Lamhene v. Pyramid BHH Management, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-11984
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 12:59 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Beatrice Lamhene, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by litsaslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Helen G. Litsas +1 781 231 8090 +1 781 231 8094 helen@litsaslaw.com
v.
No Logo Pyramid BHH Management, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LIBBY O'BRIEN KINGSLEY & CHAMPION, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY TIMOTHY J. O'BRIEN +1 207 985 1815 tobrien@lokllc.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. In accordance with the Court's granting 6 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and hereby is dismissed.(Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Joint Motion Approval of Settlement Agreement (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Beatrice Lamhene.. (Litsas, Helen) (Entered: 11/10/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement by Pyramid BHH Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Settlement Agreement)(O'Brien, Timothy) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pyramid BHH Management, LLC. (O'Brien, Timothy) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. O'Brien on behalf of Pyramid BHH Management, LLC (O'Brien, Timothy) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Summons Issued as to Pyramid BHH Management, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    COMPLAINT against Pyramid BHH Management Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6839127 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Beatrice Lamhene. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 JS45)(Litsas, Helen) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?