Posner v. Bayhealth Medical Center
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01149
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 8:31 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Posner, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas J. Murphy +1 410 962 2198 thomas.murphy@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Bayhealth Medical Center, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brittany M. Giusini +1 302 252 4430 +1 302 252 4466 giusinib@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Chaney Hall +1 302 622 4276 chall@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnine P. Barnes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Johnine P. Barnes

Toggle Switch Represented by Justin F. Keith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Justin F. Keith
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to Thomas J. Murphy, Esq. from Clerk, dated 1/27/17, regarding return of D.I. 3 Multi Media Document. (rwc) Modified on 1/27/2017 (nms). (Entered: 01/27/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 10 Stipulation of Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2016. (nms) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION of Dismissal, by Charles Posner. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Murphy, Thomas) Modified on 1/6/2016 (nms). (Entered: 01/06/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Pro Hac Vice Attorney Johnine P. Barnes for Bayhealth Medical Center added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        SO ORDERED, re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Johnine P. Barnes, Esquire filed by Bayhealth Medical Center. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/22/2015. (nms) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Pro Hac Vice Attorney Justin F. Keith for Bayhealth Medical Center added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Johnine P. Barnes, Esquire - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center. (Hall, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SO ORDERED, re 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Justin F. Keith, Esquire filed by Bayhealth Medical Center. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/21/2015. (nms)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Justin F. Keith, Esquire - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center. (Hall, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Chaney Hall on behalf of Bayhealth Medical Center (Hall, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER Setting Show Cause Hearing re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Show Cause Hearing is set for 1/14/2016, 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/2015. (nms) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        No Summons Issued. (rwc)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Charles Posner in the form of a Audio DVD. Filing related to 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (rwc) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES - in Support re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Charles Posner.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/4/2016. (rwc) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                PETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF UNDER SECTION 10(j) OF THE NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS ACT - filed by Charles Posner. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Injunctive Relief, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Proposed Order to Show Cause, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Cover Letter) - (filing fee waived).(rwc) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?