Martinez v. Irish Entertainment LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-13656
District Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 1:34 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jose Vivian Martinez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miryam E. Cissero +1 617 877 6015 cisserolaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glickman Turley, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul Glickman +1 617 399 7770 +1 617 399 7775 pmg@glickmanturley.com
v.
No Logo Farragut House, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Finbar Griffin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by boballenlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert L. Allen, Jr. +1 617 383 6000 +1 617 383 6001 ballen@boballenlaw.com
No Logo Irish Entertainment LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by boballenlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert L. Allen, Jr. +1 617 383 6000 +1 617 383 6001 ballen@boballenlaw.com
No Logo Irish Redsox LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by boballenlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert L. Allen, Jr. +1 617 383 6000 +1 617 383 6001 ballen@boballenlaw.com
No Logo Jose Amilcar Carpio, Defendant
No Logo MG Restaurant Management LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by boballenlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert L. Allen, Jr. +1 617 383 6000 +1 617 383 6001 ballen@boballenlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1938
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. The matter is stayed pending further order of the Court. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. The Court ordered that this matter will be (1) stayed pending further order of the Court and (2) dismissed on June 30, 2016. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 10/7/2015. Case called. Parties report matter settled. Court will enter an Order dismissing the matter as of 6/30/2015. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: By Telephone: Glickman, Barnosky) (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ***NEW DATE*** NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Due to conflict, Status Conference reset for 10/7/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered denying 22 Motion for Default Judgment. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jose Amilcar Carpio by Jose Vivian Martinez. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Cissero, Miryam) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jose Amilcar Carpio. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Request for notice of default by Jose Vivian Martinez Renewed. (Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Notice of Default as to Jose Amilcar Carpio is withdrawn. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Scheduling Conference held on 2/23/2015. Scheduling Conference held on 2/23/2015. Defendant Carpio appears pro se. Plaintiff's counsel makes oral motion to withdraw its request for default as to Defendant Carpio. The Court grants the motion to withdraw the default. Defendant Carpio's response to plaintiff's complaint to be filed by 3/16/2015. Court imposes following discovery schedule: Initial disclosures shall be due by 3/25/2015. Amendments to pleadings shall be due by 6/30/2015. Written requests for discovery shall be served by 6/10/2015. Depositions, other than expert depositions, and fact discovery to be completed by 9/30/2015. Parties shall notify the Court by 9/18/2015 if experts will be called. Dispositive Motions shall be due by 11/20/2015. Status conference is set for 10/6/2015 at 2:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: Catherine Handel at hhcatherine2@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Glickman, Loda, Cissero, Barnowski, Carpio - pro se defendant) (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 03/01/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. Standing Order Regarding Motions for Default Judgment. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jose Amilcar Carpio (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Jose Vivian Martinez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Request for notice of default by Jose Vivian Martinez . (Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Jose Amilcar Carpio served on 11/14/2014, answer due 12/5/2014. (Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Finbar Griffin, Irish Entertainment LLC, Irish Redsox LLC, MG Restaurant Management LLC.(Allen, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Finbar Griffin served on 9/29/2014, answer due 10/20/2014. (Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed MG Restaurant Management LLC served on 10/1/2014, answer due 10/22/2014. (Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Irish Redsox LLC served on 10/1/2014, answer due 10/22/2014. (Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Irish Entertainment LLC served on 10/1/2014, answer due 10/22/2014. (Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Farragut House, LLC served on 10/1/2014, answer due 10/22/2014. (Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5197971 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jose Vivian Martinez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 MA Category Form, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Glickman, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?