & CAIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher T Cain +1 865 525 2150 +1 865 525 2120 cain@scottandcain.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas S Scott, Jr. +1 865 525 2150 +1 865 525 2120 scott@scottandcain.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaheen & Gordon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean T. O'Connell +1 603 749 5000 soconnell@shaheengordon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SHELBY RODEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Roden +1 204 933 8383

Toggle Switch Represented by Shrader & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Layne Stackhouse +1 713 782 0000 +1 713 571 9605 layne@shraderlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirote & Permutt -B'ham AL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry A Ragsdale +1 205 930 5100 +1 205 930 5101 bragsdale@sirote.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sommers, Schwartz, Silver & Schwartz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Kochanowski +1 248 355 0300 akochanowski@sommerspc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J. Stoops +1 248 355 0300 kstoops@sommerspc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason John Thompson +1 248 355 0300 +1 248 436 8453 jthompson@sommerspc.cm
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance C. Young +1 248 355 0300 lyoung@sommerspc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Stone +1 412 391 2005 +1 412 391 0853 astone@stone-law-firm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strom Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Preston Strom, Jr. +1 803 252 4800 +1 803 252 4801 petestrom@stromlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE FRANKOWSKI FIRM, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Stanislaw Frankowski +1 205 390 0399 +1 205 390 1001 richard@frankowskifirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Mason Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary E Mason +1 202 429 2290 +1 202 429 2294 gmason@wbmllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason R Rathod +1 202 429 2290 +1 202 429 2294 jrathod@wbmllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PITTMAN FIRM PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Wesley Pittman +1 904 784 9000 +1 850 763 6787 wes@pittmanfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by University Centre I

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL P. MCGARTLAND +1 817 332 9300 mike@mcgartland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Van Winkle, Buck, Wall, Starnes & Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Matthew Wilkerson +1 828 258 2991 +1 828 257 2767 dwilkerson@vwlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas V Bender +1 816 421 6620 +1 816 421 4747 tbender@wbsvlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WATSON MCKINNEY & ARTRIP LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herman Watson, Jr. +1 256 536 7423 +1 256 536 2689 watson@watsonmckinney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebekah Keith McKinney +1 256 536 7423 +1 256 536 2689 mckinney@watsonmckinney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WHATLEYKALLAS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W Tucker Brown +1 205 488 1200 +1 800 922 4851 tbrown@whatleykallas.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith M Kallas +1 212 447 7070 +1 212 447 7077 ekallas@whatleykallas.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry C Quillen +1 212 447 7060 +1 800 922 4851 hquillen@whatleykallas.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr. +1 800 695 6750 +1 800 922 4851 jwhatley@whatleykallas.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Winegard +1 404 607 8222 +1 404 607 8451 dwinegard@whatleykallas.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITE ARNOLD & DOWD PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Rogers Brown - PHV +1 205 323 1888 +1 205 323 8907 kbrown@waadlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED U. W. Clemon +1 205 323 1888 +1 205 323 8907 uwclemon@waadlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Augusta S Dowd +1 205 323 1888 +1 205 323 8907 adowd@waadlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda G Flippo +3238 323 323 8907 lflippo@whitearnolddowd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hope S Marshall +1 205 323 1888 +1 205 323 8907 hmarshall@whitearnolddowd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Mark White +1 205 323 1888 +1 205 323 8907 mwhite@whitearnolddowd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggins Childs Quinn & Pantazis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Clark +1 205 314 0500 +1 205 254 1500 Bclark@wigginschilds.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis G. Pantazis, Sr. +1 205 314 0531 +1 205 314 0731 dgp@wigginschilds.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM LTD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E Wojtalewicz +1 320 289 2363 +1 320 289 2369 brian@wojtalewiczlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by YUHL CARR LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tyler J Barnett +1 310 827 2800 +1 310 827 4200 tbarnett@yuhlcarr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P Carr +1 310 827 2800 +1 310 827 4200 jcarr@yuhlcarr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Spencer Kravitz +1 202 778 1873 +1 202 822 8106 ckravitz@zuckerman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Patrick Moylan , +1 410 949 1159 +1 410 659 0436 dmoylan@zuckerman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cyril V. Smith +1 410 332 0444 +1 410 659 0436 csmith@zuckerman.com
No Logo Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben W. Gordon, Jr. +1 850 434 0509 +1 850 436 6059 bgordon@levinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirote & Permutt -B'ham AL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry A Ragsdale +1 205 930 5100 +1 205 930 5101 bragsdale@sirote.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WATSON MCKINNEY & ARTRIP LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebekah Keith McKinney +1 256 536 7423 +1 256 536 2689 mckinney@watsonmckinney.com
v.
No Logo Anthem Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Bcbsm, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of WILLIAM B WAHLHEIM , JR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Stanley Burkhalter +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 cburkhalter@maynardcooper.com
No Logo Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Massachusetts, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Zott +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 david.zott@kirkland.com
No Logo BlueCross BlueShield of Florida, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Bluecross Blueshield Of Tennessee, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Blue Cross Blue Shield of Vermont, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lezlie Madden +1 215 665 7286 +1 215 701 2127 lmadden@cozen.com
No Logo Blue Shield of California, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIMBERLY REDMAN WEST +1 205 874 0352 +1 205 871 7534 kw@wallacejordan.com
No Logo Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Carefirst Of Maryland, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shamoun & Norman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian K Norman +1 214 987 1745 +1 214 521 9033 bkn@snlegal.com
No Logo CareFirst Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shamoun & Norman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian K Norman +1 214 987 1745 +1 214 521 9033 bkn@snlegal.com
No Logo Consortium Health Plans Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Zott +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 david.zott@kirkland.com
No Logo Defendants' Counsel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Antonio M. Clayton +1 225 344 7000 +1 225 383 7631 tclaytonlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams and Reese LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron G McLeod +1 205 250 5000 +1 205 250 5034 aaron.mcleod@arlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Ashford Rowe +1 205 250 5080 +1 205 250 5034 steve.rowe@arlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Armbrecht Jackson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H James Koch +1 251 405 1300 +1 251 432 6843 hjk@ajlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/24/2013 Andrew Wayne Martin, Jr. +1 251 405 1287 awm@ajlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenina Lee +1 202 912 4700 kjl@avhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Keith Andress +1 205 328 0480 +1 205 322 8007 kandress@bakerdonelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Mark Glover +1 901 526 2000 +1 901 577 2303 mglover@bakerdonelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley M Lowe +1 865 549 7000 +1 865 633 7207 alowe@bakerdonelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary C Shockley +1 615 726 5600 +1 615 744 5704 gshockley@bakerdonelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G. White +1 901 577 8182 +1 901 577 0724 mwhite@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP - Bir

