Spokane County v. Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-op-45943
District Judge Dan Aaron Polster, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 1, 2021 at 8:27 PM ST (2.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Spokane County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Ko +1 206 623 1900 david-ko-8713@ecf.pacerpro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback - Seattle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel P. Mensher +1 206 623 1900

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gretchen Freeman Cappio +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 gcappio@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alison Gaffney +1 206 623 1900
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Erika M Keech +1 206 623 1900 ekeech@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek W Loeser +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dloeser@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spokane County Prosecutor's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F Driscoll, Jr. +1 509 477 3662 +1 509 477 3409
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Henry Haskell +1 509 477 3662 +1 509 477 3409
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo John and Jane Does 1 through 100, Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd."
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Eastern. Case number 2:18-cv-00209. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, MDL Clerk. (CV, Case Administrator). [Transferred from waed on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (TR, Case Administrator) [Transferred from waed on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator) [Transferred from waed on 8/13/2018.]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1 through 100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2921930) Jury Demand. Filed by Spokane County. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Gaffney, Alison) [Transferred from waed on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?