Lewis v. Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-06547
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 5:02 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nicholas H. Lewis, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicole Oliver +1 212 264 0323 nicole.oliver@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C. Rucker +1 212 264 7614 +1 212 264 2450 jamie.rucker@nlrb.gov
No Logo Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel David Schudroff +1 212 545 4000 +1 212 972 3213 schudroffd@jacksonlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen M. Silvestri +1 410 415 2006 +1 410 415 2001 stephen.silvestri@jacksonlewis.com
No Logo Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Michael Repole +1 212 545 4000 +1 212 545 4019 christopher.repole@jacksonlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel David Schudroff +1 212 545 4000 +1 212 972 3213 schudroffd@jacksonlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen M. Silvestri +1 410 415 2006 +1 410 415 2001 stephen.silvestri@jacksonlewis.com
No Logo 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East, Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Isa Apter +1 212 627 8100 japter@levyratner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allyson Leigh Belovin +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 abelovin@lrbpc.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160j
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the respondents Rite Aid of New York, Inc. and Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc. as a single employer pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Respondents and Amicus Curiae 1l99SEIU United Healthcare Worker East have reached a non-Board settlement, including an executed collective-bargaining agreement, subject to ratification by the bargaining unit employees. The settlement resolves all issues pending before the Court for which relief is sought by the Petitioner. The parties respectfully submit this Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, subject to Respondent's full compliance with the terms of the non-Board settlement agreement. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/26/2017) (ap) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a motion proceeding held on 10/5/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 10/5/2017 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney James Rucker Document 53 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was referred to Judge John G. Koeltl for approval. (km)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc. and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Nicholas H. Lewis.(Rucker, James) Modified on 10/26/2017 (km). (Entered: 10/25/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Stephen M. Silvestri dated 10/20/17 re: request that the court defer or postpone any ruling on the Petition until after the close of business (5:00 pm) this Monday, October 23, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/20/17) (yv) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            LETTER MOTION to Stay (re: Ruling on Petition) addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Daniel D. Schudroff dated October 18, 2017. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc..(Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Oral Argument held on 10/5/2017 re: 4 Order to Show Cause and 1 Petition (Other). Filed by Nicholas H. Lewis. (Fletcher, Donnie)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 18 Motion to Approve Motion to Try Petition on Affidavits and Evidence. In light of the defendants' concession that an evidentiary hearing is unnecessary in this case, ECF No. 38, at 6 n.4, the plaintiff's motion to try this petition on affidavits and record evidence, ECF No. 18, is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/29/17) (yv) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 24 Motion for Stephen M. Silvestri to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/28/17) (yv) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION to Approve Motion to Try Petition on Affidavits and Evidence Attached to Petition . . Document filed by Nicholas H. Lewis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 27 to 31, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 32 to 35, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 36 to 40)(Oliver, Nicole) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      BRIEF re: 1 Petition (Other),, Reply Brief. Document filed by 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit A. Salazar, # 2 Affidavit B. Dowd, # 3 Affidavit B. Silva, # 4 Affidavit E. Mui-Tellado)(Belovin, Allyson) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses to Brief due by 9/19/2017 (yv)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 44 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/19/17) (yv) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Isa Apter on behalf of 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East. (Apter, Jessica) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 43 Memorandum of Law in Opposition, 40 Memorandum of Law in Opposition, 41 Memorandum of Law in Opposition, 42 Memorandum of Law in Opposition, 39 Memorandum of Law in Opposition addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Stephen M. Silvestri, Daniel D. Schudroff, and Christopher M. Repole dated September 19, 2017. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc..(Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),, Part 6. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),, Part 5. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),, Part 4. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),, Part 3. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),, Part 2. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),, Part 1. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            DECLARATION of Edward Wells-Tsiatsos in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),,. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              DECLARATION of Kaitlyn L. Mullins in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),,. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                DECLARATION of Rosa B. Torres in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),,. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  DECLARATION of Gordon Hinkle in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),,. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    DECLARATION of Sean J. Grigal in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),,. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      DECLARATION of Joann Eggleton in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),,. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        DECLARATION of Tiffany Donnelly in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),,. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          DECLARATION of Derek S. Stover in Opposition re: 1 Petition (Other),,. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE to 1 Petition (Other),,. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc..(Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc..(Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER: granting 26 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. The petitioner may deem any appropriate increase in pages for its reply brief. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman, Part I on 9/15/2017) (ap) Modified on 9/15/2017 (ap). Modified on 9/15/2017 (ap). (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Daniel D. Schudroff dated September 14, 2017. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc..(Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    BRIEF re: 1 Petition (Other),, . Document filed by 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East.(Belovin, Allyson) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 24 MOTION for Stephen Michael Silvestri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Stephen Michael Silvestri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Silvestri, Stephen) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: (Brief due by 9/18/2017., Reply to Response to Brief due by 9/25/2017., Responses to Brief due by 9/18/2017), Set/Reset Hearings: (Status Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (yv)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 5 Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting 7 Motion to File Amicus Brief. The motion by 1199 SEIU United HealthCare Workers East to appear as amicus curiae is granted. Any amicus brief shall be filed by September 11, 2017. The respondents shall file their response to the petitioner's brief and any amicus brief by September 18, 2017. In that submission, the respondents may indicate whether they believe an evidentiary hearing is necessary. The petitioner and amicus may each file a reply by September 25, 2017, which may address any request for an evidentiary hearing. A hearing on the temporary injunction shall be held on October 5, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12B at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The Court will inform the parties of the nature of the hearing after it has received all of the above-referenced submissions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/6/17) (yv) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Telephone Conference held on 9/6/2017. (Fletcher, Donnie)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 21 MOTION for Stephen Michael Silvestri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14093653. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - see Local Rule 1.3. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit or Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel David Schudroff on behalf of Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Schudroff, Daniel) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Stephen Michael Silvestri to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14093653. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Silvestri, Stephen) Modified on 9/6/2017 (jc). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Acting RD Nicholas H. Lewis in Support re: 18 MOTION to Approve Motion to Try Petition on Affidavits and Evidence Attached to Petition .. Document filed by Nicholas H. Lewis. (Oliver, Nicole) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION to Approve Motion to Try Petition on Affidavits and Evidence Attached to Petition . Memo in Support of 10j Petition. Document filed by Nicholas H. Lewis. (Oliver, Nicole) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION to Approve Motion to Try Petition on Affidavits and Evidence Attached to Petition . Document filed by Nicholas H. Lewis.(Oliver, Nicole) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response to Motion for Extension of Time served on Rite Aid of New York, Inc. and Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc. on September 1, 2017. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Nicholas H. Lewis. (Oliver, Nicole) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Nicole Oliver on behalf of Petitioner Nicholas H. Lewis, Acting Regional Director dated September 1, 2017 re: 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Stephen M. Silvestri dated August 30, 2017. . Document filed by Nicholas H. Lewis. (Oliver, Nicole) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (rj)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSED ORDER with respect to 5 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Telephone Conference scheduled for September 6, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni Part I on 8/31/2017) (rj) Modified on 10/3/2017 (rj). (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Show Cause Response due by 9/22/2017.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (mro)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Telephone conference scheduled for September 6, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni, Part I on 8/31/2017) (mro) Modified on 9/1/2017 (mro). (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law and Proposed Order served on Laura Pierson-Scheinbergc on 08/31/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East. (Belovin, Allyson) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James C. Rucker on behalf of Nicholas H. Lewis. (Rucker, James) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion served on 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East and National Labor Relations Board on August 30, 2017. Document filed by Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Repole, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Stephen M. Silvestri dated August 30, 2017. Document filed by Rite Aid of New York, Inc..(Repole, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Michael Repole on behalf of Rite Aid of New York, Inc.. (Repole, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East. (Belovin, Allyson) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to File Amicus Brief Proposed Order. Document filed by 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East.(Belovin, Allyson) Modified on 11/7/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Allyson Leigh Belovin to RE-FILE Document 6 MOTION to File Amicus Brief Memorandum of Law of 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East in Support of Motion For Leave To Participate as Amicus Curiae. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (db)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to File Amicus Brief Memorandum of Law of 1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East in Support of Motion For Leave To Participate as Amicus Curiae. Document filed by 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East.(Belovin, Allyson) Modified on 8/30/2017 (db). (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by 1199SEIU United HealthCare Workers East.(Belovin, Allyson) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause, Petition for Injunction, Appendix of Exhibits and Exhibits, Acting RD Affidavit, Memo of Points and Authorities, Motion to Try Petition on Affidavits, Proposed Order, Individual Practices of Judge Koeltl, ECF Rules & Instructions served on Rite Aid of New York, Inc. and Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc. on August 28, 2017. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Nicholas H. Lewis. (Oliver, Nicole) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc. answer due 9/11/2017; Rite Aid of New York, Inc. answer due 9/11/2017. Replies due by 9/18/2017. (mro)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a copy of this Order together with a copy of the Petition and Exhibits, Affidavit, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities upon which the Petition is issued, along with the Motion to Try the Petition on the Affidavits and the (Proposed) Order Granting Relief Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act, shall be served upon Respondent or its counsel on or before August 28, 2017 and service on all parties may be made by a representative designated by Petitioner by overnight delivery or in any manner provided for in the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States Courts, and that proof of such service shall be filed herein; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Respondent should file a response to the Petition, it shall file sure response with the Clerk of this Court after service of a copy thereof upon Petitioner at her office at 26 Federal Plaza, Room 3614, New York, New York 10278, on or before September 11, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Petitioner should file a reply to the Respondent's response, it shall fill such reply with the Clerk of this Court after service of a copy thereof upon Respondent or its counsel on or before September 18, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent appear on September 25, 2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 12B of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl St., New York, New York, and then and there show cause, if there by any, why, pending the final disposition of the matters involved pending before the National Labor Relations Board, in consolidated case Nos. 02-CA-182713 and 02-CA-189661. Respondent, its officers, agents, representatives, servants, employees, attorneys, and all members and persons acting in concert or participation with them, should not be enjoined and restrained as requested in the Petition. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/25/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni, Part I on 8/28/2017) (mro) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Case Designated ECF. (rch)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rch)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rch) (pc). (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        PETITION for the Temporary Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act..Document filed by Nicholas H. Lewis.(rch) (pc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2017: # 1 Exhibits 1 to 4, # 2 Exhibit 5 Part 1, # 3 Exhibits 5 Part 2, # 4 Exhibits 6 to 11, # 5 Exhibits 12 to 13, # 6 Exhibits 14 to 17, # 7 Exhibit 18 Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 18 Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 18 Part 3, # 10 Exhibit 19, # 11 Exhibit 20 Part 1, # 12 Exhibit 20 Part 2, # 13 Exhibits 21 to 23, # 14 Exhibit 24, # 15 Exhibits 25 to 26) (pc). (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?