Scott Andrew Watson - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Colorado Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 04-01435
District Judge Sidney B. Brooks, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 10:18 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Its Successors and/or Assigns In Interest, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillip M. Kleinsmith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Phillip M. Kleinsmith +1 719 593 1970
v.
No Logo Scott Andrew Watson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott Andrew Watson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Andrew Watson
No Logo Tom H. Connolly, Trustee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tom H. Connolly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tom H. Connolly +1 303 661 9292 +1 303 661 9555
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Adversary Case Number 04-1435 SBB Closed. (rc)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 09/23/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/24/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Sua Sponte Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (related document(s)1 Complaint, ). (do) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 04-1435 SBB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (do)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Total Notices: 2 . Service Date 08/26/2004. (Related Doc # 10) (Admin.) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Order for the Plaintiff to Advance Administration of the Within Proceeding (related document(s)1 Complaint, ). Document due by 9/10/2004 for 1, (rc) (Entered: 08/24/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Total Notices: 2 . Service Date 06/10/2004. (Related Doc # 8) (Admin.) (Entered: 06/10/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Order (related document(s):7 Motion for Entry of Order). (rc) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Summons Service Executed On: Scott Andrew Watson in c/o Marcus Grossenbach on April 23, 2004 Filed by Phillip M. Kleinsmith on behalf of Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Its Successors and/or Assigns In Interest . (rc) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons Service Executed On: Tom H Connolly on April 23, 2004 Filed by Phillip M. Kleinsmith on behalf of Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Its Successors and/or Assigns In Interest . (rc) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Summons Service Executed On: Scott Andrew Watson on April 25, 2004 Filed by Phillip M. Kleinsmith on behalf of Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Its Successors and/or Assigns In Interest . (rc) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Motion to Enter Order Declaring Public Trustee's Sale Void Filed by Phillip M. Kleinsmith on behalf of Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Its Successors and/or Assigns In Interest . (Attachments: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (rc) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Corrected Entry. Corrected Plaintiff's name from "It's" to "Its" (related document(s): New Adversary Proceeding Opened). (llh)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Receipt of Adversary Proceeding Filing Fee - $150.00 by CK. Receipt Number 00158335. (Entered: 04/08/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              New Adversary Proceeding Opened . (csk)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Complaint. Adversary Proceeding Number 04-1435 SBB. Nature of Suit 498 (Other Action, Not Related) by Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, It's Successors and/or Assigns in Interest against Tom H. Connolly, Scott Andrew Watson Filed by Phillip M. Kleinsmith Adversary Status Deadline 8/5/2004 (jc) (Entered: 04/08/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Summons Issued on Tom H. Connolly Answer Due 5/7/2004; Scott Andrew Watson Answer Due 5/7/2004. (jc) (Entered: 04/08/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?