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cavender C Kimble +1 205 226 3437 +1 205 488 5860 ckimble@balch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M Redgrave +1 202 681 2505 +1 612 332 8915 jredgrave@redgravellp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria Ann Redgrave +1 202 681 2505 +1 612 332 8915 jpmoore@redgravellp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bodman PLC - Tro/MI

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Lynn Cylkowski +1 313 392 1077 +1 313 259 7579 scylkowski@bodmanlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Gourley +1 313 392 1063 +1 313 393 7579 jgourley@bodmanlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan N Harris +1 734 761 3780 aharris@bodmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brooks Pierce

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER K. VAN ZANT +1 336 271 3132 +1 336 232 9132 jvanzant@brookspierce.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES T. WILLIAMS, JR. +1 336 271 3107 +1 336 232 9107 jwilliams@brookspierce.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brunini Grantham et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheri D. Green +1 601 948 3101 +1 601 960 6902 cgreen@brunini.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. David Kaufman +1 601 948 3101 dkaufman@brunini.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Patrick McDowell +1 601 948 3101 pmcdowell@brunini.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher A. Shapley +1 601 948 3101 cshapley@brunini.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Fuller Singley +1 662 240 9744 +1 662 240 4127 ssingley@brunini.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Snow, LLP (Nash)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/08/2013 Randall D Noel +1 901 680 7346 +1 901 680 7201 randy.noel@butlersnow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell, Guin, Williams, Guy & Gidiere

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew T Campbell +1 205 224 0750 todd.campbell@campbellguin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Phillip Campbell +1 205 224 0750 +1 205 383 2669 andy.campbell@campbellguin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yawanna Nabors McDonald +1 205 224 0756 +1 205 383 2646 yawanna.mcdonald@campbellguin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D Wadsworth +1 205 224 0750 stephen.wadsworth@campbellguin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles Andrew O'Brien, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Andrew O'Brien, III +1 225 295 2454 +1 225 297 2760 Andy.OBrien@bcbsla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Nunley Pham +1 225 295 2199 allison.pham@bcbsla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clayton and Fruge

