Glynn v. Biomet, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-11903
District Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2019 at 11:32 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Glynn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thornton & Naumes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Marilyn T. McGoldrick +1 617 720 1333 +1 617 720 2445 mmcgoldrick@tenlaw.com
No Logo Jeanne Glynn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thornton & Naumes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Marilyn T. McGoldrick +1 617 720 1333 +1 617 720 2445 mmcgoldrick@tenlaw.com
v.
No Logo Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LaDue Curran & Kuehn LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Erin Linder Hanig +1 574 968 0760 +1 574 968 0761 elinder@lck-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John David LaDue +1 574 968 0760 +1 574 968 0761 jladue@lck-law.com
No Logo Biomet, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LaDue Curran & Kuehn LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Erin Linder Hanig +1 574 968 0760 +1 574 968 0761 elinder@lck-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John David LaDue +1 574 968 0760 +1 574 968 0761 jladue@lck-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:15-cv-00491. (Entered: 09/07/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
        TRANSFER ORDER Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the following cases to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order: Gearon et al v. Biomet Inc, 3:14cv2099; Glynn et al v. Biomet Inc, 3:15cv491, Petrash v. Biomet Inc, 3:15cv545, and White v. Biomet Inc, 3:16cv115. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. (jld) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          LETTER TO JUDGE MILLER REGARDING DOC.NO.3652 WITH REGARD TO ORDER IN MD3:12MD2391 by David Glynn, Jeanne Glynn . (McGoldrick PHV, Marilyn) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573, the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re (95 in 3:15-cv-00491-RLM-MGG) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases Glynn 3:15-cv-491 and White 3:16-cv-115 plaintiffs' reply to defendants' objections t plaintiffs' submission of transfer and remand venues (dkt 3595 at 5) dkt. 3511 at 6) filed by David Glynn, Jeanne Glynn. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG, 3:15-cv-00491-RLM-MGG(McGoldrick PHV, Marilyn) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        OPINION AND ORDER The motion for suggestion of remand in Price v. Biomet (DE 170 in 3:14cv275) is GRANTED; The motions for suggestion of remand in Gearon v. Biomet (DE 163 in 3:14-CV-2099) and Petrash v. Biomet (DE 94 in 3:15-CV-545) are construed as motions for transfer under 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(a), and are GRANTED to the extent they seek transfer, without the limiting instruction proposed by Biomet; The motions for suggestion of remand in Glynn v. Biomet (DE 95 in 3:15-CV-491), and White v. Biomet (DE 74 in 3:16-CV-115) are construed as motions to transfer under 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(a), and are GRANTED to the extent they seek transfer, without the limiting instruction proposed by Biomet and DENIED in all other respects; The Plaintiffs Steering Committee, in cooperation with plaintiffs local counsel, shall submit a list of the venues to which plaintiffs seek remand or transfer by June 13, 2018, with any objections thereto to be filed on or before June 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/30/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Hanig, Erin) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 12, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for Thursday, May 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Jasper Ward (in person), Brenda Fulmer and Ahmad Diab (by phone). Dft appeared by attys Erin Hanig, John LaDue, and John Winter (all in person). The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 95 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases Glynn 3:15-cv-491 and White 3:16-cv-115 Plaintiff's Joint Reply to Biomet Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Suggestion of Remand and Consolidation filed by David Glynn, Jeanne Glynn. (McGoldrick PHV, Marilyn) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 95 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases Glynn 3:15-cv-491 and White 3:16-cv-115 filed by Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Hanig, Erin) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases Glynn 3:15-cv-491 and White 3:16-cv-115 by Plaintiffs David Glynn, Jeanne Glynn. (McGoldrick PHV, Marilyn) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    OPINION AND ORDER Biomets 3388 motions for summary judgment related to the Taper, ReCap, and metal-on-polyethylene devices is DENIED on the merits; Biomets 3390 motions for summary judgment relating to the state-of-the-art defense is DENIED, without prejudice; If the plaintiffs in White v. Biomet (3:16cv115) and Glynn v. Biomet (3:15cv491) wish to take device-specific expert depositions, they should file a motion to that effect within 14 days from the date of this order, and should indicate in that motion whether local counsel will conduct the deposition, with or without the assistance of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. The plaintiffs in the Price v. Biomet (3:14cv275) and Gearon v. Biomet (3:14cv2099) shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a motion to amend the scheduling order to allow device-specific expert depositions or, alternatively, a motion for suggestion of remand. If they elect the later, the Plaintiffs Steering Committee should address the effect, if any, remand would have on the plaintiffs obligations under the December 7,2015 Amended Holdback Order 3022 in its response. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 30, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of the topics discussed and actions taken. The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/18. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer (in person), Ahmed Diab and Justin Presnal (by phone). Dft appeared by atty Erin Linder and John LaDue (in person), John Winter (by phone). The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Remote Attendance Order for January 30, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference Call-in information for the telephonic status conference on January 30, 2018 at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/25/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER The Joint Motion to Amend Group 5 Case List 3491 is GRANTED, and the the pool of cases listed on Amended Exhibit A is SUBSTITUTED as Group 5 for case-specific discovery. