Santiago v. Costa
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-12421
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 18, 2019 at 11:20 AM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hector Santiago, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MCI - Norfolk

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hector Santiago +1 508 660 5900
v.
No Logo Erin Wyle, Defendant
No Logo Lori Costa, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying without prejudice 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If plaintiff elects to proceed with this action, no later than Tuesday, December 11, 2018, he either must (1) pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees; or (2) file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by his certified prison account statement. [Copy of order mailed to plaintiff on 11/20/2018 with Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Courtesy copy of order mailed to treasurer on 11/20/2018.] (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hector Santiago. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hector Santiago. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 4 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?