Thompson v. Foote
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-04700
District Judge Diane J. Humetewa, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 12, 2020 at 4:56 PM DT (11.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard Wayne Thompson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard Wayne Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Wayne Thompson +1 928 273 7563
v.
No Logo Sam Foote, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None USCA Case Number
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SST) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (SST) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Richard Wayne Thompson. (SST) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Richard Wayne Thompson.(SST) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 7 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?