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 3381 Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Steven R. Schmid; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3382 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet expert David Schroeder; DENYING 3383 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Daniel Schultz, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3384 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Andrew I Spitzer, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3385 the Executive Committee's Motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Dr. Kenneth St. John; DENYING 3386 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert Mari Truman; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3399 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert George S Kantor, M.D. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER ACTIVATING GROUP 5 DISCOVERY Identifies cases to be included in Group 5 for purposes of case-specific discovery and related deadlines. Completed and updated medical records authorizations to be provided to Biomet by 2/2/2018. Case-specific Discovery deadline is 9/14/2018.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER On the court's own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference originally set for 12/19/2017 is now RESET for Tuesday, 1/30/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the 12/19/2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/26/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue. The Court hears from the parties. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Oct. 26, 2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/23/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 24, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. The next status conference is set for Thursday, October 26, 2017 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE : Call-in information for the August 24, 2017 status conference at 1:00 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/18/2017. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JULY 13, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE, Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Parties to submit recommendations regarding procedures for handling new referrals and culminating proceedings by August 17, 2017. Next status conference set for August 24, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/14/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the July 13, 2017 status conference at 9:30 am (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/10/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING ( 3354 ) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG. The defendants shall have to and including 7/31/2017 to file any motion directed at the admissibility of Dr. Kantor's testimony under Federal Rule of Evidence 702. Response due by 8/31/17 and Reply to be filed by 9/11/2017. Signed by Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/15/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/13/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR APRIL 24, 2017 PRO SE HEARING AND STATUS CONFERENCE Brenda Fulmer appeared for the plaintiffs; John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Linder Hanig appeared for the defendants. Topics addressed included the pro se and Metal-on-Polyethylene (MoP) cases, active case count, status of discovery in Groups 3 and 4, and pending motions with actions taken in specific case as set forth in the Order. The next status conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 am (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/24/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plas appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dfts appeared by atty John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Hanig. Roland Jarquio appears on behalf of Nabileh & Ramon Jarquio (3:13cv933). The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the April 24, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/21/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/28/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Ahmed Diab, Brenda Fulmer, and Justin Presnal. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig, and John LaDue. The parties advised the court on the status of active/unresolved cases and discovery; indicated that they had reached an agreement regarding the composition of Group 4 for discovery purposes and would be submitting a proposed order by early April, with scheduling deadlines to be determined by the court; and confirmed that the hearing regarding management of the remaining pro se cases would proceed as scheduled on April 24, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). The court set the next status conference for April 24, 2017, following the pro se case management hearing. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the March 28, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER On the courts own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference currently set for February 27, 2017 is RESET for Tuesday, March 28, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR DECEMBER 15, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for 2/27/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/15/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING METAL-ON-POLYETHYLENE CASES: Plaintiffs in the five remaining metal-on-polyethylene cases (see Exhibit 1) must submit an Expert Declaration of Causation (Exhibit 2) by 3/29/2017. Failure to comply will result in dismissal. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/15/16. (dk) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR NOVEMBER 7, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed. Parties to submit proposed scheduling order re: Group 3 by Nov 11. Next status conference set for December 15, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (E.S.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Hanig, Erin) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER RE: GROUP 3, MANAGEMENT OF PRO SE CASES, AND STATE COURT COORDINATION I OVERRULE the objection to including the Gearon case in Group 3; GRANT the motion (DE 121 in 3:15cv13) to include the Zamora case in Group 3; DECLINE to order inclusion of the ten year cases in Group 3; and propose to issue a modified Lone Pine order and letter to state judges. If no suggestions for improvement are received by November 23, I will issue the Lone Pine order and direct the letters to be sent. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/15/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plaintiffs appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward, A. Diab (by phone), J. Ward (by phone). Defendants appeared by atty J. Winter, J. LaDue, E. Hanig, J. Kashman. Court hears from parties. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/15/2016 at 9:00 AM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER : GRANTING 3225 PSCII's unopposed Motion to Appoint a Second Escrow Agent and Fee Committee. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER The Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Biomet are invited to provide a brief explanation for its recommendation regarding the cases to be included in Group 3. The ruling on the joint request to activate Group 3 is DEFERRED until 10/28/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER The court will DEFER ruling on the Plaintiffs Steering Committee's Motion to Appoint a Second Escrow Agent and Fee Committee ( 3225 in 3:12md2391) until 10/27/2016 to afford the individual plaintiffs time to respond or object to the motion. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein no longer assigned to case. (slm)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to submit proposed order re: appointment of Escrow Agent by Sep 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/31/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER Parties shall have until Sep 23, 2016 to confer, identify for the court which, if any, of the cases listed in Exhibit A should be designated as active and unsettled, and submit a proposal regarding disposition of the remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/31/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 29, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed. Parties to submit proposed list of cases to be included in Group 3 for case-specific discovery purposes. PSCII to submit alternative to Lone Pine order in pro se cases within 30 days; Biomet's response due 30 days after receipt. Parties to confer and submit proposed second show cause order. Ruling on Biomet's request to issue state court coordination letter 3172 deferred. Next status conference set for November 7, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (E.S.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/31/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/29/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, J. Presnal, N. Ward, A. Davis, and K. Barton for A. Diab. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter, J. LaDue, and E. Hanig. The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 11/7/2016 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT 8/29/16 STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for August 29, 2016 hearing at 11:00 a.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/25/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(lns) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER: The court VACATES the referral to Magistrate Judge Nuechterlein, and REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Michael Gotsch to determine any pretrial matters and to conduct such proceedings as are required, and, when appropriate, to enter into the record proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Local Rule 72-1. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TELEPHONIC HEARING on PSC's request to extend custodial depositions deadline was held on 8/10/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Diab, N. Ward, J. Presnall. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue, E. Hanig. Arguments heard. For the reasons stated in open court the request to extend the deadline is DENIED. If previously undisclosed documents are produced in the Florida case that would justify reopening a deposition, the court will entertain a motion to reopen and to assess costs. SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT 8/10/16 DISCOVERY HEARING Call-in information for August 10, 2016 hearing at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/4/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER On the court's own motion, the telephonic status conference on 8/29/2016 is RESET for 11:00 AM (EDT) This is a time change only. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER The parties have advised the court that there are no disputed issues regarding discovery. Accordingly the July 28, 2016 telephonic hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re (3172 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN) MOTION Requesting Issuance of State Court Coordination Letter filed by Alex C Davis. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Davis PHV, Alexander) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF 7/14/2016 STATUS CONFERENCE, Following discussion the court set telephonic hearings on 7/28/2016 at 2:00 PM (EDT) and 8/10/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. to resolve any discovery-related issues that may arise; and set a Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/29/2016 at 11:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/18/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/14/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward (in person) and A. Diab and B. Fulmer by phone.. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig (in person) and J. Winter by phone. The court hears from parties. Telephonic Discovery hearings set 7/28/2016 at 2:00 PM (EDT) and 8/10/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT) before Judge Miller. Status conference set 8/29/2016 at 11:30 AM (EDT) before Judge Miller. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for July 14, 2016 status conference at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/7/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER The court invites PSC-II to respond to Biomet's 3172 motion and proposed letter within 21 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/5/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Neither party has identified a discovery-related issue requiring a hearing. Accordingly the hearing previously set for 6/27/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/24/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: JUNE 6, 2016 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: Summary of topics discussed. By agreement of the parties, the May 31, 2016 order identifying the cases in Group 2 [Doc. No. 3150] is amended (revised list attached). Hearing on any discovery-related issues tentatively set for June 27, 2016 at 1:30 (will be vacated unless the parties notify the court by June 23 that the hearing is necessary and what the issues will be). Next telephonic status conference set for July 14, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/10/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/6/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Diab and J. Presnal by phone. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue, E. Hanig, and J. Winter in person. Court hears from parties. A tentative Discovery Hearing is set for 6/27/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr., Status Conference set for 7/14/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE: Call-in information for June 6, 2016 status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE The Court AFFORDS the plaintiffs listed on Exhibit A 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why their individual case should not be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/26/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER By agreement of the parties, the May 23, 2016 telephonic hearing on discovery related issues is VACATED as unnecessary. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/19/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: By agreement of the parties the 5/12/2016 hearing on discovery related issues is VACATED as unnecessary. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/11/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF APRIL 25, 2016 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed. Defendants to submit proposed order re: dismissal of remaining settled/funded cases. Telephonic hearings set for May 12, 2016 at 9:00 am (EDT) and May 23, 2016 at 1:00 pm (EDT) to address discovery related issues, if needed. Next status conference set for June 6, 2016 at 1:30 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/26/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward, J. Presnal, B. Fulmer, L. Stevens. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter. Court hears from parties. Telephonic hearings set for May 12, 2016 at 9:00 am (EDT) and May 23, 2016 at 1:00 pm (EDT) to address discovery related issues, if needed. Next status conference set for June 6, 2016 at 1:30 pm (EDT). (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE REGARDING FUTURE FILINGS To ensure notice is provided to all parties, the court's orders regarding deadlines and events applicable to every case associated with MDL 2391 will be filed in all member cases as well as in 3:12md2391. Filings made by the parties in 3:12md2391 will be available on the court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system or in the Clerk's Office, but will not be spread to individual cases unless a request is made and approved. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/14/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion Terminated (3117) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(ksc)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING (3117) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jenya M Moshkovich PHV terminated in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/13/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by In Re Biomet M2a Magnum Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation (MDL 2391). Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Moshkovich PHV, Jenya) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Based on counsels representation that the parties have reached an agreement regarding the discovery disputes addressed in the courts March 28 memorandum, the hearing scheduled for April 26, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/7/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                HEARING RESET: By agreement of the parties, the hearing previously set for 4/14/16 is RESET to 4/26/2016 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) Modified on 4/5/2016 (jld).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER For all future discovery-related telephonic status conferences the court orders: 1) Parties shall notify the court in writing at least 48 hours in advance of the scheduled conference whether a conference is necessary and if so, the issues to be addressed; and 2) parties shall be responsible for notify its side's attorneys about the conference and arranging the telephonic participation of those attorneys. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/31/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF MARCH 31, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Kyle Bachus, Justin Presnal, and Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty John LaDue and John Winter. Following discussion, the court: 1) ordered counsel of record in 3:13cv1008 (Jacqueline Jones v. Biomet) and 3:14cv1482 (Mary E Stewart v. Biomet) to product to Biomet through PSC-II proposed deposition dates by 4/15/16; 2) held that if proposed deposition dates are not produced, Biomet may move for sanctions under F.R.C.P. 37(b); and 3) directed PSC-II to ensure that counsel of record in those cases receives notice of this order. (Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF MARCH 14, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Telephonic hearings set for March 31, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (EDT) and April 14, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (EDT) to resolve any future discovery disputes. Next status conference set for April 25, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/16/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/14/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer, Jasper Ward, Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Blaine Dart, John LaDue, Erin Linder Hanig, John Winter. Discussions held. Court to rule in writing on the parties' discovery dispute. Status Conference set for 4/25/2016 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) Modified on 3/16/2016 (jld). Modified on 3/17/2016 (jld). (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE: Call in information for March 14, 2016 status conference at 2:00 PM (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/8/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            3087 Motion for Discovery terminated in case 3:12-md-2391-RLM-CAN. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(ksc)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              3087 Motion for Discovery terminated in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Steering Committee Memorandum of the Parties' Dispute Regarding Supplementation of Prior Discovery Requests to Biomet by MDL - Notice Only Navan Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Ward PHV, Navan) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER The court GRANTS the unopposed motion to remove plaintiff Henry Cook from Group I Class [docket # 92 in 3:15cv77] and DENIES as moot his earlier motion [docket # 88] seeking the same relief.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCOVERY Documents Requested by the Court for March 14 Status Conference by Alex C Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit Defendant's Response to First Requests for Production, # 3 Exhibit Defendant's Response to First Interrogatories)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Davis PHV, Alexander) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER At the request of the parties, the March 14, 2016 status conference is converted from a telephonic to a live conference, with lead counsel for both sides to appear in person.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/29/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE: PROCEDURE GOVERNING DISCOVERY FOR IN EXTREMIS PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/29/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER : Pursuant to the December 21, 2015 scheduling order, the listed cases are included in Group 1 for purposes of case-specific discovery. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/29/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER To prepare for the March 14 status conference, parties to provide a copy of the original interrogatories and requests for production that were served on the defendants in 2013 and the defendants' responses to those interrogatories and production requests by 3/4/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/24/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER At the request of the parties, the court heard arguments regarding the scope of depositions to be conducted in the statute of limitations and spoliation cases (see Exhibits A and B to the December 21, 2015 scheduling order) and the number of cases listed on Exhibit B. For the reasons stated, the parties were directed to conduct a single, full deposition of the plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B, unless the court rules to the contrary in a given case. The court deferred ruling on PSC II's request to remove cases from Exhibit B, until briefing on the anticipated summary judgment motions is completed. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/17/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Biomet to submit a list of the cases that remain active as of 2/1/2016 to help identify which of those cases are to be included in Group 1 for discovery purposes by 2/28/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/17/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/16/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue and J. Winter. Court hears from parties. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: At the request of counsel a telephonic conference was set for Tuesday 2/16/2016 at 2:00 PM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Pursuant to paragraphs 7 & 9 of the December 21 scheduling order 3047, two pools consisting of the oldest cases on the MDL docket and any in extremis cases identified by PSC II or Biomet and approved by the court (Groups 1 & 2) will be activated for case-specific discovery beginning 2/29/2016 and 5/20/2016 respectively. Consistent with that order, the PSC II and Biomet are DIRECTED to confer and, if possible, agree upon the procedures to be followed with respect to any in extremis cases, and to submit their proposal for the court's approval on or before 2/29/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/16/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF JANUARY 28, 2016 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Topics of discussion included the number of cases and motions currently pending. Biomet to review list of cases (see attached), identify which cases remain active, and file an updated list in 3:12-MD-2391. Next telephonic status conference set for March 14, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Senior Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/28/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Diab, B. Fulmer, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. Court hears from parties. Written memorandum to follow. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/14/2016 at 2:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for January 28, 2016 status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.S.T.).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/26/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: PSC I's request for reimbursement ( 3027 in 3:12md2391) is GRANTED, and Garretson Resolution Group is ORDERED to reimburse PSC I the $25,000.00 it withheld from the Common Benefit Expense Account. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/23/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Order setting discovery and dispositive deadlines. See order for specific deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/21/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER So the court can issue its scheduling order, parties requested to submit Exhibits A and B that are to be referenced in the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/17/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF DECEMBER 7, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE: A brief summary of the topics discussed and the court's directives. Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel to submit a written statement regarding PSC II's position on M2a-Taper cases; Biomet Defendants were directed to file a list of cases settled on or by December 7, 2015 but have yet to be dismissed. The next Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/28/2016 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/9/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/7/2015 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward,. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. Court hears from parties. A telephonic status conference is set for 1/28/2016 at 1:30 PM (EST) before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED HOLDBACK ORDER RE: COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND COSTS: Order granting PSC II's Amended Motion and Proposed Holdback Order Re: Common Benefit Fees and Costs ( 3000 and 3002 ). Any cases that are resolved after Monday, December 7, 2015 shall be subject to a provisional six percent holdback. 3020 .. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/7/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Without objection and in accordance with the court's order of 6/23/2015, the 2990 and 2991 Motions for Payment of Compensation to the Garretson Resolution Group Inc from the Biomet MDL Common Benefit Cost Fund in the amount of $18,500.00 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/3/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE: Call in information for the status conference set 12/7/2015 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/1/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              HOLDBACK ORDER RE: COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND COSTS: GRANTING (3002) Amended Motion re Holdback Order re Common Benefit Fees and Costs. Cases that do not have a Notice of Settlement filed into the individual case's docket on or before Monday November 30, 2015 shall be subject to a provisional 6% holdback; the Holdback Order does not apply to any cases involving pro se plaintiffs, which will be addressed on an individual case-by-case basis; the Holdback Order is provisional in nature. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel shall send a copy of the Holdback Order to the attorneys of record in the pending state court actions that PSC II is aware of. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/1/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Motion 2963 is WITHDRAWN and has been superseded by Amended Motion and Proposed Holdback Order Re: Common Benefit Fees and Costs 3000 in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/24/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED EXPLANT PRESERVATION ORDER : Amended directives relating to the preservation of Explanted M2a Devices, with Biomet Retrieval Analysis Protocol (Exh. A).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/24/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Executive Committee's Amended Motion and Proposed Holdback Order re: Common Benefit Fees and Costs. Any response or objection to be filed by 11/20/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al. ***NOTE: THIS IS A DUPLICATE OF DE 3000 in 3:12md2391 THAT HAS BEEN SPREAD TO ALL CASES.(jld) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-2779913.), filed by David Glynn, Jeanne Glynn. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGoldrick PHV, Marilyn) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?