Ferguson v. Minnesota Department of Corrections
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:18-cv-03075
District Judge John R. Tunheim, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2020 at 1:39 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Ferguson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sieben Grose Von Holtum & Carey, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Shannon C Carey +1 612 333 9712 +1 612 333 5970 shannon.carey@knowyourrights.com
v.
No Logo Centurion of Minnesota, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony J Novak +1 651 312 6571 +1 651 312 6618 tnovak@larsonking.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark A Solheim +1 651 312 6500 +1 651 312 6618 msolheim@larsonking.com
No Logo Fred McRae Roberson, Defendant
No Logo Minnesota Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leah M Tabbert +1 651 757 1217 leah.tabbert@ag.state.mn.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        (Text-Only) Notice to Attorney regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Chief Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Chief Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. (HAZ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to dismiss 9 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 8 Motion to Dismiss/General, 10 Meet and Confer Statement. (Tabbert, Leah) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Minnesota Department of Corrections. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tabbert, Leah) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 8 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Minnesota Department of Corrections.(Tabbert, Leah) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Tabbert, Leah) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Minnesota Department of Corrections. (Tabbert, Leah) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form) (KAT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Leah M Tabbert on behalf of Minnesota Department of Corrections. (Tabbert, Leah) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Centurion of Minnesota, LLC is a limited liability company owned by Centurion, LLC. (Novak, Anthony) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (MMP). (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER to Complaint filed by Centurion of Minnesota, LLC. (Novak, Anthony) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Summons Issued as to Centurion of Minnesota, LLC, Minnesota Department of Corrections, Fred McRae Roberson. (AKL) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18cv3075 JRT/KMM. (AKL) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                COMPLAINT against Centurion of Minnesota, LLC, Minnesota Department of Corrections, Fred McRae Roberson (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6470397) filed by James Ferguson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carey, Shannon) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?