Garcia v. The City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-09200
District Judge J. Paul Oetken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 5:30 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maria Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth E. Gordon +1 212 355 3200 +1 212 355 3292 kegoffice@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Thayer +1 212 355 3200 +1 212 355 3292 j.m.thayer@att.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Broadway Chambers Building

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/06/2014 Fausto E. Zapata, Jr. +1 212 766 9870 +1 212 766 9869 fz@fzapatalaw.com
v.
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael R. Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin John Traverse +1 212 788 0917 +1 212 788 0940 bentraverse@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Aaron Seacord +1 212 788 0866 +1 212 341 3934 cseacord@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Transit Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexis Downs +1 212 356 2507 +1 212 356 1148 alexis.downs@nyct.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016 Daryl Gregory Leon +1 718 222 2368 dleon@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gail M. Mulligan +1 212 788 8685 +1 212 788 0940 gmulliga@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Salvatore Cassano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin John Traverse +1 212 788 0917 +1 212 788 0940 bentraverse@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Aaron Seacord +1 212 788 0866 +1 212 341 3934 cseacord@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Transit Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexis Downs +1 212 356 2507 +1 212 356 1148 alexis.downs@nyct.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016 Daryl Gregory Leon +1 718 222 2368 dleon@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gail M. Mulligan +1 212 788 8685 +1 212 788 0940 gmulliga@law.nyc.gov
No Logo The City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin John Traverse +1 212 788 0917 +1 212 788 0940 bentraverse@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Aaron Seacord +1 212 788 0866 +1 212 341 3934 cseacord@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Transit Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexis Downs +1 212 356 2507 +1 212 356 1148 alexis.downs@nyct.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016 Daryl Gregory Leon +1 718 222 2368 dleon@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gail M. Mulligan +1 212 788 8685 +1 212 788 0940 gmulliga@law.nyc.gov
No Logo The City of New York Fire Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin John Traverse +1 212 788 0917 +1 212 788 0940 bentraverse@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Aaron Seacord +1 212 788 0866 +1 212 341 3934 cseacord@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Transit Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexis Downs +1 212 356 2507 +1 212 356 1148 alexis.downs@nyct.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/05/2016 Daryl Gregory Leon +1 718 222 2368 dleon@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gail M. Mulligan +1 212 788 8685 +1 212 788 0940 gmulliga@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (148) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. All filing deadlines, conference dates, and the trial date are adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/20/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated January 13, 2017 re: Reporting Status. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 122 Letter filed by Maria Garcia. (In accordance with the requested fact and expert discovery extension, the proposed new schedule for discovery is as follows: Expert Discovery due by 3/21/2017., Fact Discovery due by 3/21/2017., Motions due by 4/4/2017., Pretrial Order due by 4/4/2017.) ENDORSEMENT: The above extension request is granted. The Court will not grant any further extensions absent extraordinary circumstances that could not have been foreseen. Any such application must be in the form of a motion compliant with Local Civl Rule 7.1(a). Any such motion must be accompanied by an affidavit of counsel detailing all efforts that were made to comply with the above deadlines, describing the tasks undertaken with dates and the approximate numbers of hours expended. The existence or progress of settlement discussions may not be used as a basis to seek any further extension. Thus, regardless of the existence of settlement discussions, the parties must re-start discovery in sufficient time to complete it by the above deadlines. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/06/2016) (ama) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated December 6, 2016 re: Parties' Joint Letter Requesting Extension of Fact and Expert Discovery. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 120 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated September 16, 2016 re: The parties' joint letter reporting the status of the discovery dispute concerning the production of documents by defendants and proposing dates for the remaining deadlines in this case based on the parties' efforts to resolve these discovery disputes. Document filed by Maria Garcia. ENDORSEMENT: Schedule modification granted. Be sure to comply with paragraph 2.A of the Court's practices as to any discovery dispute. So ordered. (Expert Discovery due by 1/20/2017. Fact Discovery due by 1/20/2017. Motions due by 2/3/2017. Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2017.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 9/19/2016) (rjm). (Entered: 09/20/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated September 16, 2016 re: The parties' joint letter reporting the status of the discovery dispute concerning the production of documents by defendants and proposing dates for the remaining deadlines in this case based on the parties' efforts to resolve these discovery disputes. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 11/16/2016. (cf)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 118 Letter, filed by Maria Garcia. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Fact Discovery due by 11/16/2016., Motions due by 11/30/2016., Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2016.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/15/2016) (cf) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated July 14, 2016 re: Reporting the status of discovery dispute between the parties and proposing dates for the remaining deadlines in this case. