Zetina v. Patel
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-02283
Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 5:09 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ada Zetina, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Edith Avila, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
v.
No Logo Bhanubhai Patel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Kampars +1 503 241 2300 nicholaskampars@dwt.com
No Logo Maruti, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Kampars +1 503 241 2300 nicholaskampars@dwt.com
No Logo Nayana Patel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Kampars +1 503 241 2300 nicholaskampars@dwt.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 2(a)
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/4/2017. As agreed by the Parties, deadline to amend pleadings, join parties, submit Joint ADR Report, and complete fact discovery is 2/28/2018. Dispositive motions are due by 3/30/2018. Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer present as counsel for plaintiffs. Nicholas A. Kampars present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Scheduling Order: Setting a Telephone Status Conference for Wednesday, 10/4/2017 at 3:00PM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 10/2/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted Stipulated Protective Order. Filed by Maruti, LLC. (Kampars, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 12 . ORDER - Striking all case deadlines and setting the following, new case schedule: the parties shall Amend pleadings, join parties, submit Joint ADR Report, and complete Fact Discovery by 10/30/2017. Dispositive Motions shall be filed no later than 11/28/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Kampars, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held and Notice Regarding Civil Case Procedures (see attached). ORDER: Deadline to amend pleadings, join parties, submit Joint ADR Report, and complete fact discovery is Wednesday 8/30/2017. Dispositive motions are due by Friday 9/29/17. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Civil Case Assignment Order (ECF # 3, p. 6). For more information regarding the role of magistrates and consenting to magistrate jurisdiction, see https://www.ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/court-policies/role-of-magistrates. Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Bonnie Allen-Sailer present as counsel for plaintiffs. Nicholas Kampars present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint Status Report pursuant to Fed R Civ P 26(f). Filed by Maruti, LLC. (Kampars, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Scheduling Order: SETTING a Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, 5/2/2017 at 10:00AM in 12B Chambers before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Civil Case Assignment Order (ECF # 3, p. 6). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Corporate Disclosure Statement of Maruti, LLC. Filed by All Defendants. (Kampars, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Answer to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Maruti, LLC, Nayana Patel, Bhanubhai Patel. (Kampars, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 5 . Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 3/7/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Kampars, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Summons Issued Electronically as to Maruti, LLC, Bhanubhai Patel, Nayana Patel. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: # 1 Issued Summons - Maruti, # 2 Issued Summons - Nayana Patel) (joha) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/5/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/5/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 5/5/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4836377 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Ada Zetina, Edith Avila against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Defendant Bhanubhai Patel, # 3 Proposed Summons Defendant Nayana Patel, # 4 Proposed Summons Defendant Maruti LLC). (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?