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Paul Fruge' +1 225 344 7000 +1 225 383 7631 michaelfruge@claytonfrugelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MATTHEW BLEICH +1 215 665 6918 mbleich@cozen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL K. LEARY, JR. +1 215 665 6911 pleary@cozen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lezlie Madden +1 215 665 7286 +1 215 701 2127 lmadden@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowe & Dunlevy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Barnett LaBauve +1 405 239 6608 +1 405 272 5247 elizabeth.labauve@crowedunlevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Kent Meyers +1 405 235 7729 +1 405 272 5245 meyersd@crowedunlevy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew D. Kaplan +1 202 624 2699 +1 202 628 5116 akaplan@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder hcostello@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy A. Roman +1 202 624 2500 troman@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED April Nelson Ross +1 202 624 2500 aross@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen T Sooy +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 ksooy@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by EBERLE BERLIN KADING TURNBOW & MCKLVEEN, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel A Diddle +1 208 344 8535 +1 208 344 8542 sdiddle@eberle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Naranjo +1 415 434 4484 mnaranjo@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan D Rutenberg +1 202 672 5491 +1 202 672 5399 arutenberg@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HILL HILL CARTER FRANCO COLE & BLACK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela B Slate +1 334 834 7600 +1 334 386 4381 pslate@hillhillcarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F Leibenluft +1 202 637 5789 +1 202 637 5910

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED N Thomas Connally, III +1 703 610 6100 +1 703 610 6200 tom.connally@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Desmond Hogan +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 desmond.hogan@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A Jose +1 202 637 5460 +1 202 637 5910 elizabeth.jose@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Allen Loney +1 267 675 4677 +1 215 988 2757 stephen.loney@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID NEWMANN +1 267 675 4610 +1 267 675 4601 david.newmann@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Robert Robertson +1 202 637 5774 +1 202 637 5910 robby.robertson@hoganlovells.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily M. Yinger +1 703 610 6161 +1 703 610 6200 emily.yinger@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Bruce Hoffman +1 305 810 2500 +8102 810 810 2460 bhoffman@hunton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd M. Stenerson +1 202 955 1500 +1 202 788 2201 tstenerson@hunton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Howard Charnes +1 336 607 7382 +1 336 734 2602 acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Dwight Hansen +1 336 607 7352 +1 336 734 2780 ChadHansen@KilpatrickTownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Taylor, NCAED +1 336 607 7500 +1 336 607 7500 dantaylor@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica L. Bailey +1 312 861 7009 jessica.staiger@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian R. Conner , +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 ian.conner@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christa Cynthia Cottrell +1 312 862 7075 +1 312 862 2200 ccottrell@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Joy Donnell +1 312 862 7015 +1 312 862 2200 sarah.donnell@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey R. Fronk +1 312 862 2123 +1 312 862 2200 casey.fronk@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary D. Holmstead +1 312 862 2392 +1 312 862 2200 zachary.holmstead@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Edward Laytin +1 312 861 2198 +1 312 660 0171 dlaytin@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Edward McKane +1 415 439 1473 +1 415 439 1500 mmckane@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen Witt +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 hwitt@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica Zolner +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 erica.zolner@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Zott +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 david.zott@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gwendolyn C. Payton +1 206 223 7000 +1 206 223 7107 paytong@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin M. Wilson +1 206 223 7000 +1 206 223 7107 wilsonem@lanepowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Department, Blue Shield of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary C St John +1 415 229 5021 +1 415 229 5343 Marcy.St.John@blueshieldca.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Len Sweeris +1 415 229 5107 +1 415 229 5343 Charles.Sweeris@blueshieldca.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Chad A. Landmon (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Johanna Adcox +1 202 912 4700 +1 202 912 4701 radcox@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John DeQuedville Briggs +1 202 721 5400 +1 202 912 4701 JBriggs@axinn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ELIZABETH J BONDURANT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Reis +1 704 384 2692 +1 704 334 3351 john.reis@smithmoorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ROBERT F SPRINGFIELD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devin C. Dolive +1 205 251 3000 +1 205 458 5100 ddolive@burr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. London +1 205 458 5203 +1 205 458 5100 glondon@burr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of WILLIAM B WAHLHEIM , JR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Aquinas Malatesta, III +1 205 254 1180 +1 205 254 1999 jmalatesta@maynardcooper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Stanley Burkhalter +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 cburkhalter@maynardcooper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Priester +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 jpriester@maynardcooper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Mann Johnson +1 205 581 0700 +1 205 581 0799 jjohnson@lightfootlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kappel +1 205 581 0700 +1 205 581 0799 bkappel@lightfootlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MEANS GILLIS LAW LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Jordana Gillis +1 334 270 1033 +1 334 260 9396 kjgillis@meansgillislaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tyrone C Means +1 334 270 1033 +1 334 260 9396 tcmeans@meansgillislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Martin +1 803 255 9421 +1 803 256 7500 john.martin@nelsonmullins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips Lytle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Stephen Bloomberg +1 716 847 7096 +1 716 852 6100 ebloomberg@phillipslytle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEREMY D. FEINSTEIN +1 412 288 7972