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 116 Letter, filed by Maria Garcia. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 9/9/2016., Fact Discovery due by 9/9/2016., Motions due by 9/23/2016., Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2016.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/13/2016) (kl) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated May 12, 2016 re: The parties joint letter reporting the status of the discovery dispute concerning the production of documents by defendants and proposing dates for the remaining deadlines in this case based on the parties' efforts to resolve these discovery disputes. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 114 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated February 29, 2016 re: reporting status of the discovery disputes between the parties and proposing dates for remaining deadlines in the case. Document filed by Maria Garcia. ENDORSEMENT: The Court commends the parties for their efforts to resolve these disputes. The deadlines in the above paragraph are so ordered. So ordered. (Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2016. Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2016. Motions due by 8/12/2016. Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2016.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/1/2016) (rjm). (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated February 29, 2016 re: reporting status of the discovery disputes between the parties and proposing dates for remaining deadlines in the case. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 112 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File letter on discovery to February 29, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Hon. Gabriel W.) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File joint letter regarding discovery issues addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Christopher A. Seacord dated February 19, 2016. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Seacord, Christopher) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 109 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated February 5, 2016 re: Court Conference regarding a discovery issue. Document filed by Maria Garcia. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to confer again, in person or by telephone, in an effort to resolve each of these issues. The parties shall discuss each issue in detail. If following this process any dispute remains, it may be the subject of a jointly-composed letter that sets forth clearly the precise dispute and that describes in detail each side's position on that dispute. Any such letter must quote the specific language of the Court order that created the defendants' obligation and must be filed by February 24, 2016. If no such letter is filed, the parties shall instead file on or before February 24, 2016, a letter proposing dates for the remaining deadlines in this case. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/10/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Christopher A. Seacord dated February 9, 2016 re: response to plaintiff's letter dated February 5, 2016. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Seacord, Christopher) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated February 5, 2016 re: Court Conference regarding a discovery issue. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 106 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated January 13, 2016 re: Request for Court Conference. Document filed by Maria Garcia. ENDORSEMENT: If any issues remain regarding the production after plaintiff has received the documents defendants say they will produce on January 25, the parties should confer again. Plaintiff may make a new application if the conference does not resolve the matter. If there is a need for an extension of any deadlines, the parties may make a proposal following that conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/20/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Christopher A. Seacord dated January 20, 2016 re: response to plaintiff's letter dated January 13, 2016. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Seacord, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated January 13, 2016 re: Request for Court Conference. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Letter to Judge Gorenstein)(Thayer, James) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 104 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Daryl G. Leon dated December 30, 2015 re: Request To Withdraw As Counsel Of Record For Defendants. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Daryl Gregory Leon terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/5/2016) (adc) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Daryl G. Leon dated December 30, 2015 re: Request To Withdraw As Counsel Of Record For Defendants.. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Leon, Daryl) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Aaron Seacord on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department. (Seacord, Christopher) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2016. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2016. (rjm)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER. While the Court will grant the extensions reflected on the page attached, there will be no further extensions of these deadlines absent the filing of a written motion that (1) shows extraordinary circumstances not foreseeable now that justify an extension; (2) is made as soon as the need for the extension becomes apparent; (3) complies with Local Civil Rule 7.1 and (4) includes an affidavit that describes, on a daily basis from today through the date of the motion, all efforts that were made to comply with the deadline. The pre-motion conference requirement for such a motion is waived. In addition, the production of documents called for by the existing document requests shall be completed by November 20, 2015. There will be no further extensions of this deadline in the absence of the filing of a written motion that meets all four requirements listed in the above paragraph, and as further set forth in this Order. Granting 101 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated October 5, 2015. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Motions due by 4/11/2016. Pretrial Order due by 4/11/2016). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/6/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated October 5, 2015. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 8/15/2015) (rjm). (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER: Garcia has objected to an order of the Honorable Gabriel W. Gorenstein, U.S. Magistrate Judge, concerning the scope of discovery available concerning the disciplinary history and performance evaluations of certain FDNY Emergency Medical Service ("EMS") employees. (Dkt. No. 92.) Judge Gorenstein's in-depth consideration of the matter at two conferences resulted in a reasonable balancing of the relevant factors. The Court concludes that the order in question was not erroneous, much less clearly erroneous. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs objection is OVERRULED. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/3/2015) (kko) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Interim Pretrial Conference proceeding held on 06/25/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/25/2015 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2015.(ca) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James Thayer dated July 27, 2015 re: In response to defendants' July 20, 2015 letter to the Court regarding plaintiff's objections to Magistrate Judge Gorenstein's June 25, 2015 dicovery rulings. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 94 Letter re: Defendants' July 20, 2015 Letter to the Court in response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Gorenstein's June 25, 2015 Discovery Rulings, filed by Maria Garcia. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Plaintiff may file a short reply on or before July 27, 2015. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/21/2015) (kko) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James Thayer dated July 21, 2015 re: Defendants' July 20, 2015 Letter to the Court in response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Gorensteins June 25, 2015 Discovery Rulings. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Daryl Gregory Leon dated July 20, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiff's Objections to June 25, 2015 Discovery Order of Magistrate Judge Gorenstein. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Leon, Daryl) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James Thayer dated July 9, 2015 re: Objections to June 25, 2015 Discovery Order of Magistrate Judge Gorenstein. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Thayer, James) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 11/30/2015. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2015. (rjm)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 90 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated June 30, 2015. Document filed by Maria Garcia. Granted. So ordered. (Motions due by 12/10/2015. Pretrial Order due by 12/10/2015). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/1/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated June 30, 2015. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/25/2015. Discovery orders issued as stated in the transcript of the proceeding. (sg)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated June 16, 2015 re: In response to defendants' Letter requesting a conference and interposing a new objection to plaintiff's document requests. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER: A conference to discuss the discovery dispute raised in the letter dated June 12, 2015, will take place on Thursday, June 25, 2015, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6-B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. A responsive letter should be submitted in accordance with paragraph 2.A of this Court's Individual Practices. It is the Court's intention to decide the dispute based on the parties' letters unless a party shows good cause in advance of the conference why formal briefing should be required. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery Hearing set for 6/25/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 6B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/12/2015) (ama) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Daryl Gregory Leon dated June 12, 2015 re: Discovery. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Leon, Daryl) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James Michael Thayer on behalf of Maria Garcia. New Address: GORDON, GORDON & SCHNAPP, P.C., 30 Broad Street, 21st Floor, New York, New York, United States 10004, (212) 355-3200. (Thayer, James) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Discovery Hearing proceeding held on 04/03/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Discovery Hearing held on 4/3/2015 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2015.(ca) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2015. Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2015. (rjm)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 82 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Daryl Gregory Leon dated April 15, 2015. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department. Granted. So ordered. (Discovery due by 7/31/2015. Motions due by 8/10/2015. Pretrial Order due by 8/10/2015). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/15/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Daryl Gregory Leon dated April 15, 2015. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Leon, Daryl) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Discovery Hearing held on 4/3/2015. Discovery orders issued as set forth in the transcript. (Gorenstein, Hon. Gabriel W.)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated March 31, 2015 re: Defendants' Letters dated March 26, 2015 and March 30, 2015. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      SECOND LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Daryl Gregory Leon dated March 30, 2015 re: Discovery Conference. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Leon, Daryl) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Daryl Gregory Leon dated March 26, 2015 re: Discovery Conference. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Leon, Daryl) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 77 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to make expert disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(A), (B), or (C) is extended to April 6, 2015 and the deadline to make responsive disclosures is extended to May 5, 2015. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Hon. Gabriel W.) