Anthony Robinson v. US Deparment of Education
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 18-1822

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2019 at 8:38 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Anthony Robinson. Counsel arguing: Quinn Lobato Opening argument time: 13 Rebuttal argument time: 7 . [1000421143] [18-1822] Quinn Lobato [Entered: 12/13/2018 08:31 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by United States Department of Education. Counsel arguing: Sarah Carroll Answering argument time: 20 minutes [1000419593] [18-1822] Sarah Carroll [Entered: 12/12/2018 12:05 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 01/29/2019. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 10 days. [18-1822] JLC [Entered: 12/12/2018 11:11 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to Anthony Robinson requesting three additional copies of CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF and JOINT APPENDIX. Additional copies due 12/14/2018. [18-1822] AD [Entered: 12/11/2018 12:06 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Additional copies of the RESPONSE BRIEF received from United States Department of Education. [18-1822] TB [Entered: 11/19/2018 11:19 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/29/19 - 1/31/19 argument session. Additional copies due: 11/26/2018. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 11/26/2018. [18-1822] JLC [Entered: 11/16/2018 04:00 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Receipt of paper copy of RESPONSE BRIEF filed at [18] by United States Department of Education. Number of pages: [61]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 10/01/2018. [1000380209] [18-1822] KH [Entered: 10/05/2018 02:48 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                BRIEF by United States Department of Education in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/28/2018. [1000375791] [18-1822] Sarah Carroll [Entered: 09/28/2018 02:14 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Receipt of paper copy of CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF filed at [14] by Anthony Robinson. Number of pages [44]. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 09/04/2018. [1000363024] [18-1822] KH [Entered: 09/07/2018 09:27 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Corrected BRIEF by Appellant Anthony Robinson in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/04/2018. [1000359800] [18-1822] Quinn Lobato [Entered: 09/01/2018 08:07 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 5 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?