Jordan-Cross v. Gates
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-00040
District Judge Frank Montalvo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 11:45 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Markita Jordan-Cross, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson & Galatzan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Laura Enriquez +1 915 532 2000 +1 915 541 1597 enriquez@mgmsg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ray Valdez McChristian & Jeans

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Arthur Robert Piacenti +1 915 832 7200 +1 915 832 7333 apiacenti@rvmjfirm.com
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Secretary of Defense Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul L. Lee +1 915 534 6884 +1 915 534 3490 paul.lee@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2003
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Entering Stipulation of Dismissal by Plaintiff against Defendant. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (md, ) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal Against Defendant by Markita Jordan-Cross. (Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Laura M. Enriquez (Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Robert M. Gates. (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Witness List by Markita Jordan-Cross (Potential Witnesses). (Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Markita Jordan-Cross (Potential). (Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Exhibit List (Proposed) by Markita Jordan-Cross.. (Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER Converting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Summary Judgement and GRANTING 12 Motion to Continue Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (md, ) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 4/5/2010 01:00PM before Judge Frank Montalvo. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2010 01:00 PM before Judge Frank Montalvo. ADR Report Deadline due by 1/6/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 9/28/2009. Discovery due by 12/2/2009. Motions due by 2/1/2010.. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (md, ) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (md, ) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Proposed Scheduling Order by Markita Jordan-Cross, Robert M. Gates. (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Robert M. Gates, re 10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Robert M. Gates (md, ) Modified on 7/17/2009 (md, ). (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Robert M. Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's (Partial) Motion to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, For Summary Judgment)(Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Markita Jordan-Cross, re 10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Robert M. Gates (to Motion to Dismiss) (Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Markita Jordan-Cross, re 10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Robert M. Gates (to Motion for Summary Judgment) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Continue Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment under Rule 56(f) by Markita Jordan-Cross. (Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER that parties submit a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (cr, ) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment, as to Plaintiff's Claim of Race, Color and Gender Discrimination and Retaliatory Denial of Reassignment by Robert M. Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(md, ) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (md, ) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Robert M. Gates.(Lee, Paul) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Robert M. Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Lee, Paul) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Summons Issued as to Robert M. Gates, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markita Jordan-Cross. (md, ) Modified on 4/22/2009 (md, ). (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markita Jordan-Cross. Robert M. Gates served on 2/20/2009, answer due 4/21/2009. (md, ) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markita Jordan-Cross. Robert M. Gates served on 3/3/2009, answer due 5/2/2009. (md, ) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Summons Issued as to Robert M. Gates. (me, ) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    JS44 submitted by Markita Jordan-Cross. (me, ) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 300001035), filed by Markita Jordan-Cross.(me, ) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?