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to make expert disclosures and rebuttal expert disclosures addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated March 26, 2015. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER. A conference to discuss the discovery dispute raised in the letter dated March 25, 2015, will take place on Friday, April 3, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6-B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, and as further set forth. (Discovery Hearing set for 4/3/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6B, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/26/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated March 25, 2015 re: Discovery Motion. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Thayer, James) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 73 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Leon, Daryl) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 67 Amended Complaint, against Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Maria Garcia. Related document: 67 Amended Complaint, filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 5/26/2015. Fact Discovery due by 5/26/2015. (rjm)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 70 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and extension of other deadlines addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated January 13, 2015. Document filed by Maria Garcia. Granted. So ordered. (Discovery due by 5/26/2015. Motions due by 6/9/2015. Pretrial Order due by 6/9/2015). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/13/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Leon, Daryl) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and extension of other deadlines addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated January 13, 2015. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice 68 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for failure to comply with paragraph 1.E of this Court's Individual Practices. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James Thayer dated January 12, 2015. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 45 Amended Complaint, against Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Maria Garcia. Related document: 45 Amended Complaint, filed by Maria Garcia.(Thayer, James) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/10/2015. Fact Discovery due by 3/27/2015. Expert Discovery due by 3/27/2015. All Discovery due by 3/27/2015. Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2015, and as further set forth. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/1/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daryl Gregory Leon on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department. (Leon, Daryl) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael Thayer on behalf of Maria Garcia. (Thayer, James) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth E. Gordon on behalf of Maria Garcia. (Gordon, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court finds it strange that Mr. Gordon could not take the time to write a letter to the Court himself. Nonetheless, the Court's intention would be to give new counsel a reasonable amount of time to complete discovery in this matter. The Court has never before been asked to rule on a discovery extension made by an attorney who conditions his appearance on the granting of the extension. Nonetheless, the Court is prepared to state that it expects that it would grant the requested extension provided a notice of appearance is filed by September 26, 2014. If counsel does not file a notice of appearance by that date, plaintiff is reminded that she must proceed pro se in this matter and that the schedule contained in the order dated August 21, 2014 applies.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 9/22/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 9/22/2014 re: response to 9/15/14 letter. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from James M. Thayer dated 9/15/14 re: status of case and existing schedule. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Gonzalez, Sylvia) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Plaintiff has sent a letter to the Court dated August 12, 2014, seeking a stay in this case of six months to allow plaintiff to obtain new counsel. Defendant opposes this request in a letter dated August 19, 2014. Plaintiff's request for a six month delay in this case is far to lengthy. Granting it would unfairly prejudice the defendants and thus the request is denied.... The Court will grant an additional three weeks for plaintiff to retain an attorney. Accordingly, the Court hereby stays discovery in this case until September 26, 2014.... The Court hereby adjusts the prior discovery schedule as follows. This discovery schedule shall apply whether Ms. Garcia is proceeding pro se or by counsel, unless the Court grants an extension: All discovery in this matter, both fact and expert, shall be completed by December 5, 2014. The parties shall inform each other in writing by December 5, 2014, whether either intends to file a summary judgment motion. Any summary judgment motion shall be filed by December 23, 2014 in accordance with Judge Oetken's Individual Practices. If no party states its intention to file a summary judgment motion, the parties will supply to each other the pretrial order materials required by Judge Oetken's Individual Practices on or before December 12, 2014. The pre-trial order materials shall be filed by December 19, 2014. If, however, a summary judgment motion is filed on or before the date in the previous paragraph, the due date of the pretrial order is extended to 30 days after the disposition of the summary judgment motion. (Discovery due by 12/5/2014. Expert Discovery due by 12/5/2014. Fact Discovery due by 12/5/2014. Motions due by 12/23/2014. Pretrial Order due by 12/19/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 8/21/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ja) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 8/19/2014 re: response to plaintiff's letter dated 8/12/2014. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Maria T. Garcia dated 8/12/2014 re: Plaintiff requests an extension of six months to obtain new counsel, seek leave to amend the complaint, and complete discovery. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (tn) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is unnecessary that any formal briefing take place. Mr. Fausto Zapata is hereby terminated as the attorney of record for Ms. Maria Garcia. The Clerk is requested to terminate his appearance on the docket sheet. Ms. Garcia is now proceeding in this action pro se. In light of her statement that she intends to obtain a new attorney, the Court hereby stays discovery in this case until September 5, 2014. However, if no attorney has filed a notice of appearance on Ms. Garcia's behalf by September 5, 2014, the case shall continue with Ms. Garcia proceeding pro se. All discovery in this matter, both fact and expert, shall be completed by November 14, 2014. The parties shall inform each other in writing by November 14, 2014, whether either intends to file a summary judgment motion. Any summary judgment motion shall be filed by December 5, 2014 in accordance with Judge Oetken's Individual Practices. If no party states its intention to file a summary judgment motion, the parties will supply to each other the pretrial order materials required by Judge Oetken's Individual Practices on or before November 28, 2014. The pre-trial order materials shall be filed by December 12, 2014. If, however, a summary judgment motion is filed on or before the date in the previous paragraph, the due date of the pretrial order is extended to 30 days after the disposition of the summary judgment motion. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 11/14/2014., Expert Discovery due by 11/14/2014., Fact Discovery due by 11/14/2014., Motions due by 12/5/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 8/06/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Alexsis Downs dated 8/4/2014 re: In response to plaintiff's letter requesting time to find new counsel and for a premotion conference. Document filed by The City of New York.(cd) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Fausto E. Zapata dated 8/4/2014 re: Request for a premotion conference. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(cd) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Maria T. Garcia dated 7/28/2014 re: I respectfully request to be free to retain other legal representation in my case. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(kgo) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 50 Letter filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York Fire Department. ENDORSEMENT: The Application for an extension is Denied for failure to comply with paragraph 2.A of this Court's Individual Practices. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/12/2014) (ama) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 49 without prejudice Letter Motion for Conference. Ms. Downs is directed to telephone plaintiff's counsel immediately to discuss this matter in full. In the future, counsel are to return each other's telephone calls within one business day absent an emergency. The instant application is denied without prejudice to a new application that complies with paragraph 2.A of this Court's Individual Practices. Counsel are to make every possible effort to resolve the dispute themselves first. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Assistant Corporation Counsel Alexis Downs dated 6/12/14 re: Plaintiff's application for pre-motion conference. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Fausto E. Zapata, Jr. dated 6-11-2014. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 45 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 46 Letter filed by Maria Garcia. As a result, the parties are requesting an additional 90 days to complete discovery, extending the discovery deadline to August 14, 2014. Summary judgment motions will be filed by September 4, 2014, and within 30 days of the disposition of pre-trial motions, the parties will submit a joint pretrial order in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 8/14/2014., Motions due by 9/4/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/16/2014) (ama) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT AMENDED COMPLAINT. Notice to Attorney Fausto Zapata RE: Document No. 45 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party was selected for FILED AGAINST Re-file the document and select the correct party you are filing against. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Fausto E. Zapata, Jr. dated 5-16-2014 re: Discovery Deadlines. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 13 Amended Complaint, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Maria Garcia. Related document: 13 Amended Complaint, filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) Modified on 5/19/2014 (laq). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2014. (Gonzalez, Sylvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 41 Motion to Amend/Correct without opposition as stated at a telephone conference held today. Counsel shall file the proposed second amended complaint forthwith. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . . Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Fausto E. Zapata, Jr. in Support re: 41 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct .. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Fausto Ernesto Zapata to RE-FILE Document 40 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. Use the Event - Affirmation in Support of Motion (for Certification of Zapata in Support of Motion) it is found under the Event Type - Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. Refile both documents. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) Modified on 5/9/2014 (db). (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Fausto Ernesto Zapata to RE-FILE Document 39 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . ERROR(S): No PDF is attached to this filing. After refiling this document, check to see if PDF was attached properly. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) Modified on 5/7/2014 (db). (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Fausto Ernesto Zapata to RE-FILE Document 38 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . ERROR(S): No PDF is attached to this filing. After refiling this document, check to see if PDF was attached properly. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) Modified on 5/7/2014 (db). (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Fausto Ernesto Zapata to RE-FILE Document 37 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . ERROR(S): No PDF is attached to this filing. After refiling this document, check to see if PDF was attached properly. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) Modified on 5/6/2014 (db). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 35 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall provide the defendants with a copy of the proposed amended complaint by April 28, 2014. If defendants consent to the filing, send a letter so stating and the Court will issue an order that permits the filing of the amended complaint. If defendants do not consent, any motion to amend shall be filed by May 5, 2014. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (NO PDF ATTACHED) - SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Fausto E. Zapata, Jr. dated 4/25/2014. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) Modified on 4/28/2014 (db). (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 33 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend The request for an extension is denied for failure to comply with paragraph 1.E of this Court's Individual Practices. As to the proposed motion to amend,the pre-motion conference requirement is waived. Plaintiff shall immediately provide defendants with a copy of the proposed amended complaint. Counsel should check with defendants to see if they will simply stipulate to its filing. The Court notes that the consideration of the futility of a proposed amendment to a pleading is addressed to a courts discretion, Grace v. Rosenstock, 228 F.3d 40, 53 (2d Cir. 2000), and if this is the only basis defendants have for opposing the amendment, it would be best to stipulate to its filing. By doing so, defendants will preserve any arguments about the merits of the claims for any future motion that addresses the merits. Any motion to amend shall be filed by April 28, 2014. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 13 Amended Complaint, addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Fausto E. Zapata, Jr. dated 4-18-2014. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. All discovery in this matter, both fact and expert, shall be completed by May 14, 2014. 2. The parties shall inform each other in writing by May 14, 2014, whether either intends to file a summary judgment motion. 3. Any summary judgment motion shall be filed by June 4, 2014 in accordance with Judge Oetken's Individual Practices. 4. If no party states its intention to file a summary judgment motion, the parties will supply to each other the pretrial order materials required by Judge Oetken's Individual Practices on or before May 28, 2014. The pre-trial order materials shall be filed by June 11, 2014. If, however, a summary judgment motion is filed on or before the date in the previous paragraph, the due date of the pretrial order is extended to 30 days after the disposition of the summary judgment motion. SO ORDERED. (Motions for summary judgement due by 6/4/2014. Discovery due by 5/14/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/11/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexis Downs on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department. (Downs, Alexis) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Settlement Conference held on 2/19/2014. (Gonzalez, Sylvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The letter and acknowledgement form may be faxed to the Court (and faxed or emailed to opposing counsel) by 5:30 p.m. today (Feb. 18). Read the order dated January 16, 2014 and the accompanying Standing order carefully to determine the requirements for the letter. The defendants are granted a similar extension. Do not fax anything over 15 pages. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Gabriel) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File mediation brief addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Fausto E. Zapata, Jr., Plaintiff's Counsel dated 02/18/2014. Document filed by Maria Garcia.(Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 27 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. Note new time. Letters due Feb. 12. Settlement Conference set for 2/19/2014 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/27/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Benjamin J Traverse dated 1/26/14. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Traverse, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 25 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court is unavailable on the date requested. Counsel is directed to read the Order dated January 16, 2014, which contains detailed instructions on the process that must be used to seek an adjournment of the conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Benjamin J Traverse dated 1/23/14. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Traverse, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for January 31, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6-B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York as further set forth in this order., ( Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/16/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER temporarily granting 22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery stayed pending the conclusion of the settlement conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein)(Text Only Order) (Gorenstein, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Telephone Conference held on 1/16/2014. (Gonzalez, Sylvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Benjamin J Traverse dated 1/15/14., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Benjamin J Traverse dated 1/15/14. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Traverse, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery extension to January 31, 2014, granted. Letter to Judge Oetken on summary judgment also due January 31, 2014. No further extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. Settlement discussions will not constitute extraordinary circumstances. So Ordered Discovery due by 1/31/2014.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/30/2013) (js) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Benjamin J Traverse dated 12/30/13. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Traverse, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Fausto E. Zapata, Jr. dated 11/5/2013 re: Counsel for plaintiff respectfully requests an extension of six weeks from November 22, 2013 to January 3, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Summary judgment request to J. Oetken due January 10, 2014. (Discovery due by 1/3/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/6/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Benjamin J. Traverse dated 9/27/2013 re: Counsel for defendant respectfully requests that Your Honor extend the current discovery deadline by approximately one month, from October 18, 2013 to November 22, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Requests to Judge Oetken to file a summary judgment and motion by November 27, 2013. (Discovery due by 11/22/2013.