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SHANNON ELISE MCCLURE +1 215 851 8226 +1 215 851 1420 smcclure@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reichard and Escalera

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez +1 787 777 8877 +1 787 765 4225 escalera@reichardescalera.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlos M. Hernandez-Burgos +1 787 777 8888 +1 787 765 4225 hernandezc@reichardescalera.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pedro Santiago-Rivera +1 787 765 4225 santiagopedro@reichardescalera.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shamoun & Norman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian K Norman +1 214 987 1745 +1 214 521 9033 bkn@snlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spotswood, Sansom & Sansbury, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Kerry Payne +1 205 986 3620 +1 205 986 3639 jpayne@spotswoodllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Todd Sansbury +1 205 986 3620 +9863 986 986 3639 msansbury@spotswoodllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Keeling Spotswood +1 205 986 3620 +1 205 986 3639 rks@spotswoodllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stites & Harbison, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglass Farnsley +1 502 587 3400 +1 502 587 6391 dfarnsley@stites.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Stone Campbell, III +1 225 387 3221 + 225 346 8049 johnstone.campbell@taylorporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L Adam Thames +1 225 381 0272 +1 225 346 8049 adam.thames@taylorporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WALLACE ELLIS FOWLER HEAD & JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Bentley Owens, III +1 205 669 6783 +1 205 669 4932 bowens@wefhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Montgomery Hogewood +1 205 870 0555 +1 205 871 7534 mhogewood@wallacejordan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIMBERLY REDMAN WEST +1 205 874 0352 +1 205 871 7534 kw@wallacejordan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/10/2014 Scott Andrew Irby +1 501 212 1359 sirby@wlj.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/10/2014 Gordon S. Rather, Jr. +1 501 371 0808 grather@wlj.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Haynes +1 502 562 7363 +1 502 589 0309 ghaynes@wyattfirm.com
No Logo Group Hospitalization And Medical Services,inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shamoun & Norman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian K Norman +1 214 987 1745 +1 214 521 9033 bkn@snlegal.com
No Logo Hawaii Medical Service Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Health Care Service Corporation and Caring for Montanan's, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIMBERLY REDMAN WEST +1 205 874 0352 +1 205 871 7534 kw@wallacejordan.com
No Logo Highmark, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIMBERLY REDMAN WEST +1 205 874 0352 +1 205 871 7534 kw@wallacejordan.com
No Logo Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo National Account Service LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Zott +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 david.zott@kirkland.com
No Logo Premera Blue Cross, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gwendolyn C. Payton +1 206 223 7000 +1 206 223 7107 paytong@lanepowell.com
No Logo Wellmark, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Craig Alan Hoover +1 202 637 5493 +1 202 637 5910 craig.hoover@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406, In Re
No Logo Special Master, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edgar C Gentle, III +1 205 716 3000 +1 205 716 2364 escrowagen@aol.com
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (68 in ALN/2:12-cv-02532, 2 in ALN/2:13-cv-20000, 24 in FLS/0:15-cv-61414, 294 in MDL No. 2406), (69 in ALN/2:12-cv-02532, 3 in ALN/2:13-cv-20000, 25 in FLS/0:15-cv-61414, 295 in MDL No. 2406), (70 in ALN/2:12-cv-02532, 4 in ALN/2:13-cv-20000, 26 in FLS/0:15-cv-61414, 296 in MDL No. 2406) Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Incorrect case number(s) selected. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2406, ALN/2:12-cv-02532, ALN/2:13-cv-20000, FLS/0:15-cv-61414 (Whatley, Joe) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 302 in MDL No. 2406)) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (3 in FLS/0:15-cv-61414, 267 in MDL No. 2406) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Marwood Group & Co. USA LLC for Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2406, ALN/2:12-cv-02532, ALN/2:13-cv-20000, FLS/0:15-cv-61414 (Whatley, Joe) Modified on 8/6/2015 (LH). ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 07/31/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 302 in MDL No. 2406)) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (3 in FLS/0:15-cv-61414, 267 in MDL No. 2406) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Confluent Health for Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2406, ALN/2:12-cv-02532, ALN/2:13-cv-20000, FLS/0:15-cv-61414 (Whatley, Joe) Modified on 8/6/2015 (LH). ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 07/31/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 302 in MDL No. 2406)) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (3 in FLS/0:15-cv-61414, 267 in MDL No. 2406) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2406, ALN/2:12-cv-02532, ALN/2:13-cv-20000, FLS/0:15-cv-61414 (Whatley, Joe) Modified on 8/6/2015 (LH). ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 07/31/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 255 in MDL No. 2406) Filed by Subscriber Plaintiffs -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2406 et al. (Hausfeld, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2015 (LH). EDITED FILING PARTY (Entered: 04/15/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 44 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?