Fleming v. Red Hat Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00913
District Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 4:48 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Colin Fleming, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Colin Fleming

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colin Fleming +1 469 394 8890

Toggle Switch Represented by Parmet PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2018 Matthew Scott Parmet +1 713 999 5228 matt@parmet.law

Toggle Switch Represented by Siegel Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2018 Jack Siegel +1 214 706 0834 +1 469 339 0204 jack@siegellawgroup.biz
v.
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Susanne LeFave +1 512 982 7250 +1 512 982 7248 nlefave@littler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly R Miers +1 214 880 8100 +1 214 880 0180 kmiers@littler.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail returned as undeliverable. 20 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure, Set/Clear Flags received back from Colin Fleming as RTS. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (epm) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:20. Wed Aug 1 14:39:23 CDT 2018 (crt)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER STAYING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case for administrative purposes. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/1/2018) (rekc) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Red Hat Inc, Colin Fleming. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Miers, Kimberly) Modified text/added filer on 7/27/2018 (dsr). (Entered: 07/27/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Mail returned as undeliverable. 17 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney received back from Colin Fleming as return to sender - not deliverable as addressed. Wrong Apartment hand written on Envelope. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (svc) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17. Mon Jun 25 10:26:53 CDT 2018 (crt)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER granting 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Scott Parmet and Jack Lewis Siegel terminated. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/22/2018) (rekc) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Supplemental Document by Colin Fleming as to 12 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with expedited consideration requested, 13 Supplemental Document . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) of Colin Fleming) (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel shall file an update as to Plaintiff's response to their motion to withdraw [ECF No. 12] by 6/25/2018. See Supplement [ECF No. 13]. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/20/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Order Referring re: 12 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with expedited consideration requested. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. It is further ORDERED that all deadlines in this case are extended by thirty days. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/20/2018) (epm) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Supplemental Document by Colin Fleming as to 12 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with expedited consideration requested . (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with expedited consideration requested filed by Colin Fleming (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Rives Miers for Nicole S. LeFave on behalf of Red Hat Inc. (Miers, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Red Hat Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Declaration, # 2 Exhibit(s) A-1 to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit(s) A-2 to Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order) (Miers, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before 6/28/2018. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/6/2018) (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s)) (ran) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is extended to 6/12/2018. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/24/2018) (ran) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Answer or Other Responsive Pleading filed by Red Hat, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order - Proposed Order)Attorney Kimberly Rives Miers added to party Red Hat, Inc.(pty:dft) (Miers, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Red Hat, Inc.; served on 5/8/2018. (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Scott Parmet on behalf of Colin Fleming. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Summons Issued as to Red Hat, Inc. (svc) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Colin Fleming. (Siegel, Jack) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            COMPLAINT against Red Hat, Inc. filed by Colin Fleming. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9116972) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Colin Fleming Consent, # 2 Cover Sheet) (Siegel, Jack) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?