Wilbur Green v. Experian Information Solutions
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 17-15987

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 7:11 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMERICAN FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 949-381-5911

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Sanford Shatz, Attorney
Equifax, Inc. Equifax, Inc., Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 650-422-6710

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Anne M. Voigts

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 949-376-3500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: (415) 626-3939

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Benjamin Chung Lee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 212-326-7870

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained Meir Feder
No Logo FIRST NATIONAL CREDIT CARD, INC., Defendant - Appellee
No Logo WILBUR GREEN, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 408-279-2288

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained Elliot Gale
Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Received 7 paper copies of Supplemental Brief [69] filed by Appellants. [11130301] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Sent to Panel) (RG) [Entered: 12/21/2018 11:28 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [69] submitted by Appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11121193] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (GV) [Entered: 12/14/2018 02:47 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Wilbur Green in 17-15987, Appellant Howard Rydolph in 17-15990, Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991, Appellant Scott Hunter in 17-15992. Date of service: 12/14/2018. [11120793] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Gale, Elliot) [Entered: 12/14/2018 11:32 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed order (MARSHA S. BERZON, MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND and DANIEL R. DOMINGUEZ) The parties are ordered to file briefs, not to exceed 10 pages, discussing what effect, if any, the decisions in Robins v. Spokeo, Inc., 867 F.3d 1108, 1116 n.3 (9th Cir. 2017) (reserving the question “whether a plaintiff would allege a concrete harm if he alleged only a materially inaccurate report about him that was prepared but never published�), and Bassett v. ABM Parking Servs., Inc., 883 F.3d 776, 780 (9th Cir. 2018) (holding that disclosure or publication to a third party is a critical requirement for harm from a FCRA violation to be concrete enough to support standing), have on jurisdiction here. Plaintiffs-Appellants shall file their brief no later than December 14, 2018. Defendants-Appellees shall file their brief no later than December 28, 2018. No reply brief shall be permitted absent further order from the court. [11105107] [17-15201, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (WL) [Entered: 11/30/2018 02:03 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [39] submitted by American Financial Services Association (AFSA) is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11014539] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (GV) [Entered: 09/17/2018 04:10 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): The American Financial Services Association’s motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief is GRANTED. [11014415] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (OC) [Entered: 09/17/2018 03:45 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/[11002003] [17-15201, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (TG) [Entered: 09/05/2018 04:23 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO MARSHA S. BERZON, MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND and DANIEL R. DOMINGUEZ. [11001571] [17-15201, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (TG) [Entered: 09/05/2018 01:53 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): The Court consolidates the captioned cases for purposes of oral argument. Counsel will be allotted argument time of 15 minutes per side. [10992592] [17-15201, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (AF) [Entered: 08/28/2018 11:08 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Meir Feder for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992. [10987907] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Feder, Meir) [Entered: 08/23/2018 04:07 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Added attorney Meir Feder for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. [10986483] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (RL) [Entered: 08/22/2018 05:02 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992. Date of service: 08/22/2018. [10986475] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Feder, Meir) [Entered: 08/22/2018 04:59 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Anne M. Voigts for Appellee Equifax Inc. in 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992. [10955446] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Voigts, Anne) [Entered: 07/25/2018 04:27 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Elliot Gale for Appellant Scott Hunter in 17-15992, Attorney Elliot Gale for Appellant Wilbur Green in 17-15987, Attorney Elliot Gale for Appellant Howard Rydolph in 17-15990, Attorney Elliot Gale for Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991. [10939799] [17-15992, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991] (Gale, Elliot) [Entered: 07/12/2018 11:26 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Donald Manwell Falk for Appellee AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION in 17-15992. [10929524] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 17-15992 only.] (TYL) [Entered: 07/02/2018 04:19 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Jan T. Chilton for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA in 17-15991. [10927891] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Chilton, Jan) [Entered: 06/29/2018 03:36 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notice of Oral Argument on Wednesday, September 5, 2018 - 09:30 A.M. - Courtroom 1 - San Francisco CA.View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.Be sure to review the GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible).When you have reviewed the calendar, download the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form, complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office.