Gonzalez Perez v. Pavilion Construction NW LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00848
Magistrate Judge Paul Papak, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 10:55 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo P R Drywall LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullard Smith Jernstedt Wilson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/16/2016 David J. Riewald +1 503 248 1134 +1 503 224 8851 driewald@bullardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anne E. Denecke +1 503 542 7828 +1 503 961 1051 adenecke@deneckelaw.com
No Logo Hugo Gonzalez Perez, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
No Logo Jose Luis Lopez Garcia, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
No Logo Juan Francisco Peregrina Silva, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
No Logo Jose Antonio Gonzalez, Cross Defendant
No Logo Pavilion Construction NW LLC, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ball Janik, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Phillip E. Joseph +1 503 228 2525 +1 503 295 1058 pjoseph@bjllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela M. Otto +1 503 228 2525 +1 503 295 1058 aotto@balljanik.com
No Logo Pavilion Properties, LLC, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ball Janik, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Phillip E. Joseph +1 503 228 2525 +1 503 295 1058 pjoseph@bjllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela M. Otto +1 503 228 2525 +1 503 295 1058 aotto@balljanik.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 2(a)
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, it is Ordered that this action is Dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are Denied as Moot. Signed on 8/29/16 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by P R Drywall LLC (Riewald, David) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Pavilion Properties, LLC. (Otto, Angela) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Pavilion Construction NW LLC. (Otto, Angela) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by P R Drywall LLC. (Denecke, Anne) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Hugo Gonzalez Perez, Jose Luis Lopez Garcia, Juan Francisco Peregrina Silva. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Answer to 30 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim,, with Jury Demand . Filed by P R Drywall LLC. (Denecke, Anne) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Rule 16 Conference held 1/19/16. Order Resetting the following deadlines: Discovery is to be completed by 8/31/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/31/2016. Written consents, if any, should be submitted by 8/31/2016. Dispositive Motions are due by 9/30/2016. Pretrial Order is due by 10/31/2016 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. Bonnie Allen-Sailer present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Angela Otto; Anne Denecke present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Exhibits 1 and 2 re Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim 31 . Filed by P R Drywall LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2) (Riewald, David) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Answer to 17 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, Crossclaim Jose Antonio Gonzalez, Counterclaim All Plaintiffs. Filed by P R Drywall LLC. (Riewald, David) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Answer to 17 Amended Complaint Defendants Pavilion Construction, LLC's and Pavilion Properties, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Cross-Claim against Defendant PR Drywall LLC, Crossclaim P R Drywall LLC. Filed by Pavilion Properties, LLC, Pavilion Construction NW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2) (Otto, Angela) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Rule 16 Conference set for 1/19/2016 at 1:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. Order: The discovery/dispositive motions deadlines are extended until the date of the conference when revision of these and other deadlines can be discussed. (gm) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Second Return of Service Unexecuted as to Jose Antonio Gonzalez. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            First Return of Service Unexecuted as to Jose Antonio Gonzalez. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Based on Pavilion Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal 25, their Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss 10 is Withdrawn and the matter Stricken from the Oral Argument Calendar of 1/6/2016 at 10:00AM. Order: Answer deadline reset to 1/4/2016 for Defendants Pavilion Construction NW LLC and Pavilion Properties LLC. (gm) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Notice re Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 10 Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants Pavilion Construction NW LLC's and Pavilion Properties LLC's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Pavilion Construction NW LLC, Pavilion Properties, LLC (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 10 .) (Otto, Angela) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notice of Appearance of Anne E. Denecke appearing on behalf of P R Drywall LLC Filed by on behalf of P R Drywall LLC (Denecke, Anne) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Notice of Appearance of David J. Riewald appearing on behalf of P R Drywall LLC Filed by on behalf of P R Drywall LLC (Riewald, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Pavilion Defendants' unopposed E-mail Request dated 12/14/15 for extension of time as follows: Reply to response to dismissal motion due by 12/21/2015. (gm) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Notice of Change of Address. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Pavilion Defendants' unopposed E-mail Request dated 11/24/15 for extension of time as follows: Reply to dismissal motion due by 12/14/2015. Order: Resetting Pavilion Defendants' Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss 10 from 12/14/2015 at 10:00AM to the Oral Argument Calendar of 1/6/2016 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Declaration of Bonnie Allen-Sailer in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 18 .) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 10 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                First Amended Complaint . Filed by Jose Luis Lopez Garcia, Hugo Gonzalez Perez, Juan Francisco Peregrina Silva against All Defendants. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Plaintiff's unopposed E-mail Request dated 10/30/15 for extension of time as follows: Response to dismissal motion due by 11/9/2015. Reply to dismissal motion due by 11/30/2015. Order: Resetting Pavilion Defendants' Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss 10 from 12/1/2015 at 10:00AM to the Oral Argument Calendar of 12/14/2015 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting Pavilion Defendants' Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss 10 on the Oral Argument Calendar of 12/1/2015 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 12 as follows: Service of summons on Defendant Jose Antonio Gonzalez to be completed by 11/13/2015. (gm) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Declaration of Bonnie Allen-Sailer in Support of Motion to Extend Time for Service. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 12 .) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Second Motion for Extension of Time for Service. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Declaration of Brian Gerritz in Support of Pavilion Construction LLC's and Pavilion Properties, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Pavilion Construction NW LLC, Pavilion Properties, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 10 .) (Otto, Angela) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Pavilion Properties, LLC, Pavilion Construction NW LLC. (Otto, Angela) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 7 as follows and as modified: Service of summons on Defendant Jose Antonio Gonzalez to be completed by 10/16/2015. Answer deadline reset to 10/16/2015 for Defendants Pavilion Construction NW LLC, Pavilion Properties LLC and P R Drywall LLC. Discovery is to be completed by 1/14/2016. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/14/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/16/2016. Pretrial Order is due by 2/16/2016 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. (gm) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Declaration of Bonnie Allen-Sailer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend All Pre-Trial Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 7 .) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Motion for Extension of Time For All Pre-Trial Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by P R Drywall LLC waiver sent on 6/24/2015. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Pavilion Construction NW LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2015. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Pavilion Properties, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2015. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Summons Issued Electronically as to Jose Antonio Gonzalez, P R Drywall LLC, Pavilion Construction NW LLC, Pavilion Properties, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dsg) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/16/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/16/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 10/16/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (dsg) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4124424 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Hugo Gonzalez Perez, Jose Luis Lopez Garcia, Juan Francisco Peregrina Silva against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons for Def. Pavilion Construction NW LLC, # 3 Proposed Summons for Def. Pavilion Properties, LLC, # 4 Proposed Summons for Def. P R Drywall LLC, # 5 Proposed Summons for Def. Jose Gonzalez). (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?