Ahmed Kamal v. J Crew Group Inc
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 17-2453

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 1:59 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013057860 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Keara M. Gordon, Esq. for Appellees Chinos Acquisition Corp, Chinos Holdings Inc, J Crew Group Inc, J Crew Inc, J Crew Intermediate LLC, J Crew International Inc, J Crew Operating Corp and J Crew Services Inc in 17-2345, Attorney Keara M. Gordon, Esq. for Appellants J Crew Group Inc, J Crew Inc, J Crew Intermediate LLC, J Crew International Inc, J Crew Operating Corp, J Crew Services Inc, Chinos Acquisition Corp and Chinos Holdings Inc in 17-2453 J. Crew Group, Inc. responds to the supplemental authority submitted by Ahmed Kamal, on October 5, 2018.. Certificate of Service dated 10/11/2018. Service made by ECF. [17-2345, 17-2453] (KMG) [Entered: 10/11/2018 01:09 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013054083 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Ahmed Kamal in 17-2345, filed. Certificate of Service dated 10/05/2018 by ECF. [17-2345, 17-2453] (MLF) [Entered: 10/05/2018 05:59 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013054065 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: Letter dated 10/05/2018, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant Ahmed Kamal in 17-2345. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [17-2345, 17-2453] (MLF) [Entered: 10/05/2018 05:46 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013041044 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CLERK'S LETTER to counsel written at the direction of the Court. The parties are directed to submit supplemental letter briefs addressing the impact of the recent decision in Long v. Se. Pa. Transp. Auth., No. 17-1889 (3d Cir. Sept. 10, 2018), on the issues presented in this appeal. Letter briefs shall not exceed ten (10) pages and shall be due within fourteen days from the date of this letter. [17-2345, 17-2453] (PM) [Entered: 09/21/2018 04:06 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013010306 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees/Cross- Appellants Chinos Acquisition Corp, Chinos Holdings Inc, J Crew Group Inc, J Crew Inc, J Crew Intermediate LLC, J Crew International Inc, J Crew Operating Corp and J Crew Services Inc to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 08/16/2018. Service made by ECF. [17-2345, 17-2453]--[Edited 08/16/2018 by TMM] (KMG) [Entered: 08/16/2018 10:14 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013007682 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: Letter dated 08/13/2018, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant Ahmed Kamal in 17-2345. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [17-2345, 17-2453] (MLF) [Entered: 08/13/2018 05:01 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012873664 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Ahmed Kamal in 17-2345 to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 03/12/2018. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [17-2345, 17-2453] (MLF) [Entered: 03/12/2018 07:04 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012873505 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL Letter dated 03/12/2018, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellee J Crew Inc in 17-2345, Appellant J Crew Inc in 17-2453. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [17-2345, 17-2453] (AOB) [Entered: 03/12/2018 04:33 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012860738 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: Letter dated 02/26/2018, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant Ahmed Kamal in 17-2345. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [17-2345, 17-2453] (MLF) [Entered: 02/26/2018 11:03 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012859085 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ECF FILER: Letter dated 02/22/2018, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellees Chinos Acquisition Corp, Chinos Holdings Inc, J Crew Group Inc, J Crew Inc, J Crew Intermediate LLC, J Crew International Inc, J Crew Operating Corp and J Crew Services Inc in 17-2345, Appellants Chinos Acquisition Corp, Chinos Holdings Inc, J Crew Group Inc, J Crew Inc, J Crew Intermediate LLC, J Crew International Inc, J Crew Operating Corp and J Crew Services Inc in 17-2453. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [17-2345, 17-2453] (AOB) [Entered: 02/22/2018 05:06 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 9 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?