Vitello v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-12442
District Judge Indira Talwani, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 11:52 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mary Vitello, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Chiari, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Theresa M. Walsh +1 716 681 7190 +1 716 681 8136 twalsh@brownchiari.com
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jonathon Brugh Lower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul E. Asfendis +1 212 613 2000 +1 212 554 9667 pasfendis@gibbonslaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 37, MDL No. 2768 has been transferred from Western District of New York and assigned civil action number: 18-12442. Western District of New York case number: 18-1239. In Re: Striker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-01239. (Entered: 11/26/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the District of Massachusetts Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi,Clerk of the Panel on 11/26/18. (MD) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Remark: Notice of potential tag along action emailed to Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (KLH)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics Corp... (Asfendis, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court of the State of New York Niagra County, case number E165930/2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3271445), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Affidavit of Service)(Asfendis, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?