Alongi v. D-J Equipment and Construction Co., Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10018
District Judge Mark L. Wolf, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2019 at 6:38 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gina M Alongi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by International Union of Operating Engineers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 508 533 1400 ggeiman@local4funds.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Mary T. Sullivan +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 msullivan@segalroitman.com
No Logo Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by International Union of Operating Engineers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 508 533 1400 ggeiman@local4funds.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Mary T. Sullivan +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 msullivan@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by International Union of Operating Engineers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Geiman +1 508 533 1400 ggeiman@local4funds.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathryn S. Shea +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 kshea@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Mary T. Sullivan +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 msullivan@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo D-J Equipment and Construction Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rockland Trust, Trustee
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4 (Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kathryn S. Shea (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 27 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. (Hohler, Daniel)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4.(Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Geiman on behalf of Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4 (Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Mary T. Sullivan (Sullivan, Mary) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Anne R. Sills (Sills, Anne) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kathryn S. Shea (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Geiman on behalf of Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds (Geiman, Gregory) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  WRIT of First Execution issued (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPLICATION for Writ of Execution by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: Electronic ORDER entered granting 14 Motion for Default Judgment. ALLOWED and SO ORDERED. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Proposed Document(s) submitted by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. Document received: Default Judgment. (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment filed by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 14 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment of Kathryn S. Shea. (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 14 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment of Gina M. Alongi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Default Judgment by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4.(Shea, Kathryn) Docket Text Modified on 8/21/2009 to correct the relief selected when motion was e-filed. (Boyce, Kathy). (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: Electronic ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Settlement; granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Settlement Approval and, MOTION for Extension of Time to August 31, 2009 to File Default Judgment Motion ( Responses due by 5/29/2009) by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4.(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to D-J Equipment and Construction Co., Inc. (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re 10 Request for notice of default (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: Electronic ORDER entered granting 9 Motion to Reopen Case (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Request for notice of default. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Reopen Case by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4.(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Case Reopened (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Civil Case Terminated. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot 7 Motion for Extension of Time (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: Electronic ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Settlement. ALLOWED. This case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to being reopened if the court is, by February 23, 2009, informed that the agreement has not been performed. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to February 15, 2009 Pursuant to Local rule 41.1 (a)(3) by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4.(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for Settlement by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE - PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, pursuant to Rule 41.1 of the Local Rules of this Court regarding dismissal for want of prosecution of cases inactive for a period of one (1) year, the above entitled action will be dismissed without further notice after thirty (30) days from the date of this Notice subject only to compliance with the provisions of subdivision (a)(3) of this Rule. (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 4, Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name. Text of entry modified for the docket to reflect that Notice will be filed in CA. 07-11513-GAO (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Kathryn S. Shea (Shea, Kathryn) Modified on 1/4/2008 (Boyce, Kathy).This document belongs in CA. 07-11513-GAO. Atty Shea contacted to file document in that case. (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Kathryn S. Shea (Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed D-J Equipment and Construction Co., Inc. served on 1/22/2007, answer due 2/12/2007. (Sills, Anne) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 77414 for 1 Complaint, (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Summons Issued as to D-J Equipment and Construction Co., Inc.. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against D-J Equipment and Construction Co., Inc., Rockland Trust Filing fee:, filed by Gina M Alongi, Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Appentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a# 2 Exhibit b# 3 Exhibit c# 4 Exhibit d# 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hurley, Virginia) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?