Ornelas v. Building Materials Holding Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-00669
District Judge Michael W. Mosman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 9:04 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Andres Ornelas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Henretty +1 503 473 8684 +1 503 295 0676 dhenretty@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Austreberto Cornejo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Henretty +1 503 473 8684 +1 503 295 0676 dhenretty@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Jesus Ornelas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Henretty +1 503 473 8684 +1 503 295 0676 dhenretty@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Jorge Hernandez Villegas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Henretty +1 503 473 8684 +1 503 295 0676 dhenretty@oregonlawcenter.org
v.
No Logo Bmc West Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hart Wagner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/2009, TERMINATED: 09/22/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kari A. Furnanz +1 503 222 4499 +1 503 222 2301 kaf@hhw.com
No Logo Building Materials Holding Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hart Wagner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/2009, TERMINATED: 09/22/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kari A. Furnanz +1 503 222 4499 +1 503 222 2301 kaf@hhw.com
No Logo Cristobal Villa, Defendant
No Logo Salvador Miranda Diaz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cable Huston Benedict Haagensen & Lloyd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan T. Felstiner +1 503 224 3092 +1 503 224 3176 sfelstin@chbh.com
No Logo Villa Rodriquez Construction, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Judgment Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction, LLC For Attorney Fees. Signed on 2/10/10 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Dismissal of Party (Cristobal Villa) without prejudice Filed by all plaintiffs (Henretty, David) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Proposed Form of Order Submitted with Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees against defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Declaration of David Henretty in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees against defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 32 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Itemization of services rendered in support of plaintiffs' motion for attorney fees) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Motion for Attorney Fees Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) Modified on 2/12/2010 (cib). (Entered: 01/25/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Default Judgment Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction, LLC. Signed on 1/15/10 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Proposed Form of Order Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Declaration of Austreberto Cornejo in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment 24 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Declaration of Jorge Hernandez Villegas in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment 24 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Declaration of Andres Ornelas in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment 24 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Declaration of Jesus Ornelas in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment 24 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment 24 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) Modified on 1/28/2010 (cib). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER: GRANTING Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction LLC, will be treated as a Motion for Default 20 . Counsel may file the motion for default judgment, with the proposed default judgment. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Administrative Correction of the Record. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record,in the Request 20 filed by Jesus Ornelas, Austreberto Cornejo, Andres Ornelas, Jorge Hernandez Villegas for. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a), the Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and to notify all parties accordingly. The court will treat the Request (#20) as a Motion for Default. (dls) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Declaration of David Henretty in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Entry of Default Against Villa Rodriguez Construction LLC. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Request 20 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Villa Rodriguez Construction LLC, will be treated as a Motion for Default. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) Modified on 11/30/2009 (dls). (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 17 . Discovery is extended from 10/14/09, to be completed by 12/14/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is extended from 11/13/09, due by 1/12/2010. Pretrial Order is extended from 11/13/09, due by 1/12/2010. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Declaration of David Henretty in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 17 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Declaration of David Henretty STATING THAT ORS 63.121(3) HAS BEEN COMPLIED WITH. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Acknowledgment of Service 15 .) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Return receipt of mailing, # 2 Attachment Return receipt of mailing, Villa Rodriguez Construction, LLC) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Acknowledgement of Service on Villa Rodriquez Construction, LLC served on 10/22/2009 through Secretary of State Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time Limit for Service 12 . Service of process must be completed by 11/13/2009. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (mjp) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Declaration of David Henretty in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time Limit for Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 12 .) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Affidavit of Non-Service) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Motion for Extension of Time Limit for Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Rule 54(b) Judgment Dismissing Defendants Building Materials Holding Corporation and BMC West Corporation with Prejudice. Signed on 9/18/09 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Rule 549b)Judgment Against Defendant Salvador Miranda Diaz. Signed on 9/18/09 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Proposed Form of Order Submitted Dismissing Defendants BMHC and BMC West with prejudice. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Proposed Form of Order Submitted Against Defendant Miranda. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Stipulated Settlement Agreement. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: GRANTING Motion Defendant Miranda's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment 5 . Defendant's Miranda's Response is due August 21, 2009. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Motion Defendant Miranda's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Filed by Salvador Miranda Diaz. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion) (Felstiner, Susan) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Acknowledgement of Service on Salvador Miranda Diaz served on 6/26/2009 Filed by all plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Notice of Bankruptcy Stay.Filed by Building Materials Holding Corporation, BMC West Corporation. (Furnanz, Kari) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Discovery is to be completed by 10/14/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/13/2009. Pretrial Order is due by 11/13/2009. (cib) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 27467 issued. Summons issued as to Salvador Miranda c/o Susan Felstiner, Attorney; Cristobal Villa; Villa Rodriguez Construction, LLC; BMC West Corporation c/o The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc. Reg. Agent; Building Materials Holding Corporation c/o The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Registered Agent. Jury Trial Requested: NO.Filed by Austreberto Cornejo, Jesus Ornelas, Andres Ornelas, Jorge Hernandez Villegas against Building Materials Holding Corporation, BMC West Corporation, Villa Rodriquez Construction, LLC, Cristobal Villa, Salvador Miranda Diaz. (cib) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2014: # 1 civil, # 2 summons) (dnt). (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?