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/3/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Traverse, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Benjamin J. Traverse dated 6/27/2013 re: The parties respectfully request that Your Honor extend the discovery deadline by three weeks, to October 18, 2013, and that a concomitant extension be granted for any request to file a motion for summary judgment, meaning any such request would be due no later than October 25, 2013. Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions will be responded to no later than July 12, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered., ( Discovery due by 10/18/2013.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/28/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Fausto E. Zapata, Jr. dated 6/7/2013 re: I write to request a pre-motion conference. ENDORSEMENT: Denied without prejudice for failure to comply with paragraph 2.A of this Court's Individual Practices. A new application may be made in compliance with that paragraph. The Court notes that if defendants have failed to comply with the deadline contained in paragraph 3 of the Court's Order dated May 23, 2013 (Docket # 14), without seeking and being granted an extension, they risk being sanctioned. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/7/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/28/2013. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/24/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Maria Garcia. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Maria Garcia.(cd) (mro). (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/12/2013 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (pl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are submitting the following proposed discovery plan: The scheduling conference in this matter is scheduled for March 12, 2013, 9:45 a.m. Any joinder of the parties or amendment of the pleadings shall be completed by March 19, 2013. All discovery shall be completed by July 31, 2013. Any request to make a summary judgment motion shall be submitted to Judge Oetken no later than August 9, 2013. The parties believe that a three day jury trial will likely be required. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/19/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 3/19/2013. Discovery due by 7/31/2013.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/12/2013) (pl) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 3/12/2013. (pl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Please be advised that Judge Oetken's Courtroom and Chambers have been moved to the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse located at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. Effective immediately, all proceedings before the Court will take place in Courtroom 706. Judge Oetken's Chambers are located in Room 2101, 40 Foley Square. The Court's Individual Practices remain available at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Oetken. (Skolnik, Brandon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin John Traverse on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department (Traverse, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: that this action is scheduled for an initial case management conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), on March 12, 2013 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. All parties must appear at this conference and should arrive prior to the scheduled time so that the conference may begin promptly. Upon receipt of this order, each counsel is directed to confirm with all other counsel that each party to this proceeding (or that party's counsel) has received a copy of this order. In addition, please note that the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure require the parties to confer before this conference to discuss the matters set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Additionally, the parties' attention is directed to the initial disclosure requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(l). (Initial Conference set for 3/12/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/28/2013) (pl) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department.(Mulligan, Gail) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Michael R. Bloomberg answer due 2/20/2013; Salvatore Cassano answer due 2/20/2013; The City of New York answer due 2/20/2013; The City of New York Fire Department answer due 2/20/2013. (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gail M. Mulligan dated 1/17/13 re: Counsel writes to request that defendants' time to respond to the complaint be extended from 1/18/13 to 2/20/13. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/22/2013) (mro) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gail M. Mulligan on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department (Mulligan, Gail) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/7/2013) (cd) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Michael R. Bloomberg served on 12/28/2012, answer due 1/18/2013. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Aronov. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Salvatore Cassano served on 12/28/2012, answer due 1/18/2013. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Aronov. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York served on 12/28/2012, answer due 1/18/2013. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Aronov. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York Fire Department served on 12/28/2012, answer due 1/18/2013. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Aronov. Document filed by Maria Garcia. (Zapata, Fausto) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Fausto Ernesto Zapata, Jr. for noncompliance with Section 14.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 1 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Michael R. Bloomberg, Salvatore Cassano, The City of New York, The City of New York Fire Department. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1055644)Document filed by Maria Garcia.(laq) (mqu). (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?