National Labor Relations Board v. Stith
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-02856
District Judge Catherine C. Blake, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 12:09 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Elizabeth Duvall +1 410 962 2915 +1 410 962 2198 barbara.duvall@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean Robert Marshall +1 410 962 2785 +1 410 962 2198 sean.marshall@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Stanley Stith, Respondent
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Withdraw 1 APPLICATION for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/11/2016. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Withdraw Application by National Labor Relations Board Responses due by 10/28/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duvall, Barbara) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER GRANTING 1 Motion for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/5/2016. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Show Cause Hearing held on 10/4/2016 before Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake. (Court Reporter: Mary Zajac-7D) (chs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause; Application for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoena; Memo with Exhibits served on Stanley Stith on September 8, 2016, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of delivery)(Duvall, Barbara) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake. Show Cause Response due by 9/20/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/6/2016. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPLICATION for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Certificate of Service of Application, # 3 Certificate of Service of Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Requiring Compliance, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause, # 10 Certificate of Service of Proposed Order Requiring Compliance, # 11 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order to Show Cause, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 14 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?