Overstreet v. Shamrock Foods Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-01136
District Judge Susan R Bolton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 10:51 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cornele A Overstreet, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sara Sue Demirok +1 602 640 2123 +1 602 640 2178 sara.demirok@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Shamrock Foods Company, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by AIKEN SCHENK HAWKINS & RICCIARDI PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Burr Shields, II +1 602 248 8203 +1 602 248 8840 burr@aikenschenk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc Antonetti +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 mantonetti@bakerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd A. Dawson +1 216 621 0200 +1 216 696 0740 tdawson@bakerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Inesta +1 310 820 8800 +1 310 820 8859 ninesta@bakerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jay Paul Krupin +1 202 861 1700 jkrupin@bakerlaw.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Petitioner's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of the Petition for Injunction Filed Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act. (Doc. 31 ) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/2016. (REK) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    First MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily by Cornele A Overstreet. (Demirok, Sara) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting 9 Petitioner's Motion to Try Petition for Temporary Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act on the Basis of the Administrative Record, Affidavits, and Other Documentary Evidence. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties confer and agree upon a scheduling order for the briefing of the Motion for Temporary Injunction and file a stipulation and proposed scheduling order no later than 14 days from the date of this Order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/9/16.(MAW) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE to Motion re: 26 MOTION for Issuance of Order Clarifying Response Time for Filing Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Temporary Injunction or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File its Response Thereto filed by Cornele A Overstreet. (Demirok, Sara) (Entered: 05/29/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating 20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX171058 as to Todd Aaron Dawson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Todd A. Dawson by Shamrock Foods Company. (Inesta, Nancy) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Issuance of Order Clarifying Response Time for Filing Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Temporary Injunction or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File its Response Thereto by Shamrock Foods Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Inesta, Nancy) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY to Response to Motion re: 9 MOTION to Try Petition on Administrative Record, Affidavits, and Other Documentary Evidence filed by Cornele A Overstreet. (Demirok, Sara) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying 6 Petitioner's Motion for Expedited Hearing and Pleading Schedule [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/13/16.(MAW) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Todd A. Dawson filed by Shamrock Foods Company. Pro Hac Vice motion submitted with state court certificate of good standing. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit motion with original certificates of good standing from a federal court. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (REK) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $105, receipt number PHX171840 as to Jay Paul Krupin, Marc A Antonetti, Nancy Inesta. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Respondent's ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Shamrock Foods Company.(Shields, James) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Todd A. Dawson by Shamrock Foods Company. (Shields, James) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RESPONSE in Opposition re: 9 MOTION to Try Petition for Temporary Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act on the Basis of the Administrative Record, Affidavits and Other Documentary Evidence filed by Shamrock Foods Company. (Shields, James) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RESPONSE in Opposition re: 6 First MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Pleading Schedule filed by Shamrock Foods Company. (Shields, James) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Krupin by Shamrock Foods Company. (Shields, James) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Inesta by Shamrock Foods Company. (Shields, James) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Antonetti by Shamrock Foods Company. (Shields, James) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shamrock Foods Company identifying Corporate Parent Shamrock Foods Company for Shamrock Foods Company. (Shields, James) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James Burr Shields, II on behalf of Shamrock Foods Company. (Shields, James) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of 1 Complaint (Petition for Temporary Injunction) by Petitioner Cornele A Overstreet. (EJA) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting 7 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/3/16.(MAW) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Cornele A Overstreet: Certificate of Service re: Initiating Documents and Related Motions upon Attorneys for Respondent on April 20, 2016. (Demirok, Sara) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  *First MOTION to Try Petition Based on Administrative Record, Affidavits, and Other Documentary Evidence by Cornele A Overstreet. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Try on Administrative Record)(Demirok, Sara) *Modified to correct event type on 4/21/2016 (KGM). (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    *Filed at (Doc. 12 LODGED Proposed Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition re: 7 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Points and Authorities . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Cornele A Overstreet. (Demirok, Sara) Modified on 5/3/2016 (EJA). (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Cornele A Overstreet. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(Demirok, Sara) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        First MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Pleading Schedule by Cornele A Overstreet. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite)(Demirok, Sara) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          SUPPLEMENT Corrected Civil Cover Sheet re: 1 Complaint by Petitioner Cornele A Overstreet. (Demirok, Sara) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Complaint filed by Cornele A Overstreet. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-01136-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KGM) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Cornele A Overstreet re: 1 Complaint by Petitioner Cornele A Overstreet (submitted by Sara Demirok). (KGM) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  COMPLAINT filed by Cornele A Overstreet (submitted by Sara Demirok). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 lodged Order to Show Cause, # 3 lodged Order, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(KGM) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?