QUELLETT v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-00675
District Judge Robert L. Hinkle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 3:40 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KYLE DAVID QUELLETT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY MARIE A MATTOX +1 850 383 4800 +1 850 383 4801 marie@mattoxlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHERINE LANIER VIKER +1 850 443 7570 katherine@mattoxlaw.com
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL - GAINES ST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN JAMES STABLEY brian.stabley@myfloridalegal.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 0794
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S JUDGMENT, entered pursuant to 22 Order. (tdl) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re 20 & 21 Notices. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "The parties are ordered to comply with their settlement agreement. The court reserves jurisdiction to enforce the order to comply with the settlement agreement. All claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41." The clerk must close the file. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/21/2017. (tdl) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Settlement by KYLE DAVID QUELLETT (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Settlement by KYLE DAVID QUELLETT (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE SUMMARY-JUDGMENT MOTION - The plaintiff's unopposed motion, ECF No. 18, to extend the deadline to respond to the summary-judgment motion is granted. (Response to motion due by by 5/12/2017.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/9/2017. (tdl) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Consent MOTION to Extend Time by KYLE DAVID QUELLETT. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE SUMMARY-JUDGMENT MOTION (Response in Opposition to 16 Motion due by 5/5/2017.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/4/2017. (tdl) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by KYLE DAVID QUELLETT. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MEDIATION REPORT - Impasse (tdl) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 5/3/2017). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing, # 2 Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Affidavit) (STABLEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE LANIER VIKER on behalf of KYLE DAVID QUELLETT (VIKER, KATHERINE) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FINISH SPECIFIC DOCUMENT PRODUCTION - The plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend the discovery deadline, ECF No. 11, is granted in part. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/21/2017. (tdl) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed) by KYLE DAVID QUELLETT. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Attorney Conference to take place by 6/6/2017. Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/20/2017. Jury Trial set for 7/17/2017 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2017 02:00 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/16/2017. (tdl) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re 8 Report: (Discovery due by 3/31/2017., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/21/2017., Jury Trial set for 7/17/2017 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE., Mediation Report due by 4/28/2017.) Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/22/2016. (tdl) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (STABLEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Defendant DOC's ANSWER to Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (STABLEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ORDER DENYING THE 3 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/28/2016. (tdl) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ORDER ORDER ON RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/28/2016. (tdl) Modified on 12/22/2016 (erl). (Entered: 10/28/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/14/2016. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/12/2016. Discovery due by 2/23/2017. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/28/2016. (tdl) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (STABLEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS from Leon County, FL Circuit Court, case number 2016-CA-001844. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3712880.), filed by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (STABLEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET. (STABLEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?