Holmes v. Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02362
Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 12:54 AM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Charles Holmes, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Sinclair Corish +1 703 796 6050 +1 301 841 7094 bobcorish@comcast.net
v.
No Logo Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC, Defendant

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H Henderson +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 chenderson@mhlawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Timeline
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 33 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of Action With Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 4/16/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION for Settlement by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of Action with Prejudice, # 2 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement, # 3 Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Release, # 4 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Attorney's Fee Request)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
QC NOTICE: 29 Motion for Settlement, 30 Memorandum, and 31 Supplemental filed by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC was filed incorrectly. **A motion, supporting memorandum, exhibits, and proposed order must be filed as one entry. The motion should be filed as the main document with the supporting memorandum, exhibits, and proposed order as a separate attachments to the main document. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
(FILED IN ERROR) Supplemental to 29 Joint MOTION for Settlement filed by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC Order Granting Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of Action with Prejudice (Henderson, Charles) Modified on 4/12/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
(FILED IN ERROR) Memorandum re 29 Joint MOTION for Settlement filed by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Release, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Attorney's Fee Request)(Henderson, Charles) Modified on 4/12/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
(FILED IN ERROR) Joint MOTION for Settlement by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC(Henderson, Charles) Modified on 4/12/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CORRECTED PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING the settlement conference scheduled for April 3, 2018, re: 27 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 4/2/2018. (Gauvey, Susan) (blj) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Telephone Conference held on 4/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING the settlement conference scheduled for April 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 4/2/2018. (blj) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Seal by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
-SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 10 to Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
-SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 8 to Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
-SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 7 to Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Notice of Filing Document Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Notice of Filing Document Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Notice of Filing Document Under Seal, # 12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Correspondence re: Appearance at Settlement Conference (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 2/16/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey for settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 2/16/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Stipulated Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/16/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Other Relief by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulated Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material)(Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Corish, Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER to Counsel re: case referred for all proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 10/20/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER directing parties to submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re 11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/12/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Bredar on 10/12/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/2/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Report re: Deposition hours (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Correspondence setting scheduling conference. (Attachments: # 1 tentative scheduling order, # 2 discovery call in hour letter)(Motz, J.) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H Henderson on behalf of Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC (Henderson, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC.(Lynch, John) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC identifying Other Affiliate O'Connor Services, LLC, Other Affiliate O'Connor Construction, LLC for Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC.(Lynch, John) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Deficiency Notice as to Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 8/24/2017 (aos, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR FREDERICK COUNTY. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
State Court Docket Sheet (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued 30 days as to Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC.(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC, filed by Charles Holmes.(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Frederick County, case number 10-c-17-001742 OC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637030512), filed by Thomas N. O'Connor Plumbing and Heating, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?