[10919987] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (AKM) [Entered: 06/25/2018 08:30 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION in 17-15992 Correspondence: regarding availability for oral argument. Date of service: 06/01/2018 [10893917] [17-15992, 17-15987]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 17-15991. 06/01/2018 by SLM] (Falk, Donald) [Entered: 06/01/2018 03:20 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [18] filed by Wilbur Green, et al. [10893558] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (RG) [Entered: 06/01/2018 01:32 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in San FranciscoPlease review the San Francisco sitting dates for September 2018 and the two subsequent sitting months in that location at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions. If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please inform the court within 3 days of this notice, using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: regarding availability for oral argument).When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date.If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 days of this notice, using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: request for mediation).[10887720] (AW) [Entered: 05/29/2018 11:51 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Attorney Scott Kelly in 17-15987, 17-15990, and in 17-15992 substituted by Attorney Sanford Shatz in 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991 and in 17-15992 [10868591] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (NAC) [Entered: 05/10/2018 01:43 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sanford P. Shatz for Amicus Curiae - Pending AFSA in 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992. Date of service: 05/10/2018. [10868502] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Shatz, Sanford) [Entered: 05/10/2018 01:08 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in San FranciscoPlease review the San Francisco sitting dates for August 2018 and the two subsequent sitting months in that location at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions. If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please inform the court within 3 days of this notice, using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: regarding availability for oral argument).When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date.If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 days of this notice, using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: request for mediation).[10848569] (AW) [Entered: 04/24/2018 12:21 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Attorney Merritt Ellen McAlister in 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991 and in 17-15992 substituted by Attorney Anne M. Voigts in 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991 and in 17-15992 [10797534] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (NAC) [Entered: 03/14/2018 08:35 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Anne M. Voigts for Appellee Equifax Inc.. Date of service: 03/13/2018. [10796841] [17-15987]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992. 03/13/2018 by RY] (Voigts, Anne) [Entered: 03/13/2018 02:53 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in San FranciscoPlease review the San Francisco sitting dates for June 2018 and the two subsequent sitting months in that location at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions. If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please inform the court within 3 days of this notice, using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: regarding availability for oral argument).When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date.If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 days of this notice, using CM/ECF (Type of Document: File Correspondence to Court; Subject: request for mediation).[10770472] (AW) [Entered: 02/20/2018 06:02 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [39] by AFSA in 17-15987. [10741666] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (RG) [Entered: 01/29/2018 11:23 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Ordered paper copies of Amicus American Financial Services Brief. Per Order [40] [10741576] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (SOS) [Entered: 01/29/2018 11:00 AM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Received 7 paper copies of Reply Brief [41] filed by Wilbur Green, et al. [10716858] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (SD) [Entered: 01/08/2018 02:21 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [41] submitted by Wilbur Green, et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10712514] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (GV) [Entered: 01/04/2018 09:50 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Wilbur Green in 17-15987, Appellant Howard Rydolph in 17-15990, Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991, Appellant Scott Hunter in 17-15992. Date of service: 01/03/2018. [10712185] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Gale, Elliot) [Entered: 01/03/2018 05:56 PM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Motion (ECF Filing) is referred to panel.; Motion [39] (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus is referred to panel. (see attached PDF for complete order addressing Dkt No. 39) [10687382] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (LKK) [Entered: 12/12/2017 10:32 AM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending American Financial Services Association (AFSA). [10671052] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (GV) [Entered: 11/29/2017 10:40 AM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by American Financial Services Association. Date of service: 11/28/2017. [10674700] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [37].] (RY) [Entered: 12/01/2017 12:36 PM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Motion and brief refiled using correct filing type. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [39]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) American Financial Services Association Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 11/28/2017. [10670433] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Kelly, Scott) [Entered: 11/28/2017 04:36 PM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Filed four paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [29] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellees Equifax Inc. et al. [10668178] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (GV) [Entered: 11/27/2017 03:54 PM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [28] filed by Equifax Inc., et al. [10667565] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (DB) [Entered: 11/27/2017 01:02 PM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Streamlined request [33] by Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991 to extend time to file the brief is approved for all optional reply briefs. Amended briefing schedule: the optional reply brief is due 01/03/2018 . [10664655] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (DJW) [Entered: 11/22/2017 12:30 PM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Reply Brief by Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991. New requested due date is 01/03/2018. [10663984] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Gale, Elliot) [Entered: 11/22/2017 08:46 AM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Added attorney David Meir Zionts for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. [10663487] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (RL) [Entered: 11/21/2017 03:23 PM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The answering brief [28] submitted by Equifax Inc., et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [29] submitted by Equifax Inc., et al. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10662834] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (GV) [Entered: 11/21/2017 12:30 PM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David M. Zionts for Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 17-15992. Date of service: 11/20/2017. [10663459] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992]--[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 17-15992 only.] (SLM) [Entered: 11/21/2017 03:14 PM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Equifax Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 17-15987, 17-15990, Appellees Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, NA in 17-15991, Appellees Equifax Inc., AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 17-15992. Date of service: 11/20/2017. [10661578] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (McAlister, Merritt) [Entered: 11/20/2017 03:55 PM]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Equifax Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in 17-15987, 17-15990, Appellees Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, NA in 17-15991, Appellees Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 17-15992. Date of service: 11/20/2017. [10661569] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (McAlister, Merritt) [Entered: 11/20/2017 03:53 PM]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Added attorney Donald Manwell Falk for AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION. [10658188] [17-15992, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991] (RL) [Entered: 11/17/2017 09:31 AM]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Donald M. Falk for Appellee AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION. Date of service: 11/16/2017. [10657634] [17-15992]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991. 11/16/2017 by RY] (Falk, Donald) [Entered: 11/16/2017 03:41 PM]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Filed order MEDIATION (SL): Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (Docket Entry No. [24]), this appeal is voluntarily dismissed as to appellee Bank of America, N.A. only. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys’ fees on appeal. This appeal continues as the remaining appellees. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court as to appellee Bank of America, N.A. [10626527] [17-15991, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15992] (RT) [Entered: 10/20/2017 04:37 PM]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991 Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 10/19/2017. [10623750] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992]--[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 17-15991 only.] (SLM) [Entered: 10/19/2017 11:11 AM]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Filed four paper copies of excerpts of record [19] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant Wilbur Green. [10598783] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (GV) [Entered: 09/28/2017 04:32 PM]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Streamlined request [21] by Appellee Equifax Inc. in 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992 to extend time to file the brief is approved for all Appellees. Streamlined requests allow for a 30-day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellees Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., First National Credit Card, Inc., Military Star, Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, NA, AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answering brief due 11/20/2017. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [10594010] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (JN) [Entered: 09/26/2017 09:08 AM]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee Equifax Inc. in 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992. New requested due date is 11/17/2017. [10593904] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (McAlister, Merritt) [Entered: 09/26/2017 08:20 AM]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The opening brief [18] submitted by Wilbur Green, et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [19] submitted by Wilbur Green, et al. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10589779] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (GV) [Entered: 09/21/2017 03:36 PM]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Wilbur Green in 17-15987, Appellant Howard Rydolph in 17-15990, Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991, Appellant Scott Hunter in 17-15992. Date of service: 09/20/2017. [10588351] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts of record. 