Myers v. Lioness Holdings, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-01968
District Judge Michael W. Mosman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 6:13 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Stacey Myers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
v.
No Logo Lioness Holdings, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Griffin & McCandlish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. Griffin +1 503 224 2348 mark@markgriffin.com
No Logo Ryan Reeves, Defendant
No Logo Tan Republic Franchise Company, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Griffin & McCandlish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. Griffin +1 503 224 2348 mark@markgriffin.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 5(a)
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Stacey Myers. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Stay 30 . Per the parties' agreement, deadlines in this case are STAYED for 90 days. The parties are ordered to provide a joint status report or otherwise file a notice of dismissal by September 6, 2017. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Declaration of Dale in Support of Motion to Stay. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay 30 .) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Joint Motion for Stay of all court deadlines. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER: Striking the telephone Rule 16 conference scheduled for Tuesday, April 18, 2017 at 11:30am. ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 22 as moot, with leave to renew. The Joint Motion for Extension of Time 25 is GRANTED. The discovery deadline is June 9, 0217 and the dispositive motions deadline is July 10, 2017. The Pretrial Order is due October 16, 2017 and the Joint Alternative Dispute Resolution Report is due October 16, 2017. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs). (Entered: 04/13/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion to Compel Discovery 22, Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 25 . Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/18/2017 at 11:30AM in Portland by telephone before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Order regarding Motion to Compel Discovery 22 .. Response is due by 4/17/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich in Support of Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 25 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Stacey Myers. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Declaration of Gavin S. Barney In Support of Motion to Compel Discovery. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Related document(s): Motion to compel 22 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Related document(s): Motion to compel 22 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Motion to Compel Discovery. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Stacey Myers. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Clerk's Entry of Default as to Ryan Reeves. (rs) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER: GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Entry of Default 17 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich in Support of Unopposed Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant Ryan Reeves. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Related document(s): Motion for default 17 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Unopposed Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant Ryan Reeves. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 14 . Discovery is extended from 02/09/2017, to be completed by 4/17/2017. Dispositive Motions are due by 5/15/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report extended from 03/13/207,due by 10/16/2017. Pretrial Order is extended from 03/13/2017, due by 10/16/2017. Signed on 02/06/2017 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich in Support of Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 14 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Stacey Myers. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Tan Republic Franchise Company, LLC. (Griffin, Mark) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Lioness Holdings, LLC. (Griffin, Mark) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice of Appearance of Mark E. Griffin appearing on behalf of Tan Republic Franchise Company, LLC Filed by on behalf of Tan Republic Franchise Company, LLC (Griffin, Mark) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Affidavit of Service upon Ryan Reeves served on 1/17/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - USPS receipt, # 2 Exhibit B - USPS Tracking) Filed by Stacey Myers. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Answer to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lioness Holdings and Tan Republic Franchise Company Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Lioness Holdings, LLC. (Griffin, Mark) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Service by Alternative Means 4 . Plaintiff has until February 8, 2017 to complete service of process upon Defendant Ryan Reeves. Plaintiff may serve Defendant Ryan Reeves by the alternative methods requested in Plaintiff's Motion 4 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (mjp) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Affidavit of Service upon Tan Republic Franchise Company, LLC served on 11/30/2016 Filed by Stacey Myers. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Lioness Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 11/19/2016. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Declaration of Gavin S. Barney . Filed by Stacey Myers. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time, Motion - Miscellaneous 4 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Attempted Service of Summons, # 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Attempted Service by Certified Mail, # 3 Exhibit C - Return of Certified Mail) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Summons, Motion for Service by Alternative Methods. Filed by Stacey Myers. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/9/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/13/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 3/13/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4780748 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Stacey Myers against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Lioness Holdings, LLC, # 3 Proposed Summons Tan Republic Franchise, LLC, # 4 Proposed Summons Ryan Reeves). (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?