National Labor Relations Board v. Rufus
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01578
District Judge George Levi Russell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 4:48 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Chad Horton +1 410 962 2822 +1 410 962 2198 chad.horton@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Asia Rufus, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Order to Show Cause by National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return of Service and Declaration of Jeffrey Levy)(Horton, Chad) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER directing Rufus to appear in Courtroom 7A on 12/6/2018 at 12 p.m. and show cause, If any exists, why the Court should not issue an order holding her in contempt of this Court's 8/14/18 Order directing her to comply with the subpoena ad testificandum A-1-10KH1EN; directing NLRB to personally serve a copy of this Order on Refus and file an affidavit of service with the Court within 7 days of the hearing. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/16/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Sanctions and Order Adjudicating Respondent Asia Rufus in Civil Contempt by National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Acting RD Order Setting Date for Testimony, # 2 Exhibit UPS Returned Undeliverable - North Milton Address, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey Levy, # 4 Exhibit August 30, 2018 Proceeding Transcript, # 5 Exhibit August 30, 2018 Proceeding Exhibits)(Horton, Chad) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 1 Application for Order Enforcing Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum filed by National Labor Relations Board. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/14/2018. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER directing Clerk to close this case. Relief sought in NLRB's Application were granted at the hearing held on 8/14/18. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/14/18. (c/m and order 8/14/18)(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Show Cause Hearing held on 8/14/2018 before Judge George Levi Russell, III.(Court Reporter: Nadine Gazic) (J. Herndons, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AFFIDAVIT Proof of Service of Order to Show Cause and Application by National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service by Process Server)(Horton, Chad) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/3/2018. (c/m 7/3/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Correspondence re: Notice to Court that Richard Neuworth Esq. Does Not Represent Ms. Rufus (Neuworth, Richard) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Application for Order Enforcing Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of NLRB's Application for Order Requiring Compliance With Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum, # 2 Proposed Order to Show Just Cause, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Application for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2018: # 10 Civil Cover Sheet) (jb5, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 20 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?