9/21/2017 by TYL] (Gale, Elliot) [Entered: 09/20/2017 04:23 PM]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Wilbur Green in 17-15987, Appellant Howard Rydolph in 17-15990, Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991, Appellant Scott Hunter in 17-15992. Date of service: 09/20/2017. [10588349] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Gale, Elliot) [Entered: 09/20/2017 04:22 PM]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Streamlined request [16] by Appellant Wilbur Green in 17-15987, Appellant Howard Rydolph in 17-15990, Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991, Appellant Scott Hunter in 17-15992 to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Wilbur Green, Howard Rydolph, Kimberly Contreras and Scott Hunter consolidated opening brief due 09/20/2017. Appellees Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., First National Credit Card, Inc., Military Star, Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, NA, AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. consolidated answering brief due 10/20/2017. The consolidated optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the consolidated answering brief. [10549204] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (JN) [Entered: 08/17/2017 03:07 PM]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Wilbur Green in 17-15987, Appellant Howard Rydolph in 17-15990, Appellant Kimberly Contreras in 17-15991, Appellant Scott Hunter in 17-15992. New requested due date is 09/20/2017. [10549073] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (Gale, Elliot) [Entered: 08/17/2017 02:29 PM]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Appellee Equifax Inc.’s motion (Docket Entry No. [10525580-2] in 17-15201) to consolidate Nos. 17-15201, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, and 17-15992 is granted in part. Appeal Nos. 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, and 17-15992 are consolidated. No. 17-15201 will proceed separately but will be calendared before the same panel assigned to consider the merits of these appeals. Appellee Equifax Inc.'s unopposed request (Docket Entry No. [10525580-2] in 17- 15201) for an extension of time to file the answering brief in No. 17-15201 is granted. The answering brief in No. 17-15201 is due September 19, 2017. The optional reply brief in No. 17-15201 is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The briefing schedule in appeal Nos. 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991 and 17- 15992 shall proceed as follows: the consolidated opening brief is due August 21, 2017; the answering brief(s) are due September 19, 2017; and the optional consolidated reply brief is due 21 days after service of the last served answering brief. Separately represented parties are encouraged to file one brief covering all the consolidated appeals. See Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Rule 32-2. [10548978] [17-15201, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (AF) [Entered: 08/17/2017 01:55 PM]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Streamlined request [13] by Appellant Wilbur Green to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. There is a pending motion to consolidate and the briefing schedule will be reset upon resolution of the motion. [10545277] (JN) [Entered: 08/15/2017 11:37 AM]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Wilbur Green. New requested due date is 09/20/2017. [10545183] [17-15987] (Gale, Elliot) [Entered: 08/15/2017 11:17 AM]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Equifax Inc. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 07/28/2017. [10525674] [17-15987] (McAlister, Merritt) [Entered: 07/28/2017 01:51 PM]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Equifax Inc. Motion to consolidate cases 17-15201, 17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992. Date of service: 07/28/2017. [10525588] [17-15987] (McAlister, Merritt) [Entered: 07/28/2017 01:28 PM]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Added attorney Merritt Ellen McAlister for Equifax Inc.. [10520975] (RL) [Entered: 07/25/2017 02:39 PM]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Merritt E. McAlister for Appellee Equifax Inc.. Date of service: 07/25/2017. [10520960] [17-15987] (McAlister, Merritt) [Entered: 07/25/2017 02:36 PM]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 07/19/2017. [10516497] (RT) [Entered: 07/20/2017 05:25 PM]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Check number 12997 in the amount of $505.00, forwarded to district court. (See Case Files) [10510210] (JR) [Entered: 07/17/2017 09:37 AM]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): Order to show cause docket fee due [10489549] (TSP) [Entered: 06/27/2017 01:05 PM]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [10488536] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (VS) [Entered: 06/26/2017 04:22 PM]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MEDIATION CONFERENCE UPDATED - Assessment Conference now DIAL-IN, 06/26/2017, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. [10474655] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (VS) [Entered: 06/15/2017 10:05 AM]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 06/26/2017, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedules previously set by the court remain in effect. See order for instructions and details. [10451817] [17-15987, 17-15990, 17-15991, 17-15992] (VS) [Entered: 05/30/2017 11:06 AM]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Wilbur Green Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/22/2017. [10444268] [17-15987] (Gale, Elliot) [Entered: 05/22/2017 06:43 PM]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/22/2017. Transcript ordered by 06/12/2017. Transcript due 07/11/2017. Appellant Wilbur Green opening brief due 08/21/2017. Appellees Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and First National Credit Card, Inc. answering brief due 09/19/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10433697] (JBS) [Entered: 05/15/2017 09:47 AM]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?