Dunkle v. First Data Technologies, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-02017
District Judge Frederick Motz, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Frederick  Motz
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 1:12 PM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Kouri Dunkle, Plaintiff

Represented by Lebau and Neuworth PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard P Neuworth +1 410 296 3030 +1 410 296 8660 rn@joblaws.net

Represented by Suite 803

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregg Howard Mosson +1 443 226 0601 +1 443 269 0251 ghm@mossonlaw.com
v.
No Logo First Data Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stavroula E. Lambrakopoulos +1 202 778 9248 +7789 778 778 9100 stavroula.lambrakopoulos@klgates.com

Represented by Veterans Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard James Mitchell Richard.Mitchell2@va.gov
No Logo Wage Works, Defendant

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul M Levine +1 202 861 1606 +1 202 861 1783 pmlevine@bakerlaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1002
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/22/2015. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Kouri Dunkle Responses due by 11/9/2015 (Neuworth, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Paperless ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/18/2015. (Motz, J.) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by First Data Technologies, Inc. Responses due by 10/5/2015 (Mitchell, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Paperless ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/2/2015. (Motz, J.) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by First Data Technologies, Inc. Responses due by 9/18/2015 (Marshall, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Paperless ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/1/2015. (Motz, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, by Wage Works Responses due by 9/18/2015 (Levine, Paul) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Paperless ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/3/2015. (Motz, J.) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Wage Works Responses due by 8/20/2015 (Levine, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Paperless ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/30/2015. (Motz, J.) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by First Data Technologies, Inc. Responses due by 8/17/2015 (Lambrakopoulos, Stavroula) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued 21 days as to First Data Technologies, Inc., Wage Works. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against First Data Technologies, Inc., Wage Works ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637082423.), filed by Kouri Dunkle. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Propsed Summons as to First Data Technologies, Inc., # 7 Proposed Summons as to Wage Works)(nd2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?