Suarez v. Grizzly Firefighters, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00894
District Judge Robert E. Jones, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2019 at 1:56 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Grizzly Firefighters, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin J. Jacoby +1 503 317 2314 +1 971 277 6188 kevin@jacobylawllc.com
No Logo Magdaleno Ortiz-Solis, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin J. Jacoby +1 503 317 2314 +1 971 277 6188 kevin@jacobylawllc.com
No Logo Maria Del Refugio Ortiz, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin J. Jacoby +1 503 317 2314 +1 971 277 6188 kevin@jacobylawllc.com
No Logo Teresa M. Ortiz, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin J. Jacoby +1 503 317 2314 +1 971 277 6188 kevin@jacobylawllc.com
No Logo Agueda Arreola, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam C. Jeffries +1 503 726 4381 +1 503 726 4382 ajeffries@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Alcides Gongora Vasquez, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam C. Jeffries +1 503 726 4381 +1 503 726 4382 ajeffries@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Marcelino Ramirez Sanchez, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley Latin +1 541 276 4549 shelley.latin@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam C. Jeffries +1 503 726 4381 +1 503 726 4382 ajeffries@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Patricio Arenas Suarez, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam C. Jeffries +1 503 726 4381 +1 503 726 4382 ajeffries@oregonlawcenter.org
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1801
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Satisfaction re Judgment, 12 by All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jeffries, Adam) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Judgment. Signed on 10/19/10 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (cib) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Order Of Dismissal. Signed on 10/18/10 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (cib) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Offer of Judgment) (Jeffries, Adam) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Grizzly Firefighters, Inc.. (Jacoby, Kevin) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Answer to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, Counterclaim All Plaintiffs. Filed by Maria Del Refugio Ortiz, Teresa M. Ortiz, Magdaleno Ortiz-Solis, Grizzly Firefighters, Inc.. (Jacoby, Kevin) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Agueda Arreola, Marcelino Ramirez Sanchez, Patricio Arenas Suarez, Alcides Gongora Vasquez. (Jeffries, Adam) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Robert E. Jones: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion 5 to extend deadlines is granted as follows:.Complete all discovery 1/14/11. File all pleadings pursuantto Fed.R.Civ.P. 7(a) and 15 2/14/11. Join all claims, remedies and parties pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 18 and 19 2/14/11. File all pretrial, discovery and dispositive motions 3/16/11. (cib) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jeffries, Adam) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Notice of Appearance of Kevin J. Jacoby appearing on behalf of All Defendants and Intent to File Appearance Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Jacoby, Kevin) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Acknowledgement of Service on All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jeffries, Adam) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Robert E. Jones. Discovery is to be completed by 11/26/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/27/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 12/27/2010. Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. (msk) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 34892. Summons issued as to Grizzly Firefighters, Inc., Magdaleno Ortiz-Solis, Maria Del Refugio Ortiz, Teresa M. Ortiz. Jury Trial Requested: YES.Filed by Alcides Gongora Vasquez, Agueda Arreola, Patricio Arenas Suarez, Marcelino Ramirez Sanchez against Grizzly Firefighters, Inc., Maria Del Refugio Ortiz, Teresa M. Ortiz, Magdaleno Ortiz-Solis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44) (msk) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?