National Labor Relations Board v. Gordon
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-00144
District Judge Deborah K. Chasanow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 10:36 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Chad Horton +1 410 962 2822 +1 410 962 2198 chad.horton@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Kharhan Gordon, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion to Withdraw Application (c/m to Defendant 3/22/18 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/22/2018. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal of Application by National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Application)(Horton, Chad) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board of Order Granting Postponement (Horton, Chad) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Continue and RESCHEDULING show cause hearing to Monday, March 26, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/27/2018. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Continue by National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting)(Horton, Chad) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause served on Respondent - KHARHAN GORDON on 01-25-2018, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Domestic Return Receipt and Postal Service Tracking)(Horton, Chad) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AFFIDAVIT of Service, by Chad M. Horton by National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Horton, Chad) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board Order to Show Cause (Horton, Chad) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER DIRECTING Respondent to answer the Application by February 12, 2018 and to appear on March 5, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/23/2018. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Application for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum against Kharhan Gordon, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Proposed Order Granting Application for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum, # 10 Proposed Order to Show Cause, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 14 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?