National Labor Relations Board v. Koons
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-03815
Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 1:11 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy Peter Bearese +1 410 962 2822 +1 410 962 2198 timothy.bearese@nlrb.gov
No Logo Kara Koons, Respondent
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting NLRB's 6 Motion to Withdraw Application; Closing case. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 12/29/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Withdraw Application to Enforce Subpoena by National Labor Relations Board Responses due by 1/14/2016 (Bearese, Timothy) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Show Cause Hearing held on 12/22/2015 before Judge James K. Bredar. (Court Reporter: Christine Asif) (kam, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board re 3 Order to Show Cause.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 12/22/2015 11:45 AM in Courtroom 3D, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Judge James K. Bredar. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 12/15/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/s USMS 12/15/15-das) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Labor Relations Board identifying Financial Interests Johnston Construction Company, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 542, AFL-CIO, and Unlimited Services Available. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Application for Order Enforcing Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum by National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Declaration of Stacey McClurkin, # 3 Declaration of Timothy Bearese, # 4 Index of Exhibits, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Text of Proposed Order, # 12 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 11 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?