G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Flores
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01249-AWI-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 8:48 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (1) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/28/2018. Consent/decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/25/2019. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 12/28/2018; Non-Expert 5/14/2019; Expert 5/14/201 9. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/3/2019; Hearing by 7/1/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/3/2019; Hearing by 7/15/2019. Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
    Request RequestSpace LREF

    Statistics

    This case has been viewed 4 times.

    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
    Space
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
     
    PlainSite
    Sign Up
